Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2014033503 | Global Dossier | 06.03.2014 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2012IB54531 | 03.09.2012 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US9227686 | Global Dossier | 05.01.2016 | B2 | US2015158544 | 11.06.2015 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2012IB54531 | 03.09.2012 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | KR101956421B | Global Dossier | 08.03.2019 | B1 | KR20150052173 | 13.05.2015 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2012IB54531 | 03.09.2012 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP2015526345 | Global Dossier | 10.09.2015 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2012IB54531 | 03.09.2012 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | IL225610 | Global Dossier | 31.01.2017 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2012IB54531 | 03.09.2012 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN104661907B | Global Dossier | 02.10.2018 | B | CN104661907 | 27.05.2015 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2012IB54531 | 03.09.2012 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | AU2012388676B | Global Dossier | 22.06.2017 | B2 | AU2012388676 | 26.03.2015 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2012IB54531 | 03.09.2012 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP2892797 | Global Dossier | 23.08.2017 | B1 | EP2892797 | 31.08.2016 | A4 | EP2892797 | 15.07.2015 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2012IB54531 | 03.09.2012 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | BR112015004674 | 04.07.2017 | A2 | Priority number | Date | WO2012IB54531 | 03.09.2012 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | ES2643157T | 21.11.2017 | T3 | Priority number | Date | WO2012IB54531 | 03.09.2012 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | RU2605133 | 20.12.2016 | C2 | RU2015107012 | 20.10.2016 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2012IB54531 | 03.09.2012 |