EP2698967 - SOCIAL NETWORK DATA MINING METHOD FOR TERMINAL USER, AND RELEVANT METHOD, DEVICE AND SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 29.05.2015 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 29.05.2015 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 01.07.2015 [2015/27] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Huawei Technologies Co., Ltd. Huawei Administration Building Bantian Longgang District Shenzhen, Guangdong 518129 / CN | [N/P] |
Former [2014/08] | For all designated states Huawei Technologies Co., Ltd Huawei Administration Building Bantian Longgang District Shenzhen, Guangdong 518129 / CN | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LIU, Hewei Huawei Administration Building Bantian Longgang District Shenzhen, Guangdong 518129 / CN | 02 /
TANG, Dong Huawei Administration Building Bantian Longgang District Shenzhen, Guangdong 518129 / CN | 03 /
WANG, Shaoyu Huawei Administration Building Bantian Longgang District Shenzhen, Guangdong 518129 / CN | [2014/14] | Representative(s) | Körber, Martin Hans, et al Mitscherlich PartmbB Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Sonnenstrasse 33 80331 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2014/08] | Körber, Martin Hans, et al Mitscherlich & Partner Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Sonnenstrasse 33 80331 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 12876585.6 | 25.09.2012 | WO2012CN81893 | Priority number, date | CN20121156447 | 18.05.2012 Original published format: CN201210156447 | [2014/08] | Filing language | ZH | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2013170566 | Date: | 21.11.2013 | Language: | ZH | [2013/47] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2698967 | Date: | 19.02.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/08] | Type: | A8 Corrected patent application | No.: | EP2698967 | Date: | 09.04.2014 | [2014/15] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 21.11.2013 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 30.05.2014 | Classification | IPC: | H04W4/20, H04L29/08 | [2014/27] | CPC: |
H04W4/21 (EP)
|
Former IPC [2014/08] | H04L29/08 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2014/08] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUM ABRUFEN VON SOCIAL NETWORK-DATEN FÜR EINEN ENDGERÄTEBENUTZER SOWIE VERFAHREN, VORRICHTUNG UND SYSTEM DAFÜR | [2014/08] | English: | SOCIAL NETWORK DATA MINING METHOD FOR TERMINAL USER, AND RELEVANT METHOD, DEVICE AND SYSTEM | [2014/08] | French: | PROCÉDÉ POUR L'EXTRACTION DE DONNÉES DE RÉSEAU SOCIAL POUR UN TERMINAL UTILISATEUR, ET PROCÉDÉ, DISPOSITIF ET SYSTÈME CORRESPONDANTS | [2014/08] | Entry into regional phase | 15.11.2013 | Translation filed | 16.11.2013 | National basic fee paid | 16.11.2013 | Search fee paid | 16.11.2013 | Designation fee(s) paid | 16.11.2013 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 15.11.2013 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 16.11.2013 | Examination requested [2014/08] | 06.01.2015 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2015/27] | 10.02.2015 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2015/27] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.09.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US2009080635 (ALTBERG EBBE [US], et al) [X] 1-21 * abstract * * paragraph [0001] - paragraph [0353] * * figures 1-23 *; | [X]US2009117883 (COFFING DAN [US], et al) [X] 1-21 * abstract * * paragraph [0001] - paragraph [0164] ** figures 1-18 *; | [X]US2010280892 (UZUNALIOGLU HUSEYIN [US], et al) [X] 1-21 * abstract * * paragraph [0001] - paragraph [0076] * * figures 1-5 *; | [X]US2011029887 (PEARSON LARRY B [US], et al) [X] 1-21 * abstract * * paragraph [0001] - paragraph [0055] * * figures 1-5 *; | [X]WO2011037505 (ERICSSON TELEFON AB L M [SE], et al) [X] 1-21 * abstract * * page 1, line 5 - page 21, line 7 * * figures 1-5 *; | [X]US2011201317 (KARANDIKAR ABHAY [IN], et al) [X] 1-21 * abstract * * paragraph [0001] - paragraph [0055] * * figures 1-10 * | International search | [A]CN101800795 (UNIV BEIJING POSTS & TELECOMM); | [A]CN102118698 (UC MOBILE LTD); | [A]WO2011099796 (SAMSUNG ELECTRONICS CO LTD [KR], et al); | [A]US2011282952 (SONG MEE-SUN [KR]) |