EP2642166 - Control device and control method for continuously variable transmission [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 30.11.2018 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.11.2018 | Withdrawal of application | published on 02.01.2019 [2019/01] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states JATCO Ltd 700-1, Imaizumi Fuji-shi Shizuoka 417-8585 / JP | [2013/39] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Takamura, Takuya c/o Jatco Ltd. 700-1, Imaizumi Fuji-shi, Shizuoka, 417-8585 / JP | 02 /
Ohde, Toshinari c/o Jatco Ltd. 700-1, Imaizumi Fuji-shi, Shizuoka, 417-8585 / JP | 03 /
Tanaka, Kiyokazu c/o Jatco Ltd. 700-1, Imaizumi Fuji-shi, Shizuoka, 417-8585 / JP | [2013/39] | Representative(s) | Hoefer & Partner Patentanwälte mbB Pilgersheimer Straße 20 81543 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2013/39] | Hoefer & Partner Pilgersheimer Straße 20 81543 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 13000606.7 | 06.02.2013 | [2013/39] | Priority number, date | JP20120061774 | 19.03.2012 Original published format: JP 2012061774 | [2013/39] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2642166 | Date: | 25.09.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/39] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 14.06.2013 | Classification | IPC: | F16H61/662, // F16H61/16, F16H59/18, F16H59/42 | [2013/39] | CPC: |
F16H61/66259 (EP,US);
F16H61/04 (KR);
B60W10/101 (US);
B60W10/04 (US);
F16H59/18 (KR);
F16H59/42 (KR);
F16H61/66 (KR);
F16H2059/183 (EP,US);
F16H2061/163 (EP,US);
F16H2061/6615 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2013/39] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Vorrichtung und Verfahren zur Steuerung eines stufenlosen Getriebes | [2013/39] | English: | Control device and control method for continuously variable transmission | [2013/39] | French: | Appareil et procédé de contrôle pour transmissions continuellement variables | [2013/39] | Examination procedure | 24.03.2014 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 24.03.2014 | Examination requested [2014/19] | 28.11.2018 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2019/01] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.02.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.02.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.02.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 22.02.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XD]JP2010007749 (NISSAN MOTOR) [XD] 1,8 * the whole document * * figures 1-9 *; | [X]JPH05332426 (MAZDA MOTOR) [X] 1,8 * abstract * * figures 1-8 *; | [A]EP1787942 (TOYOTA MOTOR CO LTD [JP]) [A] 1-8 * the whole document *; | [A]EP1340929 (FUJI HEAVY IND LTD [JP]) [A] 1-8 * the whole document * | by applicant | JP2010007749 |