EP2880529 - HYBRID CLOUD ENVIRONMENT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 27.08.2021 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 06.04.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.08.2021 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 29.09.2021 [2021/39] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Hewlett Packard Enterprise Development LP 11445 Compaq Center Drive West Houston, TX 77070 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2016/25] | For all designated states Hewlett Packard Enterprise Development L.P. 11445 Compaq Center Drive West Houston, TX 77070 / US | ||
Former [2015/24] | For all designated states Hewlett-Packard Development Company, L.P. 11445 Compaq Center Drive W. Houston, Texas 77070 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MAES, Stephane Herman 1140 Enterprise Way Sunnyvale, California 94089 / US | 02 /
BHARADHWAJ, Rajeev 1140 Enterprise Way Sunnyvale, California 94089 / US | 03 /
LABAT, Jerome 1140 Enterprise Way Sunnyvale, California 94089 / US | 04 /
GOEPEL, Thomas 1140 Enterprise Way Sunnyvale, California 94089 / US | [2015/24] | Representative(s) | Haseltine Lake Kempner LLP One Portwall Square Portwall Lane Bristol BS1 6BH / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2015/24] | Stöckeler, Ferdinand, et al Schoppe, Zimmermann, Stöckeler Zinkler, Schenk & Partner mbB Patentanwälte Radlkoferstrasse 2 81373 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 12886486.5 | 08.10.2012 | WO2012US59209 | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2014058411 | Date: | 17.04.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/16] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2880529 | Date: | 10.06.2015 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 17.04.2014 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2015/24] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 17.04.2014 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 18.05.2016 | Classification | IPC: | G06F9/50 | [2016/24] | CPC: |
G06F9/5072 (EP,US);
H04L67/10 (US);
H04L43/10 (US)
|
Former IPC [2015/24] | G06F9/44, G06F15/16 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2015/24] | Title | German: | HYBRIDE CLOUD-UMGEBUNG | [2015/24] | English: | HYBRID CLOUD ENVIRONMENT | [2015/24] | French: | ENVIRONNEMENT EN NUAGE HYBRIDE | [2015/24] | Entry into regional phase | 20.01.2015 | National basic fee paid | 20.01.2015 | Search fee paid | 20.01.2015 | Designation fee(s) paid | 20.01.2015 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 20.01.2015 | Examination requested [2015/24] | 12.12.2016 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 10.04.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 18.07.2019 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.07.2020 | Date of oral proceedings | 01.05.2021 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2021/39] | 26.05.2021 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2021/39] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 10.04.2019 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.01.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.10.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.10.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 23.10.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 26.10.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 21.10.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.10.2020 | 09   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [I]US2011125894 (ANDERSON ERIC W B [US], et al) [I] 1-15 * paragraphs [0003] - [0009] - [ 110] *; | [I]US2012102486 (YENDLURI PRASADARAO [US]) [I] 1-15 * paragraphs [0001] - [0017] - [0038] *; | [I]US2012204187 (BREITER GERD [DE], et al) [I] 1-15 * paragraphs [0002] - [0011] - [0038] - [0043] *; | [XI] - "BMC Cloud Lifecycle Management", SOLUTION WHITE PAPER, (20110101), XP055178426 [X] 1,2,8 * the whole document * [I] 3-7,9-15 | [A] - K Hwang ET AL, "Cloud architecture and datacenter design", (20100502), pages 1 - 57, URL: http://www.cs.gsu.edu/~cscnxx/Chapter7-Cloud-Architecture-May2-2010.pdf, (20130702), XP055069035 [A] 1-15 * the whole document * | International search | [Y]US2011231899 (PULIER ERIC [US], et al); | [A]US2011296021 (DORAI CHITRA [US], et al); | [A]US2012124211 (KAMPAS SEAN ROBERT [US], et al); | [Y] - "BMC Cloud Lifecycle Management", BMC SOFTWARE, (2011), pages 1 - 10, XP055178426 |