Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2014054067 | Global Dossier | 10.04.2014 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2012JP06295 | 02.10.2012 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US9397582 | Global Dossier | 19.07.2016 | B2 | US2015180368 | 25.06.2015 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2012JP06295 | 02.10.2012 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JPWO2014054067 | Global Dossier | 25.08.2016 | A1 | JP5339018B | 13.11.2013 | B1 | Priority number | Date | WO2012JP06295 | 02.10.2012 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN104604112B | Global Dossier | 24.05.2017 | B | CN104604112 | 06.05.2015 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2012JP06295 | 02.10.2012 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP2892145 | Global Dossier | 18.04.2018 | B1 | EP2892145 | 18.05.2016 | A4 | EP2892145 | 08.07.2015 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2012JP06295 | 02.10.2012 |