EP2899388 - CONTROL DEVICE FOR INTERNAL COMBUSTION ENGINE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 07.04.2017 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 11.12.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.04.2017 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 10.05.2017 [2017/19] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states TOYOTA JIDOSHA KABUSHIKI KAISHA 1, Toyota-cho Toyota-shi, Aichi-ken, 471-8571 / JP | [2015/31] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HAYASHITA, Go c/o TOYOTA JIDOSHA KABUSHIKI KAISHA 1 Toyota-cho Toyota-shi Aichi 471-8571 / JP | 02 /
SASAKI, Takanori c/o TOYOTA JIDOSHA KABUSHIKI KAISHA 1 Toyota-cho Toyota-shi Aichi 471-8571 / JP | 03 /
AOKI, Keiichiro c/o TOYOTA JIDOSHA KABUSHIKI KAISHA 1 Toyota-cho Toyota-shi Aichi 471-8571 / JP | [2015/31] | Representative(s) | Intès, Didier Gérard André, et al Cabinet Beau de Loménie 158 rue de l'Université 75340 Paris Cedex 07 / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2015/31] | Intès, Didier Gérard André, et al Cabinet Beau de Loménie 158, rue de l'Université 75340 Paris Cedex 07 / FR | Application number, filing date | 12884930.4 | 20.09.2012 | WO2012JP74034 | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2014045367 | Date: | 27.03.2014 | Language: | JA | [2014/13] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2899388 | Date: | 29.07.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/31] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 27.03.2014 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 17.03.2016 | Classification | IPC: | F02D45/00, F02D41/14, F02D41/24 | [2016/15] | CPC: |
F02D41/1441 (EP,US);
F01N3/0842 (US);
F01N11/007 (EP,US);
F01N3/0835 (US);
F01N3/0864 (US);
F01N3/101 (EP,US);
F01N3/18 (US);
F02D41/1454 (EP,US);
F02D41/1456 (EP,US);
F02D41/1495 (EP,US);
F02D41/222 (EP,US);
F02D41/2474 (EP,US);
F01N2550/02 (EP,US);
F01N2560/025 (EP,US);
F01N2560/14 (EP,US);
F01N2570/14 (US);
F01N2570/16 (US);
F01N2900/0416 (US);
F01N2900/1402 (US);
F01N2900/1624 (US);
F02D41/0295 (EP,US);
F02D41/042 (US);
F02D41/123 (US);
F02D41/1408 (US);
|
Former IPC [2015/31] | F02D45/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2015/31] | Title | German: | STEUERUNGSVORRICHTUNG FÜR EINEN VERBRENNUNGSMOTOR | [2015/31] | English: | CONTROL DEVICE FOR INTERNAL COMBUSTION ENGINE | [2015/31] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE COMMANDE POUR MOTEUR À COMBUSTION INTERNE | [2015/31] | Entry into regional phase | 20.04.2015 | Translation filed | 20.04.2015 | National basic fee paid | 20.04.2015 | Search fee paid | 20.04.2015 | Designation fee(s) paid | 20.04.2015 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 20.04.2015 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 20.04.2015 | Examination requested [2015/31] | 18.10.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2017/19] | 12.12.2016 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2017/19] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.04.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 17.07.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 13.09.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US5475975 (NASU MASAHIRO [JP]) [A] 1 * the whole document *; | [A]GB2341687 (SIEMENS AG [DE]) [A] 1 * page 2, paragraph 2 * * page 5, paragraph 3 - page 6, paragraph 2 * * page 7, paragraph 2 * * page 8, paragraph 2 *; | [A]EP1128045 (NISSAN MOTOR [JP]) [A] 1* the whole document *; | [XI]JP2004036464 (TOYOTA MOTOR CORP) [X] 1-4 * figure 1 * * paragraph [0004] - paragraph [0006] * * paragraph [0007] - paragraph [0008] * * paragraph [0010] - paragraph [0018] * * paragraph [0022] - paragraph [0024] * * paragraph [0029] - paragraph [0030] * * paragraph [0033] - paragraph [0034] * * paragraph [0055] - paragraph [0057] * * paragraph [0068] - paragraph [0072] * * paragraph [0074] * * paragraph [0076] * * paragraph [0079] - paragraph [0080] * * paragraph [0084] - paragraph [0086] * * paragraph [0099] * * paragraph [0105] - paragraph [0106] * [I] 5-8; | [A]DE102005056152 (BOSCH GMBH ROBERT [DE]) [A] 1 * the whole document *; | [A]US2008148804 (YEZERETS ALEKSEY [US], et al) [A] 7,8 * paragraph [0048] - paragraph [0049]; figure 3 *; | [A]US2011106396 (MOLL HARALD [DE], et al) [A] 7,8 * paragraphs [0011] , [0 19] , [0 22] - [0023] * | International search | [A]JPH07197837 (TOYOTA MOTOR CORP); | [A]JPH11257130 (SUZUKI MOTOR CO); | [A]JP2003083047 (MAZDA MOTOR); | [A]JP2005240716 (NISSAN MOTOR); | [A]JP2010071259 (TOYOTA MOTOR CORP) | by applicant | JPH06280662 | JPH09287504 | JP2007285288 | JP2011117462 |