EP2869650 - METHODS AND BASE STATIONs FOR ACHIEVING TIME DIVISION DUPLEX CONFIGURATION OF AUXILIARY CELL [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2015/19] | METHOD, BASE STATION AND SYSTEM FOR ACHIEVING TIME DIVISION DUPLEX CONFIGURATION OF AUXILIARY CELL | ||
[2017/08] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 13.07.2018 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 04.08.2017 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 12.02.2017 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 14.11.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.07.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL | published on 19.08.2020 [2020/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Huawei Technologies Co., Ltd. Huawei Administration Building Bantian Longgang District Shenzhen, Guangdong 518129 / CN | [2015/19] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ZHANG, Tao Huawei Administration Building Bantian Longgang District Shenzhen Guangdong 518129 / CN | 02 /
LIN, Bo Huawei Administration Building Bantian Longgang District Shenzhen Guangdong 518129 / CN | [2015/19] | Representative(s) | Maiwald GmbH Elisenhof Elisenstraße 3 80335 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2015/19] | Maiwald Patentanwalts GmbH Elisenhof Elisenstrasse 3 80335 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 12881211.2 | 20.07.2012 | [2017/36] | WO2012CN78984 | Filing language | ZH | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2014012259 | Date: | 23.01.2014 | Language: | ZH | [2014/04] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2869650 | Date: | 06.05.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/19] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2869650 | Date: | 06.09.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/36] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 23.01.2014 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.05.2015 | Classification | IPC: | H04L5/14 | [2017/09] | CPC: |
H04W72/0446 (EP,CN,KR,US);
H04W72/23 (EP,CN,KR,US);
H04L5/1469 (CN,US);
H04B7/2643 (KR);
H04L5/14 (KR,US);
H04W72/20 (US);
|
Former IPC [2015/19] | H04W72/04 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2015/19] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND BASISSTATIONEN ZUR ERZIELUNG EINER ZEITDUPLEXKONFIGURATION VON HILFSZELLEN | [2017/08] | English: | METHODS AND BASE STATIONs FOR ACHIEVING TIME DIVISION DUPLEX CONFIGURATION OF AUXILIARY CELL | [2017/08] | French: | PROCÉDÉS ET STATIONS DE BASE POUR OBTENIR UNE CONFIGURATION DE DUPLEXAGE PAR RÉPARTITION TEMPORELLE D'UNE CELLULE AUXILIAIRE | [2017/08] |
Former [2015/19] | VERFAHREN, BASISSTATION UND SYSTEM ZUR ERZIELUNG EINER ZEITDUPLEXKONFIGURATION VON HILFSZELLEN | ||
Former [2015/19] | METHOD, BASE STATION AND SYSTEM FOR ACHIEVING TIME DIVISION DUPLEX CONFIGURATION OF AUXILIARY CELL | ||
Former [2015/19] | PROCÉDÉ, STATION DE BASE ET SYSTÈME POUR OBTENIR UNE CONFIGURATION DE DUPLEXAGE PAR RÉPARTITION TEMPORELLE D'UNE CELLULE AUXILIAIRE | Entry into regional phase | 27.01.2015 | Translation filed | 27.01.2015 | National basic fee paid | 27.01.2015 | Search fee paid | 27.01.2015 | Designation fee(s) paid | 27.01.2015 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 27.01.2015 | Examination requested [2015/19] | 20.11.2015 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 12.02.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 24.05.2016 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.08.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 07.11.2016 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.02.2017 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 25.05.2017 | Fee for grant paid | 25.05.2017 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 13.06.2017 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 12.02.2016 | Opposition(s) | 07.06.2018 | No opposition filed within time limit [2018/33] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.01.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.07.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.07.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 31.07.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 20.07.2012 | AL | 06.09.2017 | AT | 06.09.2017 | CY | 06.09.2017 | CZ | 06.09.2017 | DK | 06.09.2017 | EE | 06.09.2017 | ES | 06.09.2017 | FI | 06.09.2017 | HR | 06.09.2017 | LT | 06.09.2017 | LV | 06.09.2017 | MC | 06.09.2017 | MK | 06.09.2017 | PL | 06.09.2017 | PT | 06.09.2017 | RO | 06.09.2017 | RS | 06.09.2017 | SE | 06.09.2017 | SI | 06.09.2017 | SK | 06.09.2017 | SM | 06.09.2017 | TR | 06.09.2017 | BG | 06.12.2017 | NO | 06.12.2017 | GR | 07.12.2017 | IS | 06.01.2018 | [2020/34] |
Former [2020/31] | HU | 20.07.2012 | |
AT | 06.09.2017 | ||
CY | 06.09.2017 | ||
CZ | 06.09.2017 | ||
DK | 06.09.2017 | ||
EE | 06.09.2017 | ||
ES | 06.09.2017 | ||
FI | 06.09.2017 | ||
HR | 06.09.2017 | ||
LT | 06.09.2017 | ||
LV | 06.09.2017 | ||
MC | 06.09.2017 | ||
MK | 06.09.2017 | ||
PL | 06.09.2017 | ||
PT | 06.09.2017 | ||
RO | 06.09.2017 | ||
RS | 06.09.2017 | ||
SE | 06.09.2017 | ||
SI | 06.09.2017 | ||
SK | 06.09.2017 | ||
SM | 06.09.2017 | ||
TR | 06.09.2017 | ||
BG | 06.12.2017 | ||
NO | 06.12.2017 | ||
GR | 07.12.2017 | ||
IS | 06.01.2018 | ||
Former [2020/28] | HU | 20.07.2012 | |
AT | 06.09.2017 | ||
CZ | 06.09.2017 | ||
DK | 06.09.2017 | ||
EE | 06.09.2017 | ||
ES | 06.09.2017 | ||
FI | 06.09.2017 | ||
HR | 06.09.2017 | ||
LT | 06.09.2017 | ||
LV | 06.09.2017 | ||
MC | 06.09.2017 | ||
PL | 06.09.2017 | ||
PT | 06.09.2017 | ||
RO | 06.09.2017 | ||
RS | 06.09.2017 | ||
SE | 06.09.2017 | ||
SI | 06.09.2017 | ||
SK | 06.09.2017 | ||
SM | 06.09.2017 | ||
TR | 06.09.2017 | ||
BG | 06.12.2017 | ||
NO | 06.12.2017 | ||
GR | 07.12.2017 | ||
IS | 06.01.2018 | ||
Former [2020/16] | AT | 06.09.2017 | |
CZ | 06.09.2017 | ||
DK | 06.09.2017 | ||
EE | 06.09.2017 | ||
ES | 06.09.2017 | ||
FI | 06.09.2017 | ||
HR | 06.09.2017 | ||
LT | 06.09.2017 | ||
LV | 06.09.2017 | ||
MC | 06.09.2017 | ||
PL | 06.09.2017 | ||
RO | 06.09.2017 | ||
RS | 06.09.2017 | ||
SE | 06.09.2017 | ||
SI | 06.09.2017 | ||
SK | 06.09.2017 | ||
SM | 06.09.2017 | ||
TR | 06.09.2017 | ||
BG | 06.12.2017 | ||
NO | 06.12.2017 | ||
GR | 07.12.2017 | ||
IS | 06.01.2018 | ||
Former [2019/15] | AT | 06.09.2017 | |
CZ | 06.09.2017 | ||
DK | 06.09.2017 | ||
EE | 06.09.2017 | ||
ES | 06.09.2017 | ||
FI | 06.09.2017 | ||
HR | 06.09.2017 | ||
LT | 06.09.2017 | ||
LV | 06.09.2017 | ||
MC | 06.09.2017 | ||
PL | 06.09.2017 | ||
RO | 06.09.2017 | ||
RS | 06.09.2017 | ||
SE | 06.09.2017 | ||
SI | 06.09.2017 | ||
SK | 06.09.2017 | ||
SM | 06.09.2017 | ||
BG | 06.12.2017 | ||
NO | 06.12.2017 | ||
GR | 07.12.2017 | ||
IS | 06.01.2018 | ||
Former [2018/40] | AT | 06.09.2017 | |
CZ | 06.09.2017 | ||
DK | 06.09.2017 | ||
EE | 06.09.2017 | ||
ES | 06.09.2017 | ||
FI | 06.09.2017 | ||
HR | 06.09.2017 | ||
LT | 06.09.2017 | ||
LV | 06.09.2017 | ||
PL | 06.09.2017 | ||
RO | 06.09.2017 | ||
RS | 06.09.2017 | ||
SE | 06.09.2017 | ||
SI | 06.09.2017 | ||
SK | 06.09.2017 | ||
SM | 06.09.2017 | ||
BG | 06.12.2017 | ||
NO | 06.12.2017 | ||
GR | 07.12.2017 | ||
IS | 06.01.2018 | ||
Former [2018/35] | AT | 06.09.2017 | |
CZ | 06.09.2017 | ||
DK | 06.09.2017 | ||
EE | 06.09.2017 | ||
ES | 06.09.2017 | ||
FI | 06.09.2017 | ||
HR | 06.09.2017 | ||
LT | 06.09.2017 | ||
LV | 06.09.2017 | ||
PL | 06.09.2017 | ||
RO | 06.09.2017 | ||
RS | 06.09.2017 | ||
SE | 06.09.2017 | ||
SK | 06.09.2017 | ||
SM | 06.09.2017 | ||
BG | 06.12.2017 | ||
NO | 06.12.2017 | ||
GR | 07.12.2017 | ||
IS | 06.01.2018 | ||
Former [2018/24] | AT | 06.09.2017 | |
CZ | 06.09.2017 | ||
EE | 06.09.2017 | ||
ES | 06.09.2017 | ||
FI | 06.09.2017 | ||
HR | 06.09.2017 | ||
LT | 06.09.2017 | ||
LV | 06.09.2017 | ||
PL | 06.09.2017 | ||
RO | 06.09.2017 | ||
RS | 06.09.2017 | ||
SE | 06.09.2017 | ||
SK | 06.09.2017 | ||
SM | 06.09.2017 | ||
BG | 06.12.2017 | ||
NO | 06.12.2017 | ||
GR | 07.12.2017 | ||
IS | 06.01.2018 | ||
Former [2018/21] | CZ | 06.09.2017 | |
ES | 06.09.2017 | ||
FI | 06.09.2017 | ||
HR | 06.09.2017 | ||
LT | 06.09.2017 | ||
LV | 06.09.2017 | ||
RS | 06.09.2017 | ||
SE | 06.09.2017 | ||
BG | 06.12.2017 | ||
NO | 06.12.2017 | ||
GR | 07.12.2017 | ||
Former [2018/12] | ES | 06.09.2017 | |
FI | 06.09.2017 | ||
HR | 06.09.2017 | ||
LT | 06.09.2017 | ||
LV | 06.09.2017 | ||
RS | 06.09.2017 | ||
SE | 06.09.2017 | ||
BG | 06.12.2017 | ||
NO | 06.12.2017 | ||
GR | 07.12.2017 | ||
Former [2018/11] | ES | 06.09.2017 | |
FI | 06.09.2017 | ||
HR | 06.09.2017 | ||
LT | 06.09.2017 | ||
RS | 06.09.2017 | ||
SE | 06.09.2017 | ||
BG | 06.12.2017 | ||
NO | 06.12.2017 | ||
GR | 07.12.2017 | ||
Former [2018/09] | FI | 06.09.2017 | |
LT | 06.09.2017 | ||
SE | 06.09.2017 | ||
NO | 06.12.2017 | ||
Former [2018/08] | FI | 06.09.2017 | |
LT | 06.09.2017 | ||
NO | 06.12.2017 | ||
Former [2018/07] | LT | 06.09.2017 | |
NO | 06.12.2017 | Documents cited: | Search | [Y] - NOKIA CORPORATION ET AL, "Discussion on Methods to support different time scales for TDD UL-DL reconfiguration", 3GPP DRAFT; R1-122435, 3RD GENERATION PARTNERSHIP PROJECT (3GPP), MOBILE COMPETENCE CENTRE ; 650, ROUTE DES LUCIOLES ; F-06921 SOPHIA-ANTIPOLIS CEDEX ; FRANCE, (20120512), vol. RAN WG1, no. Prague, Czech Republic; 20120521 - 20120525, XP050600689 [Y] 1-14 * page 3, paragraph 2 * | [Y] - ERICSSON ET AL, "Different TDD configurations in inter-band CA", 3GPP DRAFT; R2-121640 DIFFERENT TDD CONFIGURATIONS IN CA, 3RD GENERATION PARTNERSHIP PROJECT (3GPP), MOBILE COMPETENCE CENTRE ; 650, ROUTE DES LUCIOLES ; F-06921 SOPHIA-ANTIPOLIS CEDEX ; FRANCE, (20120320), vol. RAN WG2, no. Jeju, South Korea; 20120326 - 20120330, XP050606385 [Y] 1-14 * paragraph [02.1] * | [A] - ALCATEL-LUCENT SHANGHAI BELL ET AL, "Methods to support different time scales for TDD UL-DL reconfiguration", 3GPP DRAFT; R1-122508 METHODS TO SUPPORT DIFFERENT TIME SCALES FOR TDD UL-DL RECONFIGURATION, 3RD GENERATION PARTNERSHIP PROJECT (3GPP), MOBILE COMPETENCE CENTRE ; 650, ROUTE DES LUCIOLES ; F-06921 SOPHIA-ANTIPOLIS CEDEX ; FRANCE, (20120512), vol. RAN WG1, no. Prague, Czech Republic; 20120521 - 20120525, XP050601078 [A] 1-14 * page 1, paragraph 1 * * page 2, paragraph 2 * | International search | [A]CN102083153 (DATANG MOBILE COMM EQUIP CO); | [X]CN102325005 (ZTE CORP); | [A]US2012120920 (ZHANG GOUDONG [US], et al) | Examination | - RENESAS MOBILE EUROPE, "Operation Principles of CC specific TDD Configuration", 3GPP DRAFT; R2-112938 OPERATION PRINCIPLES FOR CC SPECIFIC TDD CONFIGURATION, 3RD GENERATION PARTNERSHIP PROJECT (3GPP), MOBILE COMPETENCE CENTRE ; 650, ROUTE DES LUCIOLES ; F-06921 SOPHIA-ANTIPOLIS CEDEX ; FRANCE, (20110502), vol. RAN WG2, no. Barcelona, Spain; 20110509, XP050495150 |