Extract from the Register of European Patents
EP Event history: EP2778667
Date |
Description |
European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
16.10.2020 |
New entry: Additional fee for renewal fee: despatch of communication + time limit |
|
16.10.2020 |
Application deemed to be withdrawn |
published on 18.11.2020 [2020/47] |
24.06.2020 |
New entry: Application deemed to be withdrawn: despatch of communication + time limit |
|
02.01.2020 |
New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
23.07.2019 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
14.05.2019 |
Change: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
30.03.2019 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
26.01.2019 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
03.04.2018 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
30.05.2017 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
03.04.2017 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
21.03.2017 |
Change: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
05.12.2016 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
25.11.2016 |
First examination report |
|
15.01.2016 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
20.03.2015 |
Amendment by applicant |
|
20.03.2015 |
Change - designated states |
published on 22.04.2015 [2015/17] |
20.03.2015 |
Change - request for examination |
published on 22.04.2015 [2015/17] |
20.01.2015 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
16.09.2014 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 17.09.2014 [2014/38] |
15.08.2014 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 17.09.2014 [2014/38] |