EP2857092 - KNEADING MACHINE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 16.02.2018 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 10.03.2017 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 23.11.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.07.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL | published on 19.08.2020 [2020/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Kurimoto, Ltd. 12-19, Kitahorie 1-chome Nishi-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka 550-8580 / JP | [2017/10] |
Former [2015/15] | For all designated states Kurimoto, Ltd. 12-19, Kita-horie 1-chome Nishi-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka 550-8580 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
FUJII Atsushi c/o Kurimoto Ltd. 12-19 Kitahorie 1-chome Nishi-ku Osaka-shi Osaka 550-8580 / JP | 02 /
YAMASAKI Koji c/o Kurimoto Ltd. 12-19 Kitahorie 1-chome Nishi-ku Osaka-shi Osaka 550-8580 / JP | 03 /
FUKUMOTO Kazunori c/o Kurimoto Ltd. 12-19 Kitahorie 1-chome Nishi-ku Osaka-shi Osaka 550-8580 / JP | [2015/15] | Representative(s) | Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Leopoldstraße 4 80802 München / DE | [2017/15] |
Former [2015/15] | Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Anwaltssozietät Leopoldstrasse 4 80802 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 12878541.7 | 04.06.2012 | [2017/15] | WO2012JP64367 | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2013183100 | Date: | 12.12.2013 | Language: | JA | [2013/50] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2857092 | Date: | 08.04.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/15] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2857092 | Date: | 12.04.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/15] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 12.12.2013 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 15.06.2015 | Classification | IPC: | F16H1/22, B01F7/00, B01F7/04, B01F13/08, A21C1/06, B29B7/48, B29B7/58 | [2015/29] | CPC: |
A21C1/065 (EP,US);
B01F27/2322 (US);
B01F27/2123 (EP,US);
B01F27/702 (EP,US);
B01F33/4531 (EP,US);
B01F35/33 (EP,US);
B29B7/482 (EP,US);
B29B7/483 (EP,US);
B29B7/58 (EP,US);
B01F2035/352 (EP,US);
B29C48/2526 (EP,US);
B29C48/402 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2015/15] | B01F15/00, B01F7/02, B01F7/04, B01F7/08 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2015/15] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | KNETMASCHINE | [2015/15] | English: | KNEADING MACHINE | [2015/15] | French: | PÉTRIN | [2015/15] | Entry into regional phase | 22.12.2014 | Translation filed | 22.12.2014 | National basic fee paid | 22.12.2014 | Search fee paid | 22.12.2014 | Designation fee(s) paid | 22.12.2014 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 22.12.2014 | Examination requested [2015/15] | 12.01.2016 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 24.11.2016 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 22.02.2017 | Fee for grant paid | 22.02.2017 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 22.02.2017 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 24.11.2016 | Opposition(s) | 15.01.2018 | No opposition filed within time limit [2018/12] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.12.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.06.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.03.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 04.06.2012 | AL | 12.04.2017 | AT | 12.04.2017 | CY | 12.04.2017 | CZ | 12.04.2017 | DK | 12.04.2017 | EE | 12.04.2017 | ES | 12.04.2017 | FI | 12.04.2017 | HR | 12.04.2017 | IT | 12.04.2017 | LT | 12.04.2017 | LV | 12.04.2017 | MC | 12.04.2017 | MK | 12.04.2017 | NL | 12.04.2017 | PL | 12.04.2017 | PT | 12.04.2017 | RO | 12.04.2017 | RS | 12.04.2017 | SE | 12.04.2017 | SI | 12.04.2017 | SK | 12.04.2017 | SM | 12.04.2017 | TR | 12.04.2017 | IE | 04.06.2017 | LU | 04.06.2017 | MT | 04.06.2017 | BE | 30.06.2017 | FR | 30.06.2017 | BG | 12.07.2017 | GB | 12.07.2017 | NO | 12.07.2017 | GR | 13.07.2017 | IS | 12.08.2017 | [2020/34] |
Former [2020/28] | HU | 04.06.2012 | |
AT | 12.04.2017 | ||
CY | 12.04.2017 | ||
CZ | 12.04.2017 | ||
DK | 12.04.2017 | ||
EE | 12.04.2017 | ||
ES | 12.04.2017 | ||
FI | 12.04.2017 | ||
HR | 12.04.2017 | ||
IT | 12.04.2017 | ||
LT | 12.04.2017 | ||
LV | 12.04.2017 | ||
MC | 12.04.2017 | ||
MK | 12.04.2017 | ||
NL | 12.04.2017 | ||
PL | 12.04.2017 | ||
PT | 12.04.2017 | ||
RO | 12.04.2017 | ||
RS | 12.04.2017 | ||
SE | 12.04.2017 | ||
SI | 12.04.2017 | ||
SK | 12.04.2017 | ||
SM | 12.04.2017 | ||
TR | 12.04.2017 | ||
IE | 04.06.2017 | ||
LU | 04.06.2017 | ||
MT | 04.06.2017 | ||
BE | 30.06.2017 | ||
FR | 30.06.2017 | ||
BG | 12.07.2017 | ||
GB | 12.07.2017 | ||
NO | 12.07.2017 | ||
GR | 13.07.2017 | ||
IS | 12.08.2017 | ||
Former [2020/15] | HU | 04.06.2012 | |
AT | 12.04.2017 | ||
CY | 12.04.2017 | ||
CZ | 12.04.2017 | ||
DK | 12.04.2017 | ||
EE | 12.04.2017 | ||
ES | 12.04.2017 | ||
FI | 12.04.2017 | ||
HR | 12.04.2017 | ||
IT | 12.04.2017 | ||
LT | 12.04.2017 | ||
LV | 12.04.2017 | ||
MC | 12.04.2017 | ||
MK | 12.04.2017 | ||
NL | 12.04.2017 | ||
PL | 12.04.2017 | ||
RO | 12.04.2017 | ||
RS | 12.04.2017 | ||
SE | 12.04.2017 | ||
SI | 12.04.2017 | ||
SK | 12.04.2017 | ||
SM | 12.04.2017 | ||
TR | 12.04.2017 | ||
IE | 04.06.2017 | ||
LU | 04.06.2017 | ||
MT | 04.06.2017 | ||
BE | 30.06.2017 | ||
FR | 30.06.2017 | ||
BG | 12.07.2017 | ||
GB | 12.07.2017 | ||
NO | 12.07.2017 | ||
GR | 13.07.2017 | ||
IS | 12.08.2017 | ||
Former [2019/51] | HU | 04.06.2012 | |
AT | 12.04.2017 | ||
CY | 12.04.2017 | ||
CZ | 12.04.2017 | ||
DK | 12.04.2017 | ||
EE | 12.04.2017 | ||
ES | 12.04.2017 | ||
FI | 12.04.2017 | ||
HR | 12.04.2017 | ||
IT | 12.04.2017 | ||
LT | 12.04.2017 | ||
LV | 12.04.2017 | ||
MC | 12.04.2017 | ||
MK | 12.04.2017 | ||
NL | 12.04.2017 | ||
PL | 12.04.2017 | ||
RO | 12.04.2017 | ||
RS | 12.04.2017 | ||
SE | 12.04.2017 | ||
SI | 12.04.2017 | ||
SK | 12.04.2017 | ||
SM | 12.04.2017 | ||
IE | 04.06.2017 | ||
LU | 04.06.2017 | ||
MT | 04.06.2017 | ||
BE | 30.06.2017 | ||
FR | 30.06.2017 | ||
BG | 12.07.2017 | ||
GB | 12.07.2017 | ||
NO | 12.07.2017 | ||
GR | 13.07.2017 | ||
IS | 12.08.2017 | ||
Former [2019/48] | HU | 04.06.2012 | |
AT | 12.04.2017 | ||
CY | 12.04.2017 | ||
CZ | 12.04.2017 | ||
DK | 12.04.2017 | ||
EE | 12.04.2017 | ||
ES | 12.04.2017 | ||
FI | 12.04.2017 | ||
HR | 12.04.2017 | ||
IT | 12.04.2017 | ||
LT | 12.04.2017 | ||
LV | 12.04.2017 | ||
MC | 12.04.2017 | ||
NL | 12.04.2017 | ||
PL | 12.04.2017 | ||
RO | 12.04.2017 | ||
RS | 12.04.2017 | ||
SE | 12.04.2017 | ||
SI | 12.04.2017 | ||
SK | 12.04.2017 | ||
SM | 12.04.2017 | ||
IE | 04.06.2017 | ||
LU | 04.06.2017 | ||
MT | 04.06.2017 | ||
BE | 30.06.2017 | ||
FR | 30.06.2017 | ||
BG | 12.07.2017 | ||
GB | 12.07.2017 | ||
NO | 12.07.2017 | ||
GR | 13.07.2017 | ||
IS | 12.08.2017 | ||
Former [2019/31] | HU | 04.06.2012 | |
AT | 12.04.2017 | ||
CZ | 12.04.2017 | ||
DK | 12.04.2017 | ||
EE | 12.04.2017 | ||
ES | 12.04.2017 | ||
FI | 12.04.2017 | ||
HR | 12.04.2017 | ||
IT | 12.04.2017 | ||
LT | 12.04.2017 | ||
LV | 12.04.2017 | ||
MC | 12.04.2017 | ||
NL | 12.04.2017 | ||
PL | 12.04.2017 | ||
RO | 12.04.2017 | ||
RS | 12.04.2017 | ||
SE | 12.04.2017 | ||
SI | 12.04.2017 | ||
SK | 12.04.2017 | ||
SM | 12.04.2017 | ||
IE | 04.06.2017 | ||
LU | 04.06.2017 | ||
MT | 04.06.2017 | ||
BE | 30.06.2017 | ||
FR | 30.06.2017 | ||
BG | 12.07.2017 | ||
GB | 12.07.2017 | ||
NO | 12.07.2017 | ||
GR | 13.07.2017 | ||
IS | 12.08.2017 | ||
Former [2018/43] | AT | 12.04.2017 | |
CZ | 12.04.2017 | ||
DK | 12.04.2017 | ||
EE | 12.04.2017 | ||
ES | 12.04.2017 | ||
FI | 12.04.2017 | ||
HR | 12.04.2017 | ||
IT | 12.04.2017 | ||
LT | 12.04.2017 | ||
LV | 12.04.2017 | ||
MC | 12.04.2017 | ||
NL | 12.04.2017 | ||
PL | 12.04.2017 | ||
RO | 12.04.2017 | ||
RS | 12.04.2017 | ||
SE | 12.04.2017 | ||
SI | 12.04.2017 | ||
SK | 12.04.2017 | ||
SM | 12.04.2017 | ||
IE | 04.06.2017 | ||
LU | 04.06.2017 | ||
MT | 04.06.2017 | ||
BE | 30.06.2017 | ||
FR | 30.06.2017 | ||
BG | 12.07.2017 | ||
GB | 12.07.2017 | ||
NO | 12.07.2017 | ||
GR | 13.07.2017 | ||
IS | 12.08.2017 | ||
Former [2018/39] | AT | 12.04.2017 | |
CZ | 12.04.2017 | ||
DK | 12.04.2017 | ||
EE | 12.04.2017 | ||
ES | 12.04.2017 | ||
FI | 12.04.2017 | ||
HR | 12.04.2017 | ||
IT | 12.04.2017 | ||
LT | 12.04.2017 | ||
LV | 12.04.2017 | ||
MC | 12.04.2017 | ||
NL | 12.04.2017 | ||
PL | 12.04.2017 | ||
RO | 12.04.2017 | ||
RS | 12.04.2017 | ||
SE | 12.04.2017 | ||
SI | 12.04.2017 | ||
SK | 12.04.2017 | ||
SM | 12.04.2017 | ||
IE | 04.06.2017 | ||
LU | 04.06.2017 | ||
BE | 30.06.2017 | ||
FR | 30.06.2017 | ||
BG | 12.07.2017 | ||
GB | 12.07.2017 | ||
NO | 12.07.2017 | ||
GR | 13.07.2017 | ||
IS | 12.08.2017 | ||
Former [2018/25] | AT | 12.04.2017 | |
CZ | 12.04.2017 | ||
DK | 12.04.2017 | ||
EE | 12.04.2017 | ||
ES | 12.04.2017 | ||
FI | 12.04.2017 | ||
HR | 12.04.2017 | ||
IT | 12.04.2017 | ||
LT | 12.04.2017 | ||
LV | 12.04.2017 | ||
MC | 12.04.2017 | ||
NL | 12.04.2017 | ||
PL | 12.04.2017 | ||
RO | 12.04.2017 | ||
RS | 12.04.2017 | ||
SE | 12.04.2017 | ||
SI | 12.04.2017 | ||
SK | 12.04.2017 | ||
SM | 12.04.2017 | ||
IE | 04.06.2017 | ||
LU | 04.06.2017 | ||
FR | 30.06.2017 | ||
BG | 12.07.2017 | ||
GB | 12.07.2017 | ||
NO | 12.07.2017 | ||
GR | 13.07.2017 | ||
IS | 12.08.2017 | ||
Former [2018/21] | AT | 12.04.2017 | |
CZ | 12.04.2017 | ||
DK | 12.04.2017 | ||
EE | 12.04.2017 | ||
ES | 12.04.2017 | ||
FI | 12.04.2017 | ||
HR | 12.04.2017 | ||
IT | 12.04.2017 | ||
LT | 12.04.2017 | ||
LV | 12.04.2017 | ||
MC | 12.04.2017 | ||
NL | 12.04.2017 | ||
PL | 12.04.2017 | ||
RO | 12.04.2017 | ||
RS | 12.04.2017 | ||
SE | 12.04.2017 | ||
SK | 12.04.2017 | ||
SM | 12.04.2017 | ||
LU | 04.06.2017 | ||
BG | 12.07.2017 | ||
GB | 12.07.2017 | ||
NO | 12.07.2017 | ||
GR | 13.07.2017 | ||
IS | 12.08.2017 | ||
Former [2018/11] | AT | 12.04.2017 | |
CZ | 12.04.2017 | ||
DK | 12.04.2017 | ||
EE | 12.04.2017 | ||
ES | 12.04.2017 | ||
FI | 12.04.2017 | ||
HR | 12.04.2017 | ||
IT | 12.04.2017 | ||
LT | 12.04.2017 | ||
LV | 12.04.2017 | ||
MC | 12.04.2017 | ||
NL | 12.04.2017 | ||
PL | 12.04.2017 | ||
RO | 12.04.2017 | ||
RS | 12.04.2017 | ||
SE | 12.04.2017 | ||
SK | 12.04.2017 | ||
SM | 12.04.2017 | ||
BG | 12.07.2017 | ||
NO | 12.07.2017 | ||
GR | 13.07.2017 | ||
IS | 12.08.2017 | ||
Former [2018/10] | AT | 12.04.2017 | |
CZ | 12.04.2017 | ||
DK | 12.04.2017 | ||
EE | 12.04.2017 | ||
ES | 12.04.2017 | ||
FI | 12.04.2017 | ||
HR | 12.04.2017 | ||
LT | 12.04.2017 | ||
LV | 12.04.2017 | ||
MC | 12.04.2017 | ||
NL | 12.04.2017 | ||
PL | 12.04.2017 | ||
RO | 12.04.2017 | ||
RS | 12.04.2017 | ||
SE | 12.04.2017 | ||
SK | 12.04.2017 | ||
BG | 12.07.2017 | ||
NO | 12.07.2017 | ||
GR | 13.07.2017 | ||
IS | 12.08.2017 | ||
Former [2018/09] | AT | 12.04.2017 | |
DK | 12.04.2017 | ||
EE | 12.04.2017 | ||
ES | 12.04.2017 | ||
FI | 12.04.2017 | ||
HR | 12.04.2017 | ||
LT | 12.04.2017 | ||
LV | 12.04.2017 | ||
NL | 12.04.2017 | ||
PL | 12.04.2017 | ||
RS | 12.04.2017 | ||
SE | 12.04.2017 | ||
BG | 12.07.2017 | ||
NO | 12.07.2017 | ||
GR | 13.07.2017 | ||
IS | 12.08.2017 | ||
Former [2017/50] | AT | 12.04.2017 | |
ES | 12.04.2017 | ||
FI | 12.04.2017 | ||
HR | 12.04.2017 | ||
LT | 12.04.2017 | ||
LV | 12.04.2017 | ||
NL | 12.04.2017 | ||
PL | 12.04.2017 | ||
RS | 12.04.2017 | ||
SE | 12.04.2017 | ||
BG | 12.07.2017 | ||
NO | 12.07.2017 | ||
GR | 13.07.2017 | ||
IS | 12.08.2017 | ||
Former [2017/49] | AT | 12.04.2017 | |
ES | 12.04.2017 | ||
FI | 12.04.2017 | ||
HR | 12.04.2017 | ||
LT | 12.04.2017 | ||
NL | 12.04.2017 | ||
NO | 12.07.2017 | ||
GR | 13.07.2017 | ||
IS | 12.08.2017 | ||
Former [2017/48] | NL | 12.04.2017 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US3618902 (BRENNAN AMBROSE K JR) [A] 1 * abstract * * figures 1-3 *; | [A]JPH03127618 (TOYO ENGINEERING CORP) [A] 1 * abstract ** figure 2b *; | [A]DE4226133 (DESCH KG HEINRICH [DE]) [A] 1 * abstract * * figures 1-4 *; | [A]US2002163855 (BEEBE CLARK A [US]) [A] 1 * figure 3 * * paragraph [0009] *; | [A]JP2003336695 (SEISA GEAR LTD) [A] 1 * abstract * * figures 1-3 *; | [AD]JP3744873B (KURIMOTO LTD) [AD] 1 * figure 1 * * paragraph [0023] * | International search | [Y]JPH03127618 (TOYO ENGINEERING CORP); | [Y]JP2003336695 (SEISA GEAR LTD); | [Y]JP2012040523 (KURIMOTO LTD) | by applicant | JP3744873B |