EP2891800 - RECIPROCATING COMPRESSOR [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 28.09.2018 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 20.10.2017 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 04.07.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.07.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL, IS | published on 19.08.2020 [2020/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Mayekawa Mfg. Co., Ltd. 14-15, Botan 3-chome Koto-ku Tokyo 135-8482 / JP | [2015/28] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SATO, Hideaki C/O MAYEKAWA MFG. CO. LTD. 14-15 Botan 3-chome Koto-ku Tokyo 135-8482 / JP | 02 /
TAKENOUTI, Toru C/O MAYEKAWA MFG. CO. LTD. 14-15 Botan 3-chome Koto-ku Tokyo 135-8482 / JP | 03 /
IKEDA, Yasuyuki C/O MAYEKAWA MFG. CO. LTD. 14-15 Botan 3-chome Koto-ku Tokyo 135-8482 / JP | [2015/28] | Representative(s) | Regimbeau 20, rue de Chazelles 75847 Paris Cedex 17 / FR | [2015/28] | Application number, filing date | 12885949.3 | 01.10.2012 | [2017/47] | WO2012JP75324 | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2014054092 | Date: | 10.04.2014 | Language: | JA | [2014/15] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2891800 | Date: | 08.07.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/28] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2891800 | Date: | 22.11.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/47] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 10.04.2014 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 09.08.2016 | Classification | IPC: | F04B27/04, F04B39/12, F04B49/03 | [2016/36] | CPC: |
F04B39/04 (EP,US);
F04B27/0404 (EP,US);
F04B35/01 (US);
F04B39/0022 (US);
F04B39/0094 (US);
F04B39/023 (EP,US);
F04B39/0261 (EP,US);
F04B39/0276 (US);
F04B39/0284 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2015/28] | F04B27/04 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2015/28] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | HUBKOLBENVERDICHTER | [2015/28] | English: | RECIPROCATING COMPRESSOR | [2015/28] | French: | COMPRESSEUR À PISTON | [2015/28] | Entry into regional phase | 01.04.2015 | Translation filed | 01.04.2015 | National basic fee paid | 01.04.2015 | Search fee paid | 01.04.2015 | Designation fee(s) paid | 01.04.2015 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 01.04.2015 | Examination requested [2015/28] | 06.03.2017 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 03.07.2017 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 16.10.2017 | Fee for grant paid | 16.10.2017 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 16.10.2017 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 03.07.2017 | Opposition(s) | 23.08.2018 | No opposition filed within time limit [2018/44] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 01.04.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.10.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 11.10.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 11.10.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AL | 22.11.2017 | AT | 22.11.2017 | CY | 22.11.2017 | CZ | 22.11.2017 | EE | 22.11.2017 | HR | 22.11.2017 | LT | 22.11.2017 | LV | 22.11.2017 | MC | 22.11.2017 | MK | 22.11.2017 | PT | 22.11.2017 | RO | 22.11.2017 | RS | 22.11.2017 | SE | 22.11.2017 | SI | 22.11.2017 | SK | 22.11.2017 | SM | 22.11.2017 | TR | 22.11.2017 | BG | 22.02.2018 | GR | 23.02.2018 | IS | 22.03.2018 | [2020/33] |
Former [2020/31] | AT | 22.11.2017 | |
CY | 22.11.2017 | ||
CZ | 22.11.2017 | ||
EE | 22.11.2017 | ||
HR | 22.11.2017 | ||
LT | 22.11.2017 | ||
LV | 22.11.2017 | ||
MC | 22.11.2017 | ||
MK | 22.11.2017 | ||
PT | 22.11.2017 | ||
RO | 22.11.2017 | ||
RS | 22.11.2017 | ||
SE | 22.11.2017 | ||
SI | 22.11.2017 | ||
SK | 22.11.2017 | ||
SM | 22.11.2017 | ||
TR | 22.11.2017 | ||
BG | 22.02.2018 | ||
GR | 23.02.2018 | ||
Former [2020/28] | AT | 22.11.2017 | |
CY | 22.11.2017 | ||
CZ | 22.11.2017 | ||
EE | 22.11.2017 | ||
HR | 22.11.2017 | ||
LT | 22.11.2017 | ||
LV | 22.11.2017 | ||
MC | 22.11.2017 | ||
PT | 22.11.2017 | ||
RO | 22.11.2017 | ||
RS | 22.11.2017 | ||
SE | 22.11.2017 | ||
SI | 22.11.2017 | ||
SK | 22.11.2017 | ||
SM | 22.11.2017 | ||
TR | 22.11.2017 | ||
BG | 22.02.2018 | ||
GR | 23.02.2018 | ||
Former [2020/16] | AT | 22.11.2017 | |
CY | 22.11.2017 | ||
CZ | 22.11.2017 | ||
EE | 22.11.2017 | ||
HR | 22.11.2017 | ||
LT | 22.11.2017 | ||
LV | 22.11.2017 | ||
MC | 22.11.2017 | ||
RO | 22.11.2017 | ||
RS | 22.11.2017 | ||
SE | 22.11.2017 | ||
SI | 22.11.2017 | ||
SK | 22.11.2017 | ||
SM | 22.11.2017 | ||
TR | 22.11.2017 | ||
BG | 22.02.2018 | ||
GR | 23.02.2018 | ||
Former [2019/28] | AT | 22.11.2017 | |
CY | 22.11.2017 | ||
CZ | 22.11.2017 | ||
EE | 22.11.2017 | ||
HR | 22.11.2017 | ||
LT | 22.11.2017 | ||
LV | 22.11.2017 | ||
MC | 22.11.2017 | ||
RO | 22.11.2017 | ||
RS | 22.11.2017 | ||
SE | 22.11.2017 | ||
SI | 22.11.2017 | ||
SK | 22.11.2017 | ||
SM | 22.11.2017 | ||
BG | 22.02.2018 | ||
GR | 23.02.2018 | ||
Former [2018/52] | AT | 22.11.2017 | |
CY | 22.11.2017 | ||
CZ | 22.11.2017 | ||
EE | 22.11.2017 | ||
HR | 22.11.2017 | ||
LT | 22.11.2017 | ||
LV | 22.11.2017 | ||
RO | 22.11.2017 | ||
RS | 22.11.2017 | ||
SE | 22.11.2017 | ||
SI | 22.11.2017 | ||
SK | 22.11.2017 | ||
SM | 22.11.2017 | ||
BG | 22.02.2018 | ||
GR | 23.02.2018 | ||
Former [2018/40] | AT | 22.11.2017 | |
CY | 22.11.2017 | ||
CZ | 22.11.2017 | ||
EE | 22.11.2017 | ||
HR | 22.11.2017 | ||
LT | 22.11.2017 | ||
LV | 22.11.2017 | ||
RO | 22.11.2017 | ||
RS | 22.11.2017 | ||
SE | 22.11.2017 | ||
SK | 22.11.2017 | ||
SM | 22.11.2017 | ||
BG | 22.02.2018 | ||
GR | 23.02.2018 | ||
Former [2018/37] | AT | 22.11.2017 | |
CY | 22.11.2017 | ||
CZ | 22.11.2017 | ||
EE | 22.11.2017 | ||
HR | 22.11.2017 | ||
LT | 22.11.2017 | ||
LV | 22.11.2017 | ||
RS | 22.11.2017 | ||
SE | 22.11.2017 | ||
SK | 22.11.2017 | ||
SM | 22.11.2017 | ||
BG | 22.02.2018 | ||
GR | 23.02.2018 | ||
Former [2018/24] | AT | 22.11.2017 | |
HR | 22.11.2017 | ||
LT | 22.11.2017 | ||
LV | 22.11.2017 | ||
RS | 22.11.2017 | ||
SE | 22.11.2017 | ||
BG | 22.02.2018 | ||
GR | 23.02.2018 | ||
Former [2018/22] | LT | 22.11.2017 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US2008715 (HULL HARRY B) [X] 1-4,6 * page 2, column 1, line 17 - page 2, column 2, paragraph 13; figure - *; | [A]US2844305 (BECHT RICHARD J, et al) [A] 1-5 * column 2, line 17 - column 3, line 12; figure - *; | [A]US6010314 (KOBAYASHI HISAKAZU [JP], et al) [A] 6 * column 6, lines 39-62; figure -; claim - * | International search | [A]GB2058233 (CARRIER CORP); | [A]DE955987 (DEMAG DRUCKLUFTTECH); | [A]WO0188374 (ZEXEL COLD SYSTEMS COMPANY [JP], et al) | by applicant | US4887514 |