EP2844822 - JUMPER TUBE LOCKING ASSEMBLY AND METHOD [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 10.05.2019 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 01.06.2018 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 08.03.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.07.2022 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 03.08.2022 [2022/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Halliburton Energy Services, Inc. 10200 Bellaire Boulevard Houston, TX 77072 / US | [2015/11] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LEAST, Brandon, T. 3218 Jubilee Trail Dallas, Texas 75229 / US | 02 /
GANO, John, C. 2015 White Ash Road Carrollton, Texas 75007 / US | 03 /
LOPEZ, Jean Marc 7308 Stoddard Lane Plano, Texas 75025 / US | [2015/11] | Representative(s) | Hoffmann Eitle Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB Arabellastraße 30 81925 München / DE | [2015/11] | Application number, filing date | 12879037.5 | 11.06.2012 | [2018/27] | WO2012US41967 | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2013187876 | Date: | 19.12.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/51] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2844822 | Date: | 11.03.2015 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 19.12.2013 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2015/11] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2844822 | Date: | 04.07.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/27] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 19.12.2013 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.02.2016 | Classification | IPC: | E21B43/04 | [2016/10] | CPC: |
E21B43/04 (EP,CN,US);
E21B17/18 (US);
E21B17/02 (EP,CN,US);
E21B43/08 (US);
E21B33/12 (US)
|
Former IPC [2015/11] | E21B19/16, E21B29/12, E21B17/02 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2015/11] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERRIEGELUNGSANORDNUNG FÜR ÜBERBRÜCKUNGSROHR UND VERFAHREN | [2015/11] | English: | JUMPER TUBE LOCKING ASSEMBLY AND METHOD | [2015/11] | French: | ENSEMBLE ET PROCÉDÉ DE VERROUILLAGE DE TUBE DE RACCORDEMENT | [2015/11] | Entry into regional phase | 03.12.2014 | National basic fee paid | 03.12.2014 | Search fee paid | 03.12.2014 | Designation fee(s) paid | 03.12.2014 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 03.12.2014 | Examination requested [2015/11] | 23.08.2016 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 09.03.2018 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 28.05.2018 | Fee for grant paid | 28.05.2018 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 28.05.2018 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 09.03.2018 | Opposition(s) | 05.04.2019 | No opposition filed within time limit [2019/24] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 03.12.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 05.06.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.03.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 31.03.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 03.04.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 11.06.2012 | AL | 04.07.2018 | AT | 04.07.2018 | CY | 04.07.2018 | CZ | 04.07.2018 | DK | 04.07.2018 | EE | 04.07.2018 | ES | 04.07.2018 | FI | 04.07.2018 | HR | 04.07.2018 | IT | 04.07.2018 | LT | 04.07.2018 | LV | 04.07.2018 | MC | 04.07.2018 | MK | 04.07.2018 | MT | 04.07.2018 | NL | 04.07.2018 | PL | 04.07.2018 | RO | 04.07.2018 | RS | 04.07.2018 | SE | 04.07.2018 | SI | 04.07.2018 | SK | 04.07.2018 | SM | 04.07.2018 | TR | 04.07.2018 | BG | 04.10.2018 | GR | 05.10.2018 | IS | 04.11.2018 | PT | 04.11.2018 | [2022/31] |
Former [2021/34] | HU | 11.06.2012 | |
AL | 04.07.2018 | ||
AT | 04.07.2018 | ||
CY | 04.07.2018 | ||
CZ | 04.07.2018 | ||
DK | 04.07.2018 | ||
EE | 04.07.2018 | ||
ES | 04.07.2018 | ||
FI | 04.07.2018 | ||
HR | 04.07.2018 | ||
IT | 04.07.2018 | ||
LT | 04.07.2018 | ||
LV | 04.07.2018 | ||
MC | 04.07.2018 | ||
MT | 04.07.2018 | ||
NL | 04.07.2018 | ||
PL | 04.07.2018 | ||
RO | 04.07.2018 | ||
RS | 04.07.2018 | ||
SE | 04.07.2018 | ||
SI | 04.07.2018 | ||
SK | 04.07.2018 | ||
SM | 04.07.2018 | ||
TR | 04.07.2018 | ||
BG | 04.10.2018 | ||
GR | 05.10.2018 | ||
IS | 04.11.2018 | ||
PT | 04.11.2018 | ||
Former [2021/32] | HU | 11.06.2012 | |
AL | 04.07.2018 | ||
AT | 04.07.2018 | ||
CY | 04.07.2018 | ||
CZ | 04.07.2018 | ||
DK | 04.07.2018 | ||
EE | 04.07.2018 | ||
ES | 04.07.2018 | ||
FI | 04.07.2018 | ||
HR | 04.07.2018 | ||
IT | 04.07.2018 | ||
LT | 04.07.2018 | ||
LV | 04.07.2018 | ||
MC | 04.07.2018 | ||
NL | 04.07.2018 | ||
PL | 04.07.2018 | ||
RO | 04.07.2018 | ||
RS | 04.07.2018 | ||
SE | 04.07.2018 | ||
SI | 04.07.2018 | ||
SK | 04.07.2018 | ||
SM | 04.07.2018 | ||
TR | 04.07.2018 | ||
BG | 04.10.2018 | ||
GR | 05.10.2018 | ||
IS | 04.11.2018 | ||
PT | 04.11.2018 | ||
Former [2021/26] | AL | 04.07.2018 | |
AT | 04.07.2018 | ||
CY | 04.07.2018 | ||
CZ | 04.07.2018 | ||
DK | 04.07.2018 | ||
EE | 04.07.2018 | ||
ES | 04.07.2018 | ||
FI | 04.07.2018 | ||
HR | 04.07.2018 | ||
IT | 04.07.2018 | ||
LT | 04.07.2018 | ||
LV | 04.07.2018 | ||
MC | 04.07.2018 | ||
NL | 04.07.2018 | ||
PL | 04.07.2018 | ||
RO | 04.07.2018 | ||
RS | 04.07.2018 | ||
SE | 04.07.2018 | ||
SI | 04.07.2018 | ||
SK | 04.07.2018 | ||
SM | 04.07.2018 | ||
TR | 04.07.2018 | ||
BG | 04.10.2018 | ||
GR | 05.10.2018 | ||
IS | 04.11.2018 | ||
PT | 04.11.2018 | ||
Former [2020/29] | AL | 04.07.2018 | |
AT | 04.07.2018 | ||
CZ | 04.07.2018 | ||
DK | 04.07.2018 | ||
EE | 04.07.2018 | ||
ES | 04.07.2018 | ||
FI | 04.07.2018 | ||
HR | 04.07.2018 | ||
IT | 04.07.2018 | ||
LT | 04.07.2018 | ||
LV | 04.07.2018 | ||
MC | 04.07.2018 | ||
NL | 04.07.2018 | ||
PL | 04.07.2018 | ||
RO | 04.07.2018 | ||
RS | 04.07.2018 | ||
SE | 04.07.2018 | ||
SI | 04.07.2018 | ||
SK | 04.07.2018 | ||
SM | 04.07.2018 | ||
TR | 04.07.2018 | ||
BG | 04.10.2018 | ||
GR | 05.10.2018 | ||
IS | 04.11.2018 | ||
PT | 04.11.2018 | ||
Former [2020/16] | AL | 04.07.2018 | |
AT | 04.07.2018 | ||
CZ | 04.07.2018 | ||
DK | 04.07.2018 | ||
EE | 04.07.2018 | ||
ES | 04.07.2018 | ||
FI | 04.07.2018 | ||
HR | 04.07.2018 | ||
IT | 04.07.2018 | ||
LT | 04.07.2018 | ||
LV | 04.07.2018 | ||
MC | 04.07.2018 | ||
NL | 04.07.2018 | ||
PL | 04.07.2018 | ||
RO | 04.07.2018 | ||
RS | 04.07.2018 | ||
SE | 04.07.2018 | ||
SI | 04.07.2018 | ||
SK | 04.07.2018 | ||
SM | 04.07.2018 | ||
TR | 04.07.2018 | ||
BG | 04.10.2018 | ||
GR | 05.10.2018 | ||
IS | 04.11.2018 | ||
Former [2020/08] | AL | 04.07.2018 | |
AT | 04.07.2018 | ||
CZ | 04.07.2018 | ||
DK | 04.07.2018 | ||
EE | 04.07.2018 | ||
ES | 04.07.2018 | ||
FI | 04.07.2018 | ||
HR | 04.07.2018 | ||
IT | 04.07.2018 | ||
LT | 04.07.2018 | ||
LV | 04.07.2018 | ||
MC | 04.07.2018 | ||
NL | 04.07.2018 | ||
PL | 04.07.2018 | ||
RO | 04.07.2018 | ||
RS | 04.07.2018 | ||
SE | 04.07.2018 | ||
SI | 04.07.2018 | ||
SK | 04.07.2018 | ||
SM | 04.07.2018 | ||
BG | 04.10.2018 | ||
GR | 05.10.2018 | ||
IS | 04.11.2018 | ||
Former [2019/37] | AL | 04.07.2018 | |
AT | 04.07.2018 | ||
CZ | 04.07.2018 | ||
DK | 04.07.2018 | ||
EE | 04.07.2018 | ||
ES | 04.07.2018 | ||
FI | 04.07.2018 | ||
HR | 04.07.2018 | ||
IT | 04.07.2018 | ||
LT | 04.07.2018 | ||
LV | 04.07.2018 | ||
NL | 04.07.2018 | ||
PL | 04.07.2018 | ||
RO | 04.07.2018 | ||
RS | 04.07.2018 | ||
SE | 04.07.2018 | ||
SI | 04.07.2018 | ||
SK | 04.07.2018 | ||
SM | 04.07.2018 | ||
BG | 04.10.2018 | ||
GR | 05.10.2018 | ||
IS | 04.11.2018 | ||
Former [2019/26] | AL | 04.07.2018 | |
AT | 04.07.2018 | ||
CZ | 04.07.2018 | ||
DK | 04.07.2018 | ||
EE | 04.07.2018 | ||
ES | 04.07.2018 | ||
FI | 04.07.2018 | ||
HR | 04.07.2018 | ||
IT | 04.07.2018 | ||
LT | 04.07.2018 | ||
LV | 04.07.2018 | ||
NL | 04.07.2018 | ||
PL | 04.07.2018 | ||
RO | 04.07.2018 | ||
RS | 04.07.2018 | ||
SE | 04.07.2018 | ||
SK | 04.07.2018 | ||
SM | 04.07.2018 | ||
BG | 04.10.2018 | ||
GR | 05.10.2018 | ||
IS | 04.11.2018 | ||
Former [2019/24] | AL | 04.07.2018 | |
AT | 04.07.2018 | ||
CZ | 04.07.2018 | ||
EE | 04.07.2018 | ||
ES | 04.07.2018 | ||
FI | 04.07.2018 | ||
HR | 04.07.2018 | ||
IT | 04.07.2018 | ||
LT | 04.07.2018 | ||
LV | 04.07.2018 | ||
NL | 04.07.2018 | ||
PL | 04.07.2018 | ||
RO | 04.07.2018 | ||
RS | 04.07.2018 | ||
SE | 04.07.2018 | ||
SK | 04.07.2018 | ||
BG | 04.10.2018 | ||
GR | 05.10.2018 | ||
IS | 04.11.2018 | ||
Former [2019/22] | AL | 04.07.2018 | |
AT | 04.07.2018 | ||
CZ | 04.07.2018 | ||
ES | 04.07.2018 | ||
FI | 04.07.2018 | ||
HR | 04.07.2018 | ||
IT | 04.07.2018 | ||
LT | 04.07.2018 | ||
LV | 04.07.2018 | ||
NL | 04.07.2018 | ||
PL | 04.07.2018 | ||
RO | 04.07.2018 | ||
RS | 04.07.2018 | ||
SE | 04.07.2018 | ||
BG | 04.10.2018 | ||
GR | 05.10.2018 | ||
IS | 04.11.2018 | ||
Former [2019/21] | AL | 04.07.2018 | |
AT | 04.07.2018 | ||
CZ | 04.07.2018 | ||
ES | 04.07.2018 | ||
FI | 04.07.2018 | ||
HR | 04.07.2018 | ||
IT | 04.07.2018 | ||
LT | 04.07.2018 | ||
LV | 04.07.2018 | ||
NL | 04.07.2018 | ||
PL | 04.07.2018 | ||
RS | 04.07.2018 | ||
SE | 04.07.2018 | ||
BG | 04.10.2018 | ||
GR | 05.10.2018 | ||
IS | 04.11.2018 | ||
Former [2019/12] | AL | 04.07.2018 | |
AT | 04.07.2018 | ||
CZ | 04.07.2018 | ||
ES | 04.07.2018 | ||
FI | 04.07.2018 | ||
HR | 04.07.2018 | ||
LT | 04.07.2018 | ||
LV | 04.07.2018 | ||
NL | 04.07.2018 | ||
PL | 04.07.2018 | ||
RS | 04.07.2018 | ||
SE | 04.07.2018 | ||
BG | 04.10.2018 | ||
GR | 05.10.2018 | ||
IS | 04.11.2018 | ||
Former [2019/11] | AT | 04.07.2018 | |
CZ | 04.07.2018 | ||
FI | 04.07.2018 | ||
HR | 04.07.2018 | ||
LT | 04.07.2018 | ||
NL | 04.07.2018 | ||
PL | 04.07.2018 | ||
RS | 04.07.2018 | ||
SE | 04.07.2018 | ||
BG | 04.10.2018 | ||
GR | 05.10.2018 | ||
IS | 04.11.2018 | ||
Former [2019/10] | AT | 04.07.2018 | |
CZ | 04.07.2018 | ||
FI | 04.07.2018 | ||
LT | 04.07.2018 | ||
NL | 04.07.2018 | ||
PL | 04.07.2018 | ||
RS | 04.07.2018 | ||
SE | 04.07.2018 | ||
BG | 04.10.2018 | ||
GR | 05.10.2018 | ||
IS | 04.11.2018 | ||
Former [2019/08] | FI | 04.07.2018 | |
LT | 04.07.2018 | ||
NL | 04.07.2018 | ||
IS | 04.11.2018 | ||
Former [2019/07] | LT | 04.07.2018 | |
NL | 04.07.2018 | ||
Former [2019/04] | NL | 04.07.2018 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US3964771 (BAUDOUIN JEAN PIERRE) [X] 1-3,5,6,9 * figures 1, 2 *; | [X]GB2021223 (BAXTER TRAVENOL LAB) [X] 1-3,5,6,9 * figures 3, 4 *; | [A]GB2218169 (PUTCH SAMUEL W [US], et al) [A] 1-12* figure 1. 2 *; | [A]US5390966 (COX LARRY L [US], et al) [A] 1-12 * figures 2, 4 *; | [A]US2005200127 (JOHNSON CRAIG D [US], et al) [A] 1-12 * figures 5, 6, 10, 12, 15 *; | [XI]GB2427213 (WEATHERFORD LAMB [US]) [X] 1-6,9-12 * figures 2, 3, 5 * [I] 7,8; | [A]WO2010028158 (SCHLUMBERGER CA LTD [CA], et al) [A] 1-12 * figures 1-6 * | International search | [X]US5341880 (THORSTENSEN EGIL [NO], et al); | [A]US2006283604 (SETTERBERG JOHN R JR [US], et al); | [A]US2010163250 (SCHULTZ ROGER L [US], et al); | [A]US7784532 (SEVRE ALF K [US], et al) | by applicant | US3964771 | GB2021223 | GB2427213 |