EP2880480 - COMPACT PHOTONIC PLATFORMS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 10.03.2017 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 21.11.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.03.2017 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 12.04.2017 [2017/15] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Hewlett Packard Enterprise Development LP 11445 Compaq Center Drive West Houston, TX 77070 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2016/25] | For all designated states Hewlett Packard Enterprise Development L.P. 11445 Compaq Center Drive West Houston, TX 77070 / US | ||
Former [2015/24] | For all designated states Hewlett-Packard Development Company, L.P. 11445 Compaq Center Drive W. Houston, Texas 77070 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LIANG, Di 1501 Page Mill Road Palo Alto, California 94304 / US | 02 /
FATTAL, David A. 1501 Page Mill Road Palo Alto, California 94304 / US | 03 /
FIORENTINO, Marco 1501 Page Mill Road Palo Alto, California 94304 / US | 04 /
PENG, Zhen 1501 Page Mill Road Palo Alto, California 94304 / US | 05 /
SANTORI, Charles M. 1501 Page Mill Road Palo Alto, California 94304 / US | 06 /
BEAUSOLEIL, Raymond G. 1501 Page Mill Road Palo Alto, California 94304 / US | [2015/24] | Representative(s) | HGF Fountain Precinct Balm Green Sheffield S1 2JA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2015/24] | Jennings, Vincent Louis HGF Limited Fountain Precinct Balm Green Sheffield S1 2JA / GB | Application number, filing date | 12882354.9 | 30.07.2012 | WO2012US48788 | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2014021813 | Date: | 06.02.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/06] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2880480 | Date: | 10.06.2015 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 06.02.2014 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2015/24] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 06.02.2014 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 17.03.2016 | Classification | IPC: | H01S5/10, H01S5/125, G02B6/34, G02B6/125, G02B6/122, // H01S5/12, G02B6/12 | [2016/16] | CPC: |
B82Y20/00 (EP,CN,US);
G02B6/122 (EP,US);
G02B6/1225 (EP,CN,KR,US);
G02B6/125 (EP,CN,KR,US);
G02B6/34 (EP,CN,KR,US);
H01S5/1032 (EP,CN,US);
H01S5/1035 (EP,CN,KR,US);
H01S5/1085 (EP,CN,KR,US);
H01S5/11 (US);
H01S5/1203 (EP,CN,KR,US);
H01S5/125 (EP,CN,US);
G02B2006/12121 (EP,CN,KR,US);
G02B2006/12166 (US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2015/24] | G02B6/122 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2015/24] | Title | German: | KOMPAKTE PHOTONISCHE PLATTFORMEN | [2015/24] | English: | COMPACT PHOTONIC PLATFORMS | [2015/24] | French: | PLATE-FORMES PHOTONIQUES COMPACTES | [2015/24] | Entry into regional phase | 08.12.2014 | National basic fee paid | 08.12.2014 | Search fee paid | 08.12.2014 | Designation fee(s) paid | 08.12.2014 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 08.12.2014 | Examination requested [2015/24] | 18.10.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2017/15] | 22.11.2016 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2017/15] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 08.12.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.07.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.07.2016 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XYI]US2006239612 (DE DOBBELAERE PETER [US], et al) [X] 1,2,6,7 * paragraphs [0024] , [0058] - [0071]; figures 11,12 * [Y] 3-5,8-13 [I] 14,15; | [X]US2010006784 (MACK MICHAEL [US], et al) [X] 1,2,6 * paragraphs [0182] , [0185] , [0187]; figures 28,30,31 *; | [Y]US2010246617 (JONES RICHARD [US]) [Y] 3-5,8-13 * paragraphs [0039] - [0047]; figures 6A,6B; claims 6,8 * | [X] - ALBERTO SCANDURRA ET AL, "Optical Interconnects for Network on Chip", NANO-NETWORKS AND WORKSHOPS, 2006. NANONET '06. 1ST INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON, IEEE, PI, (20060901), ISBN 978-1-4244-0390-5, pages 1 - 5, XP031076876 [X] 1,2,6 * Section III.A;; figure 2 * | International search | [Y]US2006227833 (O'DANIEL JASON K [US], et al); | [Y]US2011142395 (FORTUSINI DAVIDE DOMENICO [US], et al); | [A]US6031243 (TAYLOR GEOFF W [US]); | [A]US2010099209 (BEHFAR ALEX A [US], et al); | [A]EP0623980 (CSELT CENTRO STUDI LAB TELECOM [IT]) |