EP2900913 - SYSTEM, METHOD AND COMPUTER PROGRAM PRODUCT FOR WELLBORE EVENT MODELING USING RIMLIER DATA [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 15.06.2018 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 07.07.2017 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 18.04.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.07.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL | published on 19.08.2020 [2020/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Landmark Graphics Corporation 2107 City West Blvd., Bldg. 2 Houston, Texas 77042 / US | For all designated states Samuel, Robello 12918 Dove Point Lane Houston, Texas 77041 / US | For all designated states Germain, Olivier Roger 5224 Sagecircle Street N Houston, Texas 77056 / US | [2015/32] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SAMUEL, Robello 12918 Dove Point Lane Houston, Texas 77041 / US | 02 /
GERMAIN, Olivier Roger 5224 Sagecircle Street N Houston, Texas 77056 / US | [2015/32] | Representative(s) | Hoffmann Eitle Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB Arabellastraße 30 81925 München / DE | [2015/32] | Application number, filing date | 12887689.3 | 05.11.2012 | [2017/32] | WO2012US63555 | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2014070207 | Date: | 08.05.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/19] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2900913 | Date: | 05.08.2015 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 08.05.2014 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2015/32] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2900913 | Date: | 09.08.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/32] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 08.05.2014 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 20.05.2016 | Classification | IPC: | E21B47/00, G06F17/18 | [2016/25] | CPC: |
E21B44/00 (EP,US);
G06F17/18 (EP,US);
G06F18/2321 (EP,US);
G06F18/2433 (EP,US);
G06F30/20 (US);
G01N2291/02818 (US);
G01V1/48 (US);
G01V1/50 (US);
G06F16/24565 (EP,US);
G06F16/355 (EP,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2015/32] | E21B47/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2015/32] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | SYSTEM, VERFAHREN UND COMPUTERPROGRAMMPRODUKT FÜR DIE MODELLIERUNG VON BOHRLOSEREIGNISSEN ANHAND RIMLIER-DATEN | [2015/32] | English: | SYSTEM, METHOD AND COMPUTER PROGRAM PRODUCT FOR WELLBORE EVENT MODELING USING RIMLIER DATA | [2015/32] | French: | SYSTÈME, PROCÉDÉ ET PRODUIT PROGRAMME D'ORDINATEUR POUR LA MODÉLISATION D'UNE ACTIVITÉ DE TROU DE FORAGE AU MOYEN DE DONNÉES LIÉES AUX COMPORTEMENTS ANORMAUX | [2015/32] | Entry into regional phase | 27.04.2015 | National basic fee paid | 27.04.2015 | Search fee paid | 27.04.2015 | Designation fee(s) paid | 27.04.2015 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 27.04.2015 | Examination requested [2015/32] | 24.11.2016 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 18.04.2017 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 28.06.2017 | Fee for grant paid | 28.06.2017 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 28.06.2017 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 18.04.2017 | Opposition(s) | 11.05.2018 | No opposition filed within time limit [2018/29] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.03.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 06.11.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 21.10.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 05.11.2012 | AL | 09.08.2017 | AT | 09.08.2017 | CY | 09.08.2017 | CZ | 09.08.2017 | DK | 09.08.2017 | EE | 09.08.2017 | ES | 09.08.2017 | FI | 09.08.2017 | HR | 09.08.2017 | IT | 09.08.2017 | LT | 09.08.2017 | LV | 09.08.2017 | MC | 09.08.2017 | MK | 09.08.2017 | NL | 09.08.2017 | PL | 09.08.2017 | PT | 09.08.2017 | RO | 09.08.2017 | RS | 09.08.2017 | SE | 09.08.2017 | SI | 09.08.2017 | SK | 09.08.2017 | SM | 09.08.2017 | TR | 09.08.2017 | IE | 05.11.2017 | LU | 05.11.2017 | MT | 05.11.2017 | BG | 09.11.2017 | GR | 10.11.2017 | BE | 30.11.2017 | CH | 30.11.2017 | LI | 30.11.2017 | IS | 09.12.2017 | [2020/34] |
Former [2020/28] | HU | 05.11.2012 | |
AT | 09.08.2017 | ||
CY | 09.08.2017 | ||
CZ | 09.08.2017 | ||
DK | 09.08.2017 | ||
EE | 09.08.2017 | ||
ES | 09.08.2017 | ||
FI | 09.08.2017 | ||
HR | 09.08.2017 | ||
IT | 09.08.2017 | ||
LT | 09.08.2017 | ||
LV | 09.08.2017 | ||
MC | 09.08.2017 | ||
MK | 09.08.2017 | ||
NL | 09.08.2017 | ||
PL | 09.08.2017 | ||
PT | 09.08.2017 | ||
RO | 09.08.2017 | ||
RS | 09.08.2017 | ||
SE | 09.08.2017 | ||
SI | 09.08.2017 | ||
SK | 09.08.2017 | ||
SM | 09.08.2017 | ||
TR | 09.08.2017 | ||
IE | 05.11.2017 | ||
LU | 05.11.2017 | ||
MT | 05.11.2017 | ||
BG | 09.11.2017 | ||
GR | 10.11.2017 | ||
BE | 30.11.2017 | ||
CH | 30.11.2017 | ||
LI | 30.11.2017 | ||
IS | 09.12.2017 | ||
Former [2020/15] | HU | 05.11.2012 | |
AT | 09.08.2017 | ||
CY | 09.08.2017 | ||
CZ | 09.08.2017 | ||
DK | 09.08.2017 | ||
EE | 09.08.2017 | ||
ES | 09.08.2017 | ||
FI | 09.08.2017 | ||
HR | 09.08.2017 | ||
IT | 09.08.2017 | ||
LT | 09.08.2017 | ||
LV | 09.08.2017 | ||
MC | 09.08.2017 | ||
MK | 09.08.2017 | ||
NL | 09.08.2017 | ||
PL | 09.08.2017 | ||
RO | 09.08.2017 | ||
RS | 09.08.2017 | ||
SE | 09.08.2017 | ||
SI | 09.08.2017 | ||
SK | 09.08.2017 | ||
SM | 09.08.2017 | ||
TR | 09.08.2017 | ||
IE | 05.11.2017 | ||
LU | 05.11.2017 | ||
MT | 05.11.2017 | ||
BG | 09.11.2017 | ||
GR | 10.11.2017 | ||
BE | 30.11.2017 | ||
CH | 30.11.2017 | ||
LI | 30.11.2017 | ||
IS | 09.12.2017 | ||
Former [2019/51] | HU | 05.11.2012 | |
AT | 09.08.2017 | ||
CY | 09.08.2017 | ||
CZ | 09.08.2017 | ||
DK | 09.08.2017 | ||
EE | 09.08.2017 | ||
ES | 09.08.2017 | ||
FI | 09.08.2017 | ||
HR | 09.08.2017 | ||
IT | 09.08.2017 | ||
LT | 09.08.2017 | ||
LV | 09.08.2017 | ||
MC | 09.08.2017 | ||
MK | 09.08.2017 | ||
NL | 09.08.2017 | ||
PL | 09.08.2017 | ||
RO | 09.08.2017 | ||
RS | 09.08.2017 | ||
SE | 09.08.2017 | ||
SI | 09.08.2017 | ||
SK | 09.08.2017 | ||
SM | 09.08.2017 | ||
IE | 05.11.2017 | ||
LU | 05.11.2017 | ||
MT | 05.11.2017 | ||
BG | 09.11.2017 | ||
GR | 10.11.2017 | ||
BE | 30.11.2017 | ||
CH | 30.11.2017 | ||
LI | 30.11.2017 | ||
IS | 09.12.2017 | ||
Former [2019/47] | HU | 05.11.2012 | |
AT | 09.08.2017 | ||
CY | 09.08.2017 | ||
CZ | 09.08.2017 | ||
DK | 09.08.2017 | ||
EE | 09.08.2017 | ||
ES | 09.08.2017 | ||
FI | 09.08.2017 | ||
HR | 09.08.2017 | ||
IT | 09.08.2017 | ||
LT | 09.08.2017 | ||
LV | 09.08.2017 | ||
MC | 09.08.2017 | ||
NL | 09.08.2017 | ||
PL | 09.08.2017 | ||
RO | 09.08.2017 | ||
RS | 09.08.2017 | ||
SE | 09.08.2017 | ||
SI | 09.08.2017 | ||
SK | 09.08.2017 | ||
SM | 09.08.2017 | ||
IE | 05.11.2017 | ||
LU | 05.11.2017 | ||
MT | 05.11.2017 | ||
BG | 09.11.2017 | ||
GR | 10.11.2017 | ||
BE | 30.11.2017 | ||
CH | 30.11.2017 | ||
LI | 30.11.2017 | ||
IS | 09.12.2017 | ||
Former [2019/31] | HU | 05.11.2012 | |
AT | 09.08.2017 | ||
CZ | 09.08.2017 | ||
DK | 09.08.2017 | ||
EE | 09.08.2017 | ||
ES | 09.08.2017 | ||
FI | 09.08.2017 | ||
HR | 09.08.2017 | ||
IT | 09.08.2017 | ||
LT | 09.08.2017 | ||
LV | 09.08.2017 | ||
MC | 09.08.2017 | ||
NL | 09.08.2017 | ||
PL | 09.08.2017 | ||
RO | 09.08.2017 | ||
RS | 09.08.2017 | ||
SE | 09.08.2017 | ||
SI | 09.08.2017 | ||
SK | 09.08.2017 | ||
SM | 09.08.2017 | ||
IE | 05.11.2017 | ||
LU | 05.11.2017 | ||
MT | 05.11.2017 | ||
BG | 09.11.2017 | ||
GR | 10.11.2017 | ||
BE | 30.11.2017 | ||
CH | 30.11.2017 | ||
LI | 30.11.2017 | ||
IS | 09.12.2017 | ||
Former [2018/50] | AT | 09.08.2017 | |
CZ | 09.08.2017 | ||
DK | 09.08.2017 | ||
EE | 09.08.2017 | ||
ES | 09.08.2017 | ||
FI | 09.08.2017 | ||
HR | 09.08.2017 | ||
IT | 09.08.2017 | ||
LT | 09.08.2017 | ||
LV | 09.08.2017 | ||
MC | 09.08.2017 | ||
NL | 09.08.2017 | ||
PL | 09.08.2017 | ||
RO | 09.08.2017 | ||
RS | 09.08.2017 | ||
SE | 09.08.2017 | ||
SI | 09.08.2017 | ||
SK | 09.08.2017 | ||
SM | 09.08.2017 | ||
IE | 05.11.2017 | ||
LU | 05.11.2017 | ||
MT | 05.11.2017 | ||
BG | 09.11.2017 | ||
GR | 10.11.2017 | ||
BE | 30.11.2017 | ||
CH | 30.11.2017 | ||
LI | 30.11.2017 | ||
IS | 09.12.2017 | ||
Former [2018/45] | AT | 09.08.2017 | |
CZ | 09.08.2017 | ||
DK | 09.08.2017 | ||
EE | 09.08.2017 | ||
ES | 09.08.2017 | ||
FI | 09.08.2017 | ||
HR | 09.08.2017 | ||
IT | 09.08.2017 | ||
LT | 09.08.2017 | ||
LV | 09.08.2017 | ||
MC | 09.08.2017 | ||
NL | 09.08.2017 | ||
PL | 09.08.2017 | ||
RO | 09.08.2017 | ||
RS | 09.08.2017 | ||
SE | 09.08.2017 | ||
SI | 09.08.2017 | ||
SK | 09.08.2017 | ||
SM | 09.08.2017 | ||
IE | 05.11.2017 | ||
LU | 05.11.2017 | ||
MT | 05.11.2017 | ||
BG | 09.11.2017 | ||
GR | 10.11.2017 | ||
CH | 30.11.2017 | ||
LI | 30.11.2017 | ||
IS | 09.12.2017 | ||
Former [2018/43] | AT | 09.08.2017 | |
CZ | 09.08.2017 | ||
DK | 09.08.2017 | ||
EE | 09.08.2017 | ||
ES | 09.08.2017 | ||
FI | 09.08.2017 | ||
HR | 09.08.2017 | ||
IT | 09.08.2017 | ||
LT | 09.08.2017 | ||
LV | 09.08.2017 | ||
MC | 09.08.2017 | ||
NL | 09.08.2017 | ||
PL | 09.08.2017 | ||
RO | 09.08.2017 | ||
RS | 09.08.2017 | ||
SE | 09.08.2017 | ||
SI | 09.08.2017 | ||
SK | 09.08.2017 | ||
SM | 09.08.2017 | ||
LU | 05.11.2017 | ||
MT | 05.11.2017 | ||
BG | 09.11.2017 | ||
GR | 10.11.2017 | ||
CH | 30.11.2017 | ||
LI | 30.11.2017 | ||
IS | 09.12.2017 | ||
Former [2018/40] | AT | 09.08.2017 | |
CZ | 09.08.2017 | ||
DK | 09.08.2017 | ||
EE | 09.08.2017 | ||
ES | 09.08.2017 | ||
FI | 09.08.2017 | ||
HR | 09.08.2017 | ||
IT | 09.08.2017 | ||
LT | 09.08.2017 | ||
LV | 09.08.2017 | ||
MC | 09.08.2017 | ||
NL | 09.08.2017 | ||
PL | 09.08.2017 | ||
RO | 09.08.2017 | ||
RS | 09.08.2017 | ||
SE | 09.08.2017 | ||
SI | 09.08.2017 | ||
SK | 09.08.2017 | ||
SM | 09.08.2017 | ||
LU | 05.11.2017 | ||
BG | 09.11.2017 | ||
GR | 10.11.2017 | ||
CH | 30.11.2017 | ||
LI | 30.11.2017 | ||
IS | 09.12.2017 | ||
Former [2018/33] | AT | 09.08.2017 | |
CZ | 09.08.2017 | ||
DK | 09.08.2017 | ||
EE | 09.08.2017 | ||
ES | 09.08.2017 | ||
FI | 09.08.2017 | ||
HR | 09.08.2017 | ||
IT | 09.08.2017 | ||
LT | 09.08.2017 | ||
LV | 09.08.2017 | ||
MC | 09.08.2017 | ||
NL | 09.08.2017 | ||
PL | 09.08.2017 | ||
RO | 09.08.2017 | ||
RS | 09.08.2017 | ||
SE | 09.08.2017 | ||
SK | 09.08.2017 | ||
SM | 09.08.2017 | ||
BG | 09.11.2017 | ||
GR | 10.11.2017 | ||
CH | 30.11.2017 | ||
LI | 30.11.2017 | ||
IS | 09.12.2017 | ||
Former [2018/25] | AT | 09.08.2017 | |
CZ | 09.08.2017 | ||
DK | 09.08.2017 | ||
EE | 09.08.2017 | ||
ES | 09.08.2017 | ||
FI | 09.08.2017 | ||
HR | 09.08.2017 | ||
IT | 09.08.2017 | ||
LT | 09.08.2017 | ||
LV | 09.08.2017 | ||
NL | 09.08.2017 | ||
PL | 09.08.2017 | ||
RO | 09.08.2017 | ||
RS | 09.08.2017 | ||
SE | 09.08.2017 | ||
SK | 09.08.2017 | ||
SM | 09.08.2017 | ||
BG | 09.11.2017 | ||
GR | 10.11.2017 | ||
IS | 09.12.2017 | ||
Former [2018/21] | AT | 09.08.2017 | |
CZ | 09.08.2017 | ||
DK | 09.08.2017 | ||
ES | 09.08.2017 | ||
FI | 09.08.2017 | ||
HR | 09.08.2017 | ||
LT | 09.08.2017 | ||
LV | 09.08.2017 | ||
NL | 09.08.2017 | ||
PL | 09.08.2017 | ||
RS | 09.08.2017 | ||
SE | 09.08.2017 | ||
BG | 09.11.2017 | ||
GR | 10.11.2017 | ||
IS | 09.12.2017 | ||
Former [2018/12] | AT | 09.08.2017 | |
ES | 09.08.2017 | ||
FI | 09.08.2017 | ||
HR | 09.08.2017 | ||
LT | 09.08.2017 | ||
LV | 09.08.2017 | ||
NL | 09.08.2017 | ||
PL | 09.08.2017 | ||
RS | 09.08.2017 | ||
SE | 09.08.2017 | ||
BG | 09.11.2017 | ||
GR | 10.11.2017 | ||
IS | 09.12.2017 | ||
Former [2018/11] | AT | 09.08.2017 | |
ES | 09.08.2017 | ||
FI | 09.08.2017 | ||
HR | 09.08.2017 | ||
LT | 09.08.2017 | ||
NL | 09.08.2017 | ||
PL | 09.08.2017 | ||
RS | 09.08.2017 | ||
SE | 09.08.2017 | ||
BG | 09.11.2017 | ||
GR | 10.11.2017 | ||
IS | 09.12.2017 | ||
Former [2018/10] | AT | 09.08.2017 | |
FI | 09.08.2017 | ||
HR | 09.08.2017 | ||
LT | 09.08.2017 | ||
NL | 09.08.2017 | ||
RS | 09.08.2017 | ||
SE | 09.08.2017 | ||
Former [2018/09] | FI | 09.08.2017 | |
LT | 09.08.2017 | ||
NL | 09.08.2017 | ||
SE | 09.08.2017 | ||
Former [2018/08] | FI | 09.08.2017 | |
LT | 09.08.2017 | ||
NL | 09.08.2017 | ||
Former [2018/07] | LT | 09.08.2017 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2006162962 (KOEDERITZ WILLIAM L [US], et al) [A] 1-12 * abstract ** paragraphs [0024] , [0038]; figure 1c *; | [A]US2006230018 (GRICHNIK ANTHONY J [US], et al) [A] 1-12 * abstract * * paragraphs [0005] - [0007] - [0035] - [0037]; figures 2-5 *; | [XI]US2012118637 (WANG JINGBO [US], et al) [X] 1,2,4-12 * abstract * * paragraphs [0072] - [0076] - [0080] , [0092] , [0100] , [0101] * * paragraphs [0042] , [0049] , [1111]; figures 1,8,10 * [I] 3 | International search | [A]US2009260883 (SUAREZ-RIVERA ROBERTO [US], et al); | [A]US2011066390 (MACLEOD GORDON [US], et al); | [A]US2011091078 (KHERROUBI JOSSELIN [FR], et al); | [X]US2012118637 (WANG JINGBO [US], et al) | by applicant | US2012118637 |