EP2883971 - FASTENING COPPER ALLOY [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 09.08.2019 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 31.08.2018 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 11.03.2018 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 20.01.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.07.2022 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 03.08.2022 [2022/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states YKK Corporation 1 Kandaizumi-Cho Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 101-8642 / JP | [2015/25] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KIDO, Kouta c/o YKK CORPORATION KUROBE 200 Yoshida Kurobe-shi Toyama 938-8601 / JP | 02 /
KOIZUMI, Takuya c/o YKK CORPORATION KUROBE 200 Yoshida Kurobe-shi Toyama 938-8601 / JP | 03 /
YOSHIMURA, Yasuharu c/o YKK CORPORATIONKUROBE 200 Yoshida Kurobe-shi Toyama 938-8601 / JP | 04 /
FUKUYAMA, Takahiro c/o YKK CORPORATION KUROBE 200 Yoshida urobe-shi Toyama 938-8601 / JP | 05 /
OGIHARA, Atsushi c/o YKK CORPORATION Kurobe 200 Yoshida kurobe-shi Toyama 938-8601 / JP | 06 /
MIKADO, Kouichi c/o YKK CORPORATION Kurobe 200 Yoshida kurobe-shi Toyama 938-8601 / JP | 07 /
KIYOHARA, Jun c/o YKK CORPORATION Kurobe 200 Yoshida kurobe-shi Toyama 938-8601 / JP | 08 /
TAIRA, Yoshio c/o YKK CORPORATION Kurobe 200 Yoshida kurobe-shi Toyama 938-8601 / JP | [2015/25] | Representative(s) | Leinweber & Zimmermann European Patent Attorneys Patentanwälte Viktualienmarkt 8 80331 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2015/25] | Leinweber & Zimmermann Rosental 7, II. Aufgang 80331 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 12882822.5 | 09.08.2012 | [2018/40] | WO2012JP70364 | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2014024293 | Date: | 13.02.2014 | Language: | JA | [2014/07] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2883971 | Date: | 17.06.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/25] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2883971 | Date: | 03.10.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/40] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 13.02.2014 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 17.06.2016 | Classification | IPC: | C22C9/04, A44B19/00, C22F1/08 | [2016/29] | CPC: |
C22C9/04 (EP,CN,US);
A44B19/00 (EP,CN,US);
A44B19/24 (US);
C22F1/08 (EP,CN,US);
A44B19/44 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2015/25] | C22C9/04, A44B19/00, C22F1/08, C22F1/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2015/25] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | KUPFERLEGIERUNG ALS BEFESTIGER | [2015/25] | English: | FASTENING COPPER ALLOY | [2015/25] | French: | ALLIAGE DE CUIVRE DE FIXATION | [2015/25] | Entry into regional phase | 05.02.2015 | Translation filed | 05.02.2015 | National basic fee paid | 05.02.2015 | Search fee paid | 05.02.2015 | Designation fee(s) paid | 05.02.2015 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 05.02.2015 | Examination requested [2015/25] | 15.12.2016 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 20.01.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 24.07.2017 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.02.2018 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 14.03.2018 | 12.03.2018 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 14.03.2018 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | 10.07.2018 | Fee for grant paid | 10.07.2018 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 10.07.2018 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 20.01.2017 | Opposition(s) | 04.07.2019 | No opposition filed within time limit [2019/37] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 05.02.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.08.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.08.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 31.08.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 21.08.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 09.08.2012 | AL | 03.10.2018 | AT | 03.10.2018 | CY | 03.10.2018 | CZ | 03.10.2018 | DK | 03.10.2018 | EE | 03.10.2018 | ES | 03.10.2018 | FI | 03.10.2018 | HR | 03.10.2018 | IT | 03.10.2018 | LT | 03.10.2018 | LV | 03.10.2018 | MC | 03.10.2018 | MK | 03.10.2018 | MT | 03.10.2018 | NL | 03.10.2018 | PL | 03.10.2018 | RO | 03.10.2018 | RS | 03.10.2018 | SE | 03.10.2018 | SI | 03.10.2018 | SK | 03.10.2018 | SM | 03.10.2018 | BG | 03.01.2019 | NO | 03.01.2019 | GR | 04.01.2019 | IS | 03.02.2019 | PT | 03.02.2019 | [2022/31] |
Former [2021/34] | HU | 09.08.2012 | |
AL | 03.10.2018 | ||
AT | 03.10.2018 | ||
CY | 03.10.2018 | ||
CZ | 03.10.2018 | ||
DK | 03.10.2018 | ||
EE | 03.10.2018 | ||
ES | 03.10.2018 | ||
FI | 03.10.2018 | ||
HR | 03.10.2018 | ||
IT | 03.10.2018 | ||
LT | 03.10.2018 | ||
LV | 03.10.2018 | ||
MC | 03.10.2018 | ||
MT | 03.10.2018 | ||
NL | 03.10.2018 | ||
PL | 03.10.2018 | ||
RO | 03.10.2018 | ||
RS | 03.10.2018 | ||
SE | 03.10.2018 | ||
SI | 03.10.2018 | ||
SK | 03.10.2018 | ||
SM | 03.10.2018 | ||
BG | 03.01.2019 | ||
NO | 03.01.2019 | ||
GR | 04.01.2019 | ||
IS | 03.02.2019 | ||
PT | 03.02.2019 | ||
Former [2021/32] | HU | 09.08.2012 | |
AL | 03.10.2018 | ||
AT | 03.10.2018 | ||
CY | 03.10.2018 | ||
CZ | 03.10.2018 | ||
DK | 03.10.2018 | ||
EE | 03.10.2018 | ||
ES | 03.10.2018 | ||
FI | 03.10.2018 | ||
HR | 03.10.2018 | ||
IT | 03.10.2018 | ||
LT | 03.10.2018 | ||
LV | 03.10.2018 | ||
MC | 03.10.2018 | ||
NL | 03.10.2018 | ||
PL | 03.10.2018 | ||
RO | 03.10.2018 | ||
RS | 03.10.2018 | ||
SE | 03.10.2018 | ||
SI | 03.10.2018 | ||
SK | 03.10.2018 | ||
SM | 03.10.2018 | ||
BG | 03.01.2019 | ||
NO | 03.01.2019 | ||
GR | 04.01.2019 | ||
IS | 03.02.2019 | ||
PT | 03.02.2019 | ||
Former [2021/26] | AL | 03.10.2018 | |
AT | 03.10.2018 | ||
CY | 03.10.2018 | ||
CZ | 03.10.2018 | ||
DK | 03.10.2018 | ||
EE | 03.10.2018 | ||
ES | 03.10.2018 | ||
FI | 03.10.2018 | ||
HR | 03.10.2018 | ||
IT | 03.10.2018 | ||
LT | 03.10.2018 | ||
LV | 03.10.2018 | ||
MC | 03.10.2018 | ||
NL | 03.10.2018 | ||
PL | 03.10.2018 | ||
RO | 03.10.2018 | ||
RS | 03.10.2018 | ||
SE | 03.10.2018 | ||
SI | 03.10.2018 | ||
SK | 03.10.2018 | ||
SM | 03.10.2018 | ||
BG | 03.01.2019 | ||
NO | 03.01.2019 | ||
GR | 04.01.2019 | ||
IS | 03.02.2019 | ||
PT | 03.02.2019 | ||
Former [2020/25] | AL | 03.10.2018 | |
AT | 03.10.2018 | ||
CZ | 03.10.2018 | ||
DK | 03.10.2018 | ||
EE | 03.10.2018 | ||
ES | 03.10.2018 | ||
FI | 03.10.2018 | ||
HR | 03.10.2018 | ||
IT | 03.10.2018 | ||
LT | 03.10.2018 | ||
LV | 03.10.2018 | ||
MC | 03.10.2018 | ||
NL | 03.10.2018 | ||
PL | 03.10.2018 | ||
RO | 03.10.2018 | ||
RS | 03.10.2018 | ||
SE | 03.10.2018 | ||
SI | 03.10.2018 | ||
SK | 03.10.2018 | ||
SM | 03.10.2018 | ||
BG | 03.01.2019 | ||
NO | 03.01.2019 | ||
GR | 04.01.2019 | ||
IS | 03.02.2019 | ||
PT | 03.02.2019 | ||
Former [2019/50] | AL | 03.10.2018 | |
AT | 03.10.2018 | ||
CZ | 03.10.2018 | ||
DK | 03.10.2018 | ||
EE | 03.10.2018 | ||
ES | 03.10.2018 | ||
FI | 03.10.2018 | ||
HR | 03.10.2018 | ||
IT | 03.10.2018 | ||
LT | 03.10.2018 | ||
LV | 03.10.2018 | ||
NL | 03.10.2018 | ||
PL | 03.10.2018 | ||
RO | 03.10.2018 | ||
RS | 03.10.2018 | ||
SE | 03.10.2018 | ||
SI | 03.10.2018 | ||
SK | 03.10.2018 | ||
SM | 03.10.2018 | ||
BG | 03.01.2019 | ||
NO | 03.01.2019 | ||
GR | 04.01.2019 | ||
IS | 03.02.2019 | ||
PT | 03.02.2019 | ||
Former [2019/40] | AL | 03.10.2018 | |
AT | 03.10.2018 | ||
CZ | 03.10.2018 | ||
DK | 03.10.2018 | ||
EE | 03.10.2018 | ||
ES | 03.10.2018 | ||
FI | 03.10.2018 | ||
HR | 03.10.2018 | ||
IT | 03.10.2018 | ||
LT | 03.10.2018 | ||
LV | 03.10.2018 | ||
NL | 03.10.2018 | ||
PL | 03.10.2018 | ||
RO | 03.10.2018 | ||
RS | 03.10.2018 | ||
SE | 03.10.2018 | ||
SK | 03.10.2018 | ||
SM | 03.10.2018 | ||
BG | 03.01.2019 | ||
NO | 03.01.2019 | ||
GR | 04.01.2019 | ||
IS | 03.02.2019 | ||
PT | 03.02.2019 | ||
Former [2019/37] | AL | 03.10.2018 | |
AT | 03.10.2018 | ||
CZ | 03.10.2018 | ||
DK | 03.10.2018 | ||
EE | 03.10.2018 | ||
ES | 03.10.2018 | ||
FI | 03.10.2018 | ||
HR | 03.10.2018 | ||
IT | 03.10.2018 | ||
LT | 03.10.2018 | ||
LV | 03.10.2018 | ||
NL | 03.10.2018 | ||
PL | 03.10.2018 | ||
RO | 03.10.2018 | ||
RS | 03.10.2018 | ||
SE | 03.10.2018 | ||
SM | 03.10.2018 | ||
BG | 03.01.2019 | ||
NO | 03.01.2019 | ||
GR | 04.01.2019 | ||
IS | 03.02.2019 | ||
PT | 03.02.2019 | ||
Former [2019/34] | AL | 03.10.2018 | |
AT | 03.10.2018 | ||
CZ | 03.10.2018 | ||
DK | 03.10.2018 | ||
ES | 03.10.2018 | ||
FI | 03.10.2018 | ||
HR | 03.10.2018 | ||
IT | 03.10.2018 | ||
LT | 03.10.2018 | ||
LV | 03.10.2018 | ||
NL | 03.10.2018 | ||
PL | 03.10.2018 | ||
RS | 03.10.2018 | ||
SE | 03.10.2018 | ||
BG | 03.01.2019 | ||
NO | 03.01.2019 | ||
GR | 04.01.2019 | ||
IS | 03.02.2019 | ||
PT | 03.02.2019 | ||
Former [2019/26] | AL | 03.10.2018 | |
AT | 03.10.2018 | ||
CZ | 03.10.2018 | ||
ES | 03.10.2018 | ||
FI | 03.10.2018 | ||
HR | 03.10.2018 | ||
LT | 03.10.2018 | ||
LV | 03.10.2018 | ||
NL | 03.10.2018 | ||
PL | 03.10.2018 | ||
RS | 03.10.2018 | ||
SE | 03.10.2018 | ||
BG | 03.01.2019 | ||
NO | 03.01.2019 | ||
GR | 04.01.2019 | ||
IS | 03.02.2019 | ||
PT | 03.02.2019 | ||
Former [2019/25] | AT | 03.10.2018 | |
CZ | 03.10.2018 | ||
ES | 03.10.2018 | ||
FI | 03.10.2018 | ||
HR | 03.10.2018 | ||
LT | 03.10.2018 | ||
LV | 03.10.2018 | ||
NL | 03.10.2018 | ||
PL | 03.10.2018 | ||
RS | 03.10.2018 | ||
SE | 03.10.2018 | ||
BG | 03.01.2019 | ||
NO | 03.01.2019 | ||
GR | 04.01.2019 | ||
IS | 03.02.2019 | ||
Former [2019/24] | AT | 03.10.2018 | |
CZ | 03.10.2018 | ||
ES | 03.10.2018 | ||
FI | 03.10.2018 | ||
HR | 03.10.2018 | ||
LT | 03.10.2018 | ||
LV | 03.10.2018 | ||
NL | 03.10.2018 | ||
PL | 03.10.2018 | ||
SE | 03.10.2018 | ||
BG | 03.01.2019 | ||
NO | 03.01.2019 | ||
GR | 04.01.2019 | ||
IS | 03.02.2019 | ||
Former [2019/23] | AT | 03.10.2018 | |
CZ | 03.10.2018 | ||
ES | 03.10.2018 | ||
FI | 03.10.2018 | ||
HR | 03.10.2018 | ||
LT | 03.10.2018 | ||
LV | 03.10.2018 | ||
NL | 03.10.2018 | ||
PL | 03.10.2018 | ||
BG | 03.01.2019 | ||
NO | 03.01.2019 | ||
IS | 03.02.2019 | ||
Former [2019/22] | CZ | 03.10.2018 | |
FI | 03.10.2018 | ||
LT | 03.10.2018 | ||
NL | 03.10.2018 | ||
PL | 03.10.2018 | ||
BG | 03.01.2019 | ||
NO | 03.01.2019 | ||
IS | 03.02.2019 | ||
Former [2019/21] | FI | 03.10.2018 | |
LT | 03.10.2018 | ||
NL | 03.10.2018 | ||
NO | 03.01.2019 | ||
IS | 03.02.2019 | ||
Former [2019/20] | LT | 03.10.2018 | |
NL | 03.10.2018 | ||
NO | 03.01.2019 | ||
Former [2019/17] | NL | 03.10.2018 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JP2004332014 (YKK CORP) [A] 1-6 * the whole document * * table 1, example 13 *; | [X] - DUTKIEWICZ J ET AL, "Influence of manganese content on superplastic deformation of .alpha.+.beta. brasses", ARCHIVUM NAUKI O MATERIALACH, PANSTWOWE WYDAWNICTWO NAUKOWE, WARSAW, PO, (20061231), vol. 27, no. 2-3, ISSN 0138-032X, pages 101 - 110, XP009190169 [X] 1-6 * the whole document * * figure 1+9; table 1 * | [A] - KURBATKIN I I ET AL, "Evolution of the structure of multicomponent manganese brass and its relation to the appearance of defective products", IZVESTIYA VYSSHIKH UCHEBNYKH ZAVEDENII. SERIYA CHERNAYAMETALLURGIYA, MOSKOVSKII GOSUDARSTVENNYI INSTITUT STALI I SPLAVOV, (20021231), no. 5, ISSN 0021-3438, pages 58 - 62, XP009190171 [A] 1-6 * the whole document * * table 1, example 1 * | [A] - ZHAO YUE-HONG ET AL, "Localized corrosion of copper alloys in China seawater for 16 years", TRANSACTIONS OF NONFERROUS METALS SOCIETY OF CHINA, NONFERROUS METALS SOCIETY OF CHINA, CN, (20041231), vol. 14, no. 6, ISSN 1003-6326, pages 1082 - 1090, XP009190172 [A] 1-6 * the whole document * * table 2, example 7 * | International search | [A]JP2003113454 (YKK CORP); | [A]JP2004332014 (YKK CORP) | by applicant | JP4357869B |