EP2770654 - DISASTER RECOVERY METHOD, DEVICE AND DISASTER RECOVERY SYSTEM OF OPTICAL COMMUNICATION SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 27.05.2016 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.05.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 29.06.2016 [2016/26] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Huawei Marine Networks Co., Limited 5th-6th Floor, W3C Building West Section, Finance Ave. No. 3 Street Economic-Technological Development Area Tianjin, 300457 / CN | [N/P] |
Former [2014/35] | For all designated states Huawei Marine Networks Co., Limited 5th-6th Floor, W3C Building West Section Finance Ave. No. 3 Street Economic-Technological Development Area Tianjin 300457 / CN | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ZHANG, Wendou Huawei Administration Building Bantian Longgang Shenzhen Guangdong 518129 / CN | 02 /
MA, Liping Huawei Administration Building Bantian Longgang Shenzhen Guangdong 518129 / CN | 03 /
ZHANG, Likun Huawei Administration Building Bantian Longgang Shenzhen Guangdong 518129 / CN | [2014/35] | Representative(s) | Thun, Clemens Mitscherlich PartmbB Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Karlstraße 7 80333 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2014/35] | Thun, Clemens Mitscherlich PartmbB Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Sonnenstraße 33 80331 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 12878754.6 | 15.06.2012 | WO2012CN76979 | Filing language | ZH | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2013185338 | Date: | 19.12.2013 | Language: | ZH | [2013/51] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2770654 | Date: | 27.08.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/35] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 19.12.2013 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 17.11.2014 | Classification | IPC: | H04J14/02, H04B10/079, H04B10/035 | [2014/51] | CPC: |
H04J14/0201 (EP,US);
H04B10/035 (US);
H04B10/0791 (EP,US);
H04J14/0202 (US);
H04J14/0221 (EP,US);
H04J14/0291 (EP,US);
H04J14/0294 (US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2014/35] | H04J14/02 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2014/35] | Title | German: | NOTFALLWIEDERHERSTELLUNGSVERFAHREN, -VORRICHTUNG UND -SYSTEM FÜR EIN OPTISCHES KOMMUNIKATIONSSYSTEM | [2014/35] | English: | DISASTER RECOVERY METHOD, DEVICE AND DISASTER RECOVERY SYSTEM OF OPTICAL COMMUNICATION SYSTEM | [2014/35] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE REPRISE APRÈS SINISTRE, DISPOSITIF ET SYSTÈME DE REPRISE APRÈS SINISTRE POUR SYSTÈME DE COMMUNICATION OPTIQUE | [2014/35] | Entry into regional phase | 19.05.2014 | Translation filed | 19.05.2014 | National basic fee paid | 19.05.2014 | Search fee paid | 19.05.2014 | Designation fee(s) paid | 19.05.2014 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 19.05.2014 | Examination requested [2014/35] | 12.06.2015 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 14.09.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 26.01.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2016/26] | 22.02.2016 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2016/26] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 14.09.2015 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.05.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.06.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]EP1241806 (MITSUBISHI ELECTRIC CORP [JP]); | [X]US2011076017 (MIDORIKAWA YUHIRO [JP], et al) | International search | [A]CN1318925 (UNIV BEIJING POST & TELECOMM [CN]); | [X]CN1529450 (FENGHUO COMM SCI & TECH CO LTD [CN]); | [A]US2011200324 (BOERTJES DAVID [CA], et al) |