EP2879331 - COMMUNICATION ADAPTOR, CONTROLLER, AND NETWORK SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 08.12.2017 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 17.03.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.12.2017 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 10.01.2018 [2018/02] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Mitsubishi Electric Corporation 7-3 Marunouchi 2-Chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8310 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2015/23] | For all designated states Mitsubishi Electric Corporation 7-3 Marunouchi 2-Chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8310 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HIBARA Naoyuki c/o Mitsubishi Electric Corporation 7-3 Marunouchi 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8310 / JP | 02 /
KOIZUMI Yoshiaki c/o Mitsubishi Electric Corporation 7-3 Marunouchi 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8310 / JP | 03 /
ITO Yoshiaki c/o Mitsubishi Electric Corporation 7-3 Marunouchi 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8310 / JP | [2015/23] | Representative(s) | Pfenning, Meinig & Partner mbB Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Theresienhöhe 11a 80339 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2015/23] | Pfenning, Meinig & Partner GbR Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Theresienhöhe 11a 80339 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 12881960.4 | 27.07.2012 | WO2012JP69250 | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2014016968 | Date: | 30.01.2014 | Language: | JA | [2014/05] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2879331 | Date: | 03.06.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/23] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 30.01.2014 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 27.05.2016 | Classification | IPC: | H04L12/28, H04L12/24, H04L12/40 | [2016/26] | CPC: |
H04L12/2807 (EP,US);
H04L41/0806 (US);
H04L12/28 (US);
H04L12/2809 (EP,US);
H04L12/40032 (EP,US);
H04L41/04 (US)
|
Former IPC [2015/23] | H04L12/28 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2015/23] | Title | German: | KOMMUNIKATIONSADAPTER, STEUERUNG UND NETZWERKSYSTEM | [2015/23] | English: | COMMUNICATION ADAPTOR, CONTROLLER, AND NETWORK SYSTEM | [2015/23] | French: | ADAPTATEUR DE COMMUNICATION, CONTRÔLEUR ET SYSTÈME DE RÉSEAU | [2015/23] | Entry into regional phase | 19.01.2015 | Translation filed | 19.01.2015 | National basic fee paid | 19.01.2015 | Search fee paid | 19.01.2015 | Designation fee(s) paid | 19.01.2015 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 19.01.2015 | Examination requested [2015/23] | 15.11.2016 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 16.03.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 27.07.2017 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2018/02] | 29.08.2017 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2018/02] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 16.03.2017 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.01.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 10.07.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 11.07.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.07.2017 | 06   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]US6222853 (MARTTINEN TAPIO [DE], et al) [X] 1,12 * the whole document * [I] 2,3; | [A]EP1271848 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD [JP]) [A] 1,12* paragraphs [0077] - [0089] *; | [A]JP2003304653 (SONY CORP) [A] 1,4,12,13 * the whole document *; | [XI]US2011054644 (BAEK SEUNG-MYUN [KR], et al) [X] 4,13 * the whole document * [I] 5-8 | International search | [A]JP2004229266 (SANYO ELECTRIC CO); | [A]JP2005184551 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD); | [A]JP2006127432 (MITSUBISHI ELECTRIC CORP) | by applicant | JP2004229266 | JP2006127432 | JP2008172570 |