EP2875319 - WELDING FIXTURE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 11.01.2019 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 02.02.2018 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 19.09.2017 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 04.11.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.07.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IS | published on 12.08.2020 [2020/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Daniel Measurement and Control, Inc. 11100 Brittmoore Park Drive Houston, Texas 77041 / US | [2015/22] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ALLEN, Charles Robert 12854 Westleigh Drive Houston, Texas 77077 / US | 02 /
HA, Chae H. 219 Wild Oak Run Houston, Texas 77094 / US | [2015/22] | Representative(s) | Williams, Michael David Marks & Clerk LLP 1 New York Street Manchester M1 4HD / GB | [2015/22] | Application number, filing date | 12881431.6 | 06.09.2012 | [2018/10] | WO2012US53842 | Priority number, date | US201261673018P | 18.07.2012 Original published format: US 201261673018 P | [2015/22] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2014014482 | Date: | 23.01.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/04] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2875319 | Date: | 27.05.2015 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 23.01.2014 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2015/22] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2875319 | Date: | 07.03.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/10] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 23.01.2014 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 23.03.2016 | Classification | IPC: | G01F1/66, G01F15/14, B23K9/32, B23K37/053 | [2016/16] | CPC: |
G01F1/662 (EP,CN,RU,US);
B23K31/02 (RU,US);
G01F15/14 (RU,US);
B23K37/00 (CN,RU);
B23K37/04 (US);
B23K37/0426 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2015/22] | G01F1/66, G01F15/14 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2015/22] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | SCHWEISSBEFESTIGUNG | [2015/22] | English: | WELDING FIXTURE | [2015/22] | French: | BÂTI DE SOUDAGE | [2015/22] | Entry into regional phase | 16.01.2015 | National basic fee paid | 16.01.2015 | Search fee paid | 16.01.2015 | Designation fee(s) paid | 16.01.2015 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 16.01.2015 | Examination requested [2015/22] | 26.08.2015 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 26.10.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 06.03.2017 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.09.2017 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 25.01.2018 | Fee for grant paid | 25.01.2018 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 25.01.2018 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 26.10.2016 | Opposition(s) | 10.12.2018 | No opposition filed within time limit [2019/07] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 16.01.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.09.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.09.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.09.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 06.09.2012 | AL | 07.03.2018 | AT | 07.03.2018 | CY | 07.03.2018 | CZ | 07.03.2018 | DK | 07.03.2018 | EE | 07.03.2018 | ES | 07.03.2018 | FI | 07.03.2018 | HR | 07.03.2018 | IT | 07.03.2018 | LT | 07.03.2018 | LV | 07.03.2018 | MC | 07.03.2018 | MK | 07.03.2018 | PL | 07.03.2018 | RO | 07.03.2018 | RS | 07.03.2018 | SE | 07.03.2018 | SI | 07.03.2018 | SK | 07.03.2018 | SM | 07.03.2018 | TR | 07.03.2018 | BG | 07.06.2018 | NO | 07.06.2018 | GR | 08.06.2018 | IS | 07.07.2018 | PT | 09.07.2018 | IE | 06.09.2018 | LU | 06.09.2018 | MT | 06.09.2018 | BE | 30.09.2018 | CH | 30.09.2018 | LI | 30.09.2018 | [2020/33] |
Former [2020/31] | HU | 06.09.2012 | |
AL | 07.03.2018 | ||
AT | 07.03.2018 | ||
CY | 07.03.2018 | ||
CZ | 07.03.2018 | ||
DK | 07.03.2018 | ||
EE | 07.03.2018 | ||
ES | 07.03.2018 | ||
FI | 07.03.2018 | ||
HR | 07.03.2018 | ||
IT | 07.03.2018 | ||
LT | 07.03.2018 | ||
LV | 07.03.2018 | ||
MC | 07.03.2018 | ||
MK | 07.03.2018 | ||
PL | 07.03.2018 | ||
RO | 07.03.2018 | ||
RS | 07.03.2018 | ||
SE | 07.03.2018 | ||
SI | 07.03.2018 | ||
SK | 07.03.2018 | ||
SM | 07.03.2018 | ||
TR | 07.03.2018 | ||
BG | 07.06.2018 | ||
NO | 07.06.2018 | ||
GR | 08.06.2018 | ||
PT | 09.07.2018 | ||
IE | 06.09.2018 | ||
LU | 06.09.2018 | ||
MT | 06.09.2018 | ||
BE | 30.09.2018 | ||
CH | 30.09.2018 | ||
LI | 30.09.2018 | ||
Former [2020/28] | HU | 06.09.2012 | |
AL | 07.03.2018 | ||
AT | 07.03.2018 | ||
CY | 07.03.2018 | ||
CZ | 07.03.2018 | ||
DK | 07.03.2018 | ||
EE | 07.03.2018 | ||
ES | 07.03.2018 | ||
FI | 07.03.2018 | ||
HR | 07.03.2018 | ||
IT | 07.03.2018 | ||
LT | 07.03.2018 | ||
LV | 07.03.2018 | ||
MC | 07.03.2018 | ||
PL | 07.03.2018 | ||
RO | 07.03.2018 | ||
RS | 07.03.2018 | ||
SE | 07.03.2018 | ||
SI | 07.03.2018 | ||
SK | 07.03.2018 | ||
SM | 07.03.2018 | ||
TR | 07.03.2018 | ||
BG | 07.06.2018 | ||
NO | 07.06.2018 | ||
GR | 08.06.2018 | ||
PT | 09.07.2018 | ||
IE | 06.09.2018 | ||
LU | 06.09.2018 | ||
MT | 06.09.2018 | ||
BE | 30.09.2018 | ||
CH | 30.09.2018 | ||
LI | 30.09.2018 | ||
Former [2020/16] | AL | 07.03.2018 | |
AT | 07.03.2018 | ||
CY | 07.03.2018 | ||
CZ | 07.03.2018 | ||
DK | 07.03.2018 | ||
EE | 07.03.2018 | ||
ES | 07.03.2018 | ||
FI | 07.03.2018 | ||
HR | 07.03.2018 | ||
IT | 07.03.2018 | ||
LT | 07.03.2018 | ||
LV | 07.03.2018 | ||
MC | 07.03.2018 | ||
PL | 07.03.2018 | ||
RO | 07.03.2018 | ||
RS | 07.03.2018 | ||
SE | 07.03.2018 | ||
SI | 07.03.2018 | ||
SK | 07.03.2018 | ||
SM | 07.03.2018 | ||
TR | 07.03.2018 | ||
BG | 07.06.2018 | ||
NO | 07.06.2018 | ||
GR | 08.06.2018 | ||
PT | 09.07.2018 | ||
IE | 06.09.2018 | ||
LU | 06.09.2018 | ||
MT | 06.09.2018 | ||
BE | 30.09.2018 | ||
CH | 30.09.2018 | ||
LI | 30.09.2018 | ||
Former [2020/08] | AL | 07.03.2018 | |
AT | 07.03.2018 | ||
CY | 07.03.2018 | ||
CZ | 07.03.2018 | ||
DK | 07.03.2018 | ||
EE | 07.03.2018 | ||
ES | 07.03.2018 | ||
FI | 07.03.2018 | ||
HR | 07.03.2018 | ||
IT | 07.03.2018 | ||
LT | 07.03.2018 | ||
LV | 07.03.2018 | ||
MC | 07.03.2018 | ||
PL | 07.03.2018 | ||
RO | 07.03.2018 | ||
RS | 07.03.2018 | ||
SE | 07.03.2018 | ||
SI | 07.03.2018 | ||
SK | 07.03.2018 | ||
SM | 07.03.2018 | ||
BG | 07.06.2018 | ||
NO | 07.06.2018 | ||
GR | 08.06.2018 | ||
PT | 09.07.2018 | ||
IE | 06.09.2018 | ||
LU | 06.09.2018 | ||
MT | 06.09.2018 | ||
BE | 30.09.2018 | ||
CH | 30.09.2018 | ||
LI | 30.09.2018 | ||
Former [2019/40] | AL | 07.03.2018 | |
AT | 07.03.2018 | ||
CY | 07.03.2018 | ||
CZ | 07.03.2018 | ||
DK | 07.03.2018 | ||
EE | 07.03.2018 | ||
ES | 07.03.2018 | ||
FI | 07.03.2018 | ||
HR | 07.03.2018 | ||
IT | 07.03.2018 | ||
LT | 07.03.2018 | ||
LV | 07.03.2018 | ||
MC | 07.03.2018 | ||
PL | 07.03.2018 | ||
RO | 07.03.2018 | ||
RS | 07.03.2018 | ||
SE | 07.03.2018 | ||
SI | 07.03.2018 | ||
SK | 07.03.2018 | ||
SM | 07.03.2018 | ||
BG | 07.06.2018 | ||
NO | 07.06.2018 | ||
GR | 08.06.2018 | ||
PT | 09.07.2018 | ||
IE | 06.09.2018 | ||
LU | 06.09.2018 | ||
BE | 30.09.2018 | ||
CH | 30.09.2018 | ||
LI | 30.09.2018 | ||
Former [2019/38] | AL | 07.03.2018 | |
AT | 07.03.2018 | ||
CY | 07.03.2018 | ||
CZ | 07.03.2018 | ||
DK | 07.03.2018 | ||
EE | 07.03.2018 | ||
ES | 07.03.2018 | ||
FI | 07.03.2018 | ||
HR | 07.03.2018 | ||
IT | 07.03.2018 | ||
LT | 07.03.2018 | ||
LV | 07.03.2018 | ||
MC | 07.03.2018 | ||
PL | 07.03.2018 | ||
RO | 07.03.2018 | ||
RS | 07.03.2018 | ||
SE | 07.03.2018 | ||
SI | 07.03.2018 | ||
SK | 07.03.2018 | ||
SM | 07.03.2018 | ||
BG | 07.06.2018 | ||
NO | 07.06.2018 | ||
GR | 08.06.2018 | ||
PT | 09.07.2018 | ||
IE | 06.09.2018 | ||
LU | 06.09.2018 | ||
BE | 30.09.2018 | ||
Former [2019/33] | AL | 07.03.2018 | |
AT | 07.03.2018 | ||
CY | 07.03.2018 | ||
CZ | 07.03.2018 | ||
DK | 07.03.2018 | ||
EE | 07.03.2018 | ||
ES | 07.03.2018 | ||
FI | 07.03.2018 | ||
HR | 07.03.2018 | ||
IT | 07.03.2018 | ||
LT | 07.03.2018 | ||
LV | 07.03.2018 | ||
MC | 07.03.2018 | ||
PL | 07.03.2018 | ||
RO | 07.03.2018 | ||
RS | 07.03.2018 | ||
SE | 07.03.2018 | ||
SI | 07.03.2018 | ||
SK | 07.03.2018 | ||
SM | 07.03.2018 | ||
BG | 07.06.2018 | ||
NO | 07.06.2018 | ||
GR | 08.06.2018 | ||
PT | 09.07.2018 | ||
IE | 06.09.2018 | ||
LU | 06.09.2018 | ||
Former [2019/30] | AL | 07.03.2018 | |
AT | 07.03.2018 | ||
CY | 07.03.2018 | ||
CZ | 07.03.2018 | ||
DK | 07.03.2018 | ||
EE | 07.03.2018 | ||
ES | 07.03.2018 | ||
FI | 07.03.2018 | ||
HR | 07.03.2018 | ||
IT | 07.03.2018 | ||
LT | 07.03.2018 | ||
LV | 07.03.2018 | ||
MC | 07.03.2018 | ||
PL | 07.03.2018 | ||
RO | 07.03.2018 | ||
RS | 07.03.2018 | ||
SE | 07.03.2018 | ||
SI | 07.03.2018 | ||
SK | 07.03.2018 | ||
SM | 07.03.2018 | ||
BG | 07.06.2018 | ||
NO | 07.06.2018 | ||
GR | 08.06.2018 | ||
PT | 09.07.2018 | ||
LU | 06.09.2018 | ||
Former [2019/24] | AL | 07.03.2018 | |
AT | 07.03.2018 | ||
CY | 07.03.2018 | ||
CZ | 07.03.2018 | ||
DK | 07.03.2018 | ||
EE | 07.03.2018 | ||
ES | 07.03.2018 | ||
FI | 07.03.2018 | ||
HR | 07.03.2018 | ||
IT | 07.03.2018 | ||
LT | 07.03.2018 | ||
LV | 07.03.2018 | ||
MC | 07.03.2018 | ||
PL | 07.03.2018 | ||
RO | 07.03.2018 | ||
RS | 07.03.2018 | ||
SE | 07.03.2018 | ||
SI | 07.03.2018 | ||
SK | 07.03.2018 | ||
SM | 07.03.2018 | ||
BG | 07.06.2018 | ||
NO | 07.06.2018 | ||
GR | 08.06.2018 | ||
PT | 09.07.2018 | ||
Former [2019/13] | AL | 07.03.2018 | |
AT | 07.03.2018 | ||
CY | 07.03.2018 | ||
CZ | 07.03.2018 | ||
DK | 07.03.2018 | ||
EE | 07.03.2018 | ||
ES | 07.03.2018 | ||
FI | 07.03.2018 | ||
HR | 07.03.2018 | ||
IT | 07.03.2018 | ||
LT | 07.03.2018 | ||
LV | 07.03.2018 | ||
PL | 07.03.2018 | ||
RO | 07.03.2018 | ||
RS | 07.03.2018 | ||
SE | 07.03.2018 | ||
SI | 07.03.2018 | ||
SK | 07.03.2018 | ||
SM | 07.03.2018 | ||
BG | 07.06.2018 | ||
NO | 07.06.2018 | ||
GR | 08.06.2018 | ||
PT | 09.07.2018 | ||
Former [2019/08] | AL | 07.03.2018 | |
AT | 07.03.2018 | ||
CY | 07.03.2018 | ||
CZ | 07.03.2018 | ||
DK | 07.03.2018 | ||
EE | 07.03.2018 | ||
ES | 07.03.2018 | ||
FI | 07.03.2018 | ||
HR | 07.03.2018 | ||
IT | 07.03.2018 | ||
LT | 07.03.2018 | ||
LV | 07.03.2018 | ||
PL | 07.03.2018 | ||
RO | 07.03.2018 | ||
RS | 07.03.2018 | ||
SE | 07.03.2018 | ||
SK | 07.03.2018 | ||
SM | 07.03.2018 | ||
BG | 07.06.2018 | ||
NO | 07.06.2018 | ||
GR | 08.06.2018 | ||
PT | 09.07.2018 | ||
Former [2019/03] | AL | 07.03.2018 | |
AT | 07.03.2018 | ||
CY | 07.03.2018 | ||
CZ | 07.03.2018 | ||
EE | 07.03.2018 | ||
ES | 07.03.2018 | ||
FI | 07.03.2018 | ||
HR | 07.03.2018 | ||
IT | 07.03.2018 | ||
LT | 07.03.2018 | ||
LV | 07.03.2018 | ||
PL | 07.03.2018 | ||
RO | 07.03.2018 | ||
RS | 07.03.2018 | ||
SE | 07.03.2018 | ||
SK | 07.03.2018 | ||
SM | 07.03.2018 | ||
BG | 07.06.2018 | ||
NO | 07.06.2018 | ||
GR | 08.06.2018 | ||
PT | 09.07.2018 | ||
Former [2018/52] | AL | 07.03.2018 | |
AT | 07.03.2018 | ||
CY | 07.03.2018 | ||
CZ | 07.03.2018 | ||
EE | 07.03.2018 | ||
ES | 07.03.2018 | ||
FI | 07.03.2018 | ||
HR | 07.03.2018 | ||
IT | 07.03.2018 | ||
LT | 07.03.2018 | ||
LV | 07.03.2018 | ||
PL | 07.03.2018 | ||
RO | 07.03.2018 | ||
RS | 07.03.2018 | ||
SE | 07.03.2018 | ||
SK | 07.03.2018 | ||
SM | 07.03.2018 | ||
BG | 07.06.2018 | ||
NO | 07.06.2018 | ||
GR | 08.06.2018 | ||
Former [2018/50] | AL | 07.03.2018 | |
AT | 07.03.2018 | ||
CY | 07.03.2018 | ||
CZ | 07.03.2018 | ||
EE | 07.03.2018 | ||
ES | 07.03.2018 | ||
FI | 07.03.2018 | ||
HR | 07.03.2018 | ||
IT | 07.03.2018 | ||
LT | 07.03.2018 | ||
LV | 07.03.2018 | ||
PL | 07.03.2018 | ||
RO | 07.03.2018 | ||
RS | 07.03.2018 | ||
SE | 07.03.2018 | ||
SK | 07.03.2018 | ||
BG | 07.06.2018 | ||
NO | 07.06.2018 | ||
GR | 08.06.2018 | ||
Former [2018/47] | AL | 07.03.2018 | |
CY | 07.03.2018 | ||
ES | 07.03.2018 | ||
FI | 07.03.2018 | ||
HR | 07.03.2018 | ||
IT | 07.03.2018 | ||
LT | 07.03.2018 | ||
LV | 07.03.2018 | ||
RS | 07.03.2018 | ||
SE | 07.03.2018 | ||
BG | 07.06.2018 | ||
NO | 07.06.2018 | ||
GR | 08.06.2018 | ||
Former [2018/46] | AL | 07.03.2018 | |
CY | 07.03.2018 | ||
ES | 07.03.2018 | ||
FI | 07.03.2018 | ||
HR | 07.03.2018 | ||
LT | 07.03.2018 | ||
LV | 07.03.2018 | ||
RS | 07.03.2018 | ||
SE | 07.03.2018 | ||
BG | 07.06.2018 | ||
NO | 07.06.2018 | ||
GR | 08.06.2018 | ||
Former [2018/40] | CY | 07.03.2018 | |
ES | 07.03.2018 | ||
FI | 07.03.2018 | ||
HR | 07.03.2018 | ||
LT | 07.03.2018 | ||
LV | 07.03.2018 | ||
RS | 07.03.2018 | ||
SE | 07.03.2018 | ||
BG | 07.06.2018 | ||
NO | 07.06.2018 | ||
GR | 08.06.2018 | ||
Former [2018/39] | CY | 07.03.2018 | |
ES | 07.03.2018 | ||
FI | 07.03.2018 | ||
HR | 07.03.2018 | ||
LT | 07.03.2018 | ||
LV | 07.03.2018 | ||
RS | 07.03.2018 | ||
SE | 07.03.2018 | ||
NO | 07.06.2018 | ||
GR | 08.06.2018 | ||
Former [2018/37] | CY | 07.03.2018 | |
ES | 07.03.2018 | ||
FI | 07.03.2018 | ||
HR | 07.03.2018 | ||
LT | 07.03.2018 | ||
NO | 07.06.2018 | ||
GR | 08.06.2018 | ||
Former [2018/36] | CY | 07.03.2018 | |
ES | 07.03.2018 | ||
FI | 07.03.2018 | ||
HR | 07.03.2018 | ||
LT | 07.03.2018 | ||
NO | 07.06.2018 | ||
Former [2018/35] | CY | 07.03.2018 | |
FI | 07.03.2018 | ||
HR | 07.03.2018 | ||
LT | 07.03.2018 | ||
NO | 07.06.2018 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US3761005 (BAXTER H, et al); | [A]EP1207003 (JANKUS WERNER [DE]) | International search | [A]US2005039545 (ELDRIDGE MARK F [US]); | [A]US2011162463 (ALLEN CHARLES R [US]); | [A]US2012125122 (GOTTLIEB EMANUEL J [US], et al); | [A]KR20120063232 (CMENTECH CO LTD [KR]) | by applicant | US3761005 |