17.07.2020 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 19.08.2020 [2020/34] |
05.06.2020 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 08.07.2020 [2020/28] |
15.11.2019 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 18.12.2019 [2019/51] |
18.10.2019 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 20.11.2019 [2019/47] |
28.06.2019 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 31.07.2019 [2019/31] |
21.09.2018 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 24.10.2018 [2018/43] |
31.08.2018 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 03.10.2018 [2018/40] |
03.08.2018 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 05.09.2018 [2018/36] |
27.07.2018 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 29.08.2018 [2018/35] |
20.07.2018 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 22.08.2018 [2018/34] |
29.06.2018 |
No opposition filed within time limit |
published on 01.08.2018 [2018/31] |
15.06.2018 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 18.07.2018 [2018/29] |
01.06.2018 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 04.07.2018 [2018/27] |
25.05.2018 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 27.06.2018 [2018/26] |
18.05.2018 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 20.06.2018 [2018/25] |
20.04.2018 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 23.05.2018 [2018/21] |
09.03.2018 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 11.04.2018 [2018/15] |
23.02.2018 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 28.03.2018 [2018/13] |
16.02.2018 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 21.03.2018 [2018/12] |
09.02.2018 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 14.03.2018 [2018/11] |
02.02.2018 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 07.03.2018 [2018/10] |
26.01.2018 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 28.02.2018 [2018/09] |
19.01.2018 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 21.02.2018 [2018/08] |
12.01.2018 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 14.02.2018 [2018/07] |
21.07.2017 |
(Expected) grant |
published on 23.08.2017 [2017/34] |
18.07.2017 |
New entry: Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) |
|
18.07.2017 |
New entry: Payment of fee for grant |
|
18.07.2017 |
New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing |
|
05.04.2017 |
New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
18.02.2017 |
Amendment by applicant |
|
28.09.2016 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
29.07.2016 |
Change - date of supplementary search report |
published on 31.08.2016 [2016/35] |
29.07.2016 |
Change - classification |
published on 31.08.2016 [2016/35] |
29.07.2016 |
Change - classification |
published on 31.08.2016 [2016/35] |
16.04.2016 |
New entry: Observations by third parties |
|
25.03.2016 |
Change - classification |
published on 27.04.2016 [2016/17] |
25.03.2016 |
Change - classification |
published on 27.04.2016 [2016/17] |
06.11.2015 |
Change - extension states |
published on 09.12.2015 [2015/50] |
16.09.2015 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
12.06.2015 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 15.07.2015 [2015/29] |
12.06.2015 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 15.07.2015 [2015/29] |
19.03.2015 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
25.02.2015 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
25.02.2015 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
24.02.2015 |
Amendment by applicant |
|
21.02.2015 |
Change - representative |
|
21.02.2015 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
14.10.2014 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
22.03.2014 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
07.03.2014 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|