EP2769983 - Peptidomimetics possessing photo-controlled biological activity [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 24.07.2015 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.07.2015 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 26.08.2015 [2015/35] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Karlsruher Institut für Technologie Kaiserstrasse 12 76131 Karlsruhe / DE | For all designated states Taras Shevchenko National University of Kyiv 60, Volodymyrska Street City of Kyiv 01601 / UA | [2014/35] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Afonin, Sergiy Auer Strasse 2 76227 Karlsruhe / DE | 02 /
Babii, Oleg Schützenstrasse 50 76137 Karlsruhe / DE | 03 /
Komarov, Igor Lenina Str. 2d Pukhivka 07413 Kytiv Gebiet / UA | 04 /
Mykhailiuk, Pavlo Simirenko Str. 2/19 Wohnung 157 01134 Kyiv / UA | 05 /
Ulrich, Anne Durlacher Strasse 88 76229 Karlsruhe / DE | [2014/35] | Representative(s) | Müller-Boré & Partner Patentanwälte PartG mbB Friedenheimer Brücke 21 80639 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2014/35] | Müller-Boré & Partner Patentanwälte PartG mbB Friedenheimer Brücke 21 80639 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 13000893.1 | 22.02.2013 | [2014/35] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2769983 | Date: | 27.08.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/35] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 23.07.2013 | Classification | IPC: | C07K7/66, C07K7/06 | [2014/35] | CPC: |
C07K7/66 (EP,US);
C07D333/38 (EP,US);
C07K7/06 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2014/35] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Peptidomimetika mit lichtgesteuerter biologischer Aktivität | [2014/35] | English: | Peptidomimetics possessing photo-controlled biological activity | [2014/35] | French: | Peptidomimétiques présentant une activité biologique photo commandée | [2014/35] | Examination procedure | 22.02.2013 | Examination requested [2014/35] | 28.02.2015 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2015/35] | 09.04.2015 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2015/35] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 28.02.2015 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A] - KAZUHISA FUJIMOTO ET AL, "Photoswitchable, DNA-Binding Helical Peptides Assembled with Two Independently Designed Sequences for Photoregulation and DNA Recognition", CHEMISTRY - A EUROPEAN JOURNAL, (20120806), vol. 18, no. 32, doi:10.1002/chem.201201431, ISSN 0947-6539, pages 9834 - 9840, XP055071403 [A] 1-15 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/chem.201201431 | [A] - MARINA BLANCO-LOMAS ET AL, "Reversible Photocontrol of Peptide Conformation with a Rhodopsin-like Photoswitch", JOURNAL OF THE AMERICAN CHEMICAL SOCIETY, (20120425), vol. 134, no. 16, doi:10.1021/ja301868p, ISSN 0002-7863, pages 6960 - 6963, XP055071566 [A] 1-15 * figure 3 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/ja301868p | [A] - J. WACHTVEITL ET AL, "Ultrafast Conformational Dynamics in Cyclic Azobenzene Peptides of Increased Flexibility", BIOPHYSICAL JOURNAL, (20040401), vol. 86, no. 4, doi:10.1016/S0006-3495(04)74292-7, ISSN 0006-3495, pages 2350 - 2362, XP055071548 [A] 1-15 * figure 1 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0006-3495(04)74292-7 | [A] - MARKUS SCHÜTT ET AL, "Photocontrol of cell adhesion processes: model studies with cyclic azobenzene-RGD peptides.", CHEMISTRY & BIOLOGY, (20030601), vol. 10, no. 6, ISSN 1074-5521, pages 487 - 490, XP055071552 [A] 1-15 * figure 1 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S1074-5521(03)00128-5 | by applicant | - WILLNER, I.; RUBIN, I, "Con trol of the structure and functions of biomaterials by light", ANGEW. CHEM., INT. ED. ENGL, (1996), vol. 35, pages 367 - 385 | - H. MORI; Y. MORI; S. SUGIE; N. YOSHIMI; M. TAKAHASHI; H. NI-I; H. YAMAZAKI; K. TOYOSHI; G. M. WILLIAMS, "Genotoxicity of a variety of azobenzene and aminoa- zobenzene compounds in the hepatocyte/DNA repair test and the Salmo- nella/mutagenicity test", CANCER RES., (1986), vol. 46, pages 1654 - 1658 | - YASUSHI SHIGERI; YOSHIRO TATSU; NOBORU YUMOTO, "Synthesis and application of caged peptides and proteins", PHARMACOLOGY & THERAPEUTICS, (2001), vol. 91, pages 85 - 92 | - S. GRONOWITZ; K. STENHAMAR; L. SVENSSON, HETEROCYCLES, (1981), vol. 15, page 947 | - T. B. NORSTEN; N. R. BRANDA, J. AM. CHEM. SOC., (2001), vol. 123, page 1784 | - M. IRIE, "Photochromism of diarylethene single molecules and single crystals. Photochem", PHOTOBIOL. SCI., (2010), vol. 9, pages 1535 - 1542 | - "Susceptibility testing of antimicrobials in liquid media", DANIEL AMSTERDAM, Antibiotics in laboratory medicine, WILLIAMS AND WILKINS, (1996), pages 52 - 111 |