Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2013171823 | Global Dossier | 21.11.2013 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2012JP62305 | 14.05.2012 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US9166841 | Global Dossier | 20.10.2015 | B2 | US2015117509 | 30.04.2015 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2012JP62305 | 14.05.2012 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JPWO2013171823 | Global Dossier | 07.01.2016 | A1 | JP5788088B | 30.09.2015 | B2 | Priority number | Date | WO2012JP62305 | 14.05.2012 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP2852079 | Global Dossier | 20.03.2019 | B1 | EP2852079 | 16.12.2015 | A4 | EP2852079 | 25.03.2015 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2012JP62305 | 14.05.2012 |