|
24.01.2020 |
Communication regarding the expiry of opposition period |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
01.04.2019 |
Transmission of the certificate for a European patent pursuant to Rule 74 EPC |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
21.02.2019 |
Decision to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
08.02.2019 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
08.02.2019 |
French translation of claims |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
08.02.2019 |
German translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
08.02.2019 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
17.10.2018 |
Bibliographic data of the European patent application |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
17.10.2018 |
Communication about intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
17.10.2018 |
Intention to grant (signatures) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
17.10.2018 |
Text intended for grant (clean copy) |
Search / examination |
32 |
|
17.10.2018 |
Text intended for grant (version for approval) |
Search / examination |
32 |
|
05.06.2018 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
05.06.2018 |
Amended description with annotations |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
05.06.2018 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
05.06.2018 |
Description |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
05.06.2018 |
Drawings |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
05.06.2018 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
04.06.2018 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
04.06.2018 |
Amended description with annotations |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
04.06.2018 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
04.06.2018 |
Description |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
04.06.2018 |
Drawings |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
04.06.2018 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
05.02.2018 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
05.02.2018 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
29.01.2018 |
Examination started |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
25.05.2016 |
Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
25.05.2016 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
25.05.2016 |
Amendments received before examination |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
23.05.2016 |
Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
23.05.2016 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
23.05.2016 |
Amendments received before examination |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
23.12.2015 |
Submission concerning representation |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
17.12.2015 |
Submission concerning representation |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
04.12.2015 |
Invitation to declare maintenance of the application and to correct deficiencies in the Written Opinion/amend application |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
17.11.2015 |
Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
17.11.2015 |
European search opinion |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
17.11.2015 |
Information on Search Strategy |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
17.11.2015 |
Supplementary European search report |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
09.11.2015 |
Search started |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
25.02.2015 |
Amended drawings filed after receipt of (European) search report |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
25.02.2015 |
Amendments received before examination |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
25.02.2015 |
Notification of forthcoming publication |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
20.02.2015 |
Amended drawings filed after receipt of (European) search report |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
20.02.2015 |
Amendments received before examination |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
23.12.2014 |
Communication regarding possible amendment of the application/payment of claims fee |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
19.12.2014 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
19.12.2014 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
02.12.2014 |
Copy of the international preliminary report on patentability |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
02.12.2014 |
Translation of the international preliminary report on patentability |
Search / examination |
8 |
|
29.10.2014 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
29.10.2014 |
Abstract |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
29.10.2014 |
Abstract |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
29.10.2014 |
Abstract |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
29.10.2014 |
Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
29.10.2014 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
29.10.2014 |
Amended description filed after receipt of (European) search report |
Search / examination |
20 |
|
29.10.2014 |
Amended description with annotations |
Search / examination |
21 |
|
29.10.2014 |
Amended drawings filed after receipt of (European) search report |
Search / examination |
8 |
|
29.10.2014 |
Amended drawings with annotations |
Search / examination |
8 |
|
29.10.2014 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
29.10.2014 |
Description |
Search / examination |
19 |
|
29.10.2014 |
Drawings |
Search / examination |
8 |
|
29.10.2014 |
Request for entry into the European phase |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
26.09.2014 |
Information on entry into European phase |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
21.11.2013 |
Copy of the international search report |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
21.11.2013 |
Copy of the translated international search report |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
21.11.2013 |
International publication pamphlet |
Search / examination |
27 |