Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2013257046 | Global Dossier | 03.10.2013 | A1 | Priority number | Date | DE102012006756 | 03.04.2012 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | KR20130113990 | Global Dossier | 16.10.2013 | A | Priority number | Date | DE102012006756 | 03.04.2012 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP5580446B | Global Dossier | 27.08.2014 | B2 | JP2013213582 | 17.10.2013 | A | Priority number | Date | DE102012006756 | 03.04.2012 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN103362911B | Global Dossier | 09.03.2016 | B | CN103362911 | 23.10.2013 | A | Priority number | Date | DE102012006756 | 03.04.2012 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP2647896 | Global Dossier | 02.07.2014 | A3 | EP2647896 | 09.10.2013 | A2 | Priority number | Date | DE102012006756 | 03.04.2012 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | BR102013006509 | 09.06.2015 | A2 | Priority number | Date | DE102012006756 | 03.04.2012 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE102012006756 | 12.09.2013 | B3 | Priority number | Date | DE102012006756 | 03.04.2012 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | RU2538526 | 10.01.2015 | C2 | RU2013112112 | 27.09.2014 | A | Priority number | Date | DE102012006756 | 03.04.2012 |