Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2014021813 | Global Dossier | 06.02.2014 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2012US48788 | 30.07.2012 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US9995876 | Global Dossier | 12.06.2018 | B2 | US2015168647 | 18.06.2015 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2012US48788 | 30.07.2012 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US10209445 | Global Dossier | 19.02.2019 | B2 | US2018267239 | 20.09.2018 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201514416781 | 23.01.2015 | WO2012US48788 | 30.07.2012 | US201815976944 | 11.05.2018 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | KR20150037863 | Global Dossier | 08.04.2015 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2012US48788 | 30.07.2012 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN104395798B | Global Dossier | 01.03.2019 | B | CN104395798 | 04.03.2015 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2012US48788 | 30.07.2012 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP2880480 | Global Dossier | 20.04.2016 | A4 | EP2880480 | 10.06.2015 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2012US48788 | 30.07.2012 |