EP2620165 - Container for training hand disinfection [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 09.12.2016 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 09.12.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 11.01.2017 [2017/02] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Bode Chemie GmbH Melanchthonstrasse 27 22525 Hamburg / DE | [2013/31] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Rhode, Katja Luruper Weg 7 20257 Hamburg / DE | 02 /
Deuter, Joachim Wümmetrift 21 29640 Schneverdingen / DE | 03 /
Hegemann, Christine Gottschalkweg 33 22453 Hamburg / DE | [2014/11] |
Former [2013/31] | 01 /
Rhode, Katja Luruper Weg 7 20257 Hamburg / DE | ||
02 /
Deuter, Joachim Wümmetrift 21 29640 Schneverdingen / DE | |||
03 /
Barkmann, Christine Gottschalkweg 33 22453 Hamburg / DE | Application number, filing date | 13000216.5 | 16.01.2013 | [2013/31] | Priority number, date | DE20121001475 | 26.01.2012 Original published format: DE102012001475 | [2013/31] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2620165 | Date: | 31.07.2013 | Language: | DE | [2013/31] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.06.2013 | Classification | IPC: | A61L2/26, G08B21/24, A61L2/28 | [2013/31] | CPC: |
A61L2/26 (EP);
A61L2/28 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2013/31] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Behälter zur Schulung der Händedesinfektion | [2013/31] | English: | Container for training hand disinfection | [2013/31] | French: | Récipient destiné à la formation sur la désinfection des mains | [2013/31] | Examination procedure | 28.01.2014 | Examination requested [2014/11] | 15.05.2014 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 02.08.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2017/02] | 05.09.2016 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2017/02] | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the Extended European Search Report/Written Opinion of the International Searching Authority/International Preliminary Examination Report/Supplementary international search report/Supplementary European search report | 15.05.2014 | Request for further processing filed | 15.05.2014 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 23.05.2014 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.01.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.01.2016 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]FR1181910 (HENRI COTTE & CIE) [X] 1-15 * Kapitel "RESUME"; page 2; figures 1-2 *; | [X]FR1127434 (SAARBERGWERKE) [X] 1-15 * the whole document *; | [X]WO2007051141 (GERMGARD LIGHTING LLC [US], et al) [X] 1-15 * abstract *; | [A]WO2005093681 (BOURNE LEISURE LTD [GB], et al) [A] 5 * page 11, paragraphs 3,4; figure 3B *; | [A]EP0913681 (BARTLING DUDZIAK KARIN [DE]) [A] 1-15 * figure 2 * | [X] - SCHÖNFELD M ET AL, "Clinical rehabilitation of patients with occupational skin diseases", TRAUMA UND BERUFSKRANKHEIT, SPRINGER, BERLIN, DE, (200605), vol. 8, no. 2, doi:10.1007/S10039-006-1131-1, ISSN 1436-6282, pages 83 - 86, XP019385794 [X] 1-15 * linke Spalte, §4; page 85; figure 4 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1007/s10039-006-1131-1 | [X] - Anonymous, "Produkte - Checkbox", (20100324), Dermalux, URL: http://web.archive.org/web/20100324145544/http://www.dermalux.de/de/produkte/index.php, (20130506), XP002696577 [X] 1-15 * the whole document * | [X] - Anonymous, "Produkte - Zuhbehör", (20100323), Dermalux, URL: http://web.archive.org/web/20100323041329/http://www.dermalux.de/de/produkte/zubehoer.php, (20130506), XP002696578 [X] 1-15 * the whole document * |