EP2644750 - Electroconductive material for connection component [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 27.02.2015 Database last updated on 18.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.10.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL | published on 14.11.2018 [2018/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Kabushiki Kaisha Kobe Seiko Sho (Kobe Steel, Ltd.) 10-26, Wakinohama-cho 2-chome, Chuo-ku Kobe-shi Hyogo 651-8585 / JP | [2013/40] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Tsuru, Masahiro Chofu Plant in Kobe Steel, Ltd. 14-1, Chofuminato-machi Shimonoseki-shi Yamaguchi 752-0953 / JP | [2013/40] | Representative(s) | Müller-Boré & Partner Patentanwälte PartG mbB Friedenheimer Brücke 21 80639 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2014/17] | Müller-Boré & Partner Patentanwälte PartG mbB Friedenheimer Brücke 21 80639 München / DE | ||
Former [2013/40] | Müller-Boré & Partner Patentanwälte Grafinger Straße 2 81671 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 13001299.0 | 14.03.2013 | [2013/40] | Priority number, date | JP20120078748 | 30.03.2012 Original published format: JP 2012078748 | [2013/40] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2644750 | Date: | 02.10.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/40] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2644750 | Date: | 23.04.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/17] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 20.08.2013 | Classification | IPC: | C25D5/10, C25D5/50, H01B1/02 | [2013/40] | CPC: |
C25D5/10 (EP,US);
C25D5/12 (EP,KR,US);
C25D5/505 (EP,KR,US);
C25D5/605 (KR);
H01B1/026 (EP,KR,US);
H01R13/03 (KR);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2013/40] | Title | German: | Elektrisch leitendes Material für Verbindungskomponente | [2013/40] | English: | Electroconductive material for connection component | [2013/40] | French: | Matériau électroconducteur pour composant de connexion | [2013/40] | Examination procedure | 21.03.2013 | Examination requested [2013/40] | 10.12.2013 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 13.03.2014 | Fee for grant paid | 13.03.2014 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 10.12.2013 | Opposition(s) | 26.01.2015 | No opposition filed within time limit [2015/14] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 14.03.2013 | AL | 23.04.2014 | AT | 23.04.2014 | BE | 23.04.2014 | CY | 23.04.2014 | CZ | 23.04.2014 | DK | 23.04.2014 | EE | 23.04.2014 | ES | 23.04.2014 | FI | 23.04.2014 | HR | 23.04.2014 | IT | 23.04.2014 | LT | 23.04.2014 | LV | 23.04.2014 | MC | 23.04.2014 | MK | 23.04.2014 | MT | 23.04.2014 | PL | 23.04.2014 | RO | 23.04.2014 | RS | 23.04.2014 | SE | 23.04.2014 | SI | 23.04.2014 | SK | 23.04.2014 | SM | 23.04.2014 | TR | 23.04.2014 | BG | 23.07.2014 | NO | 23.07.2014 | GR | 24.07.2014 | IS | 23.08.2014 | PT | 25.08.2014 | [2018/46] |
Former [2018/29] | HU | 14.03.2013 | |
AT | 23.04.2014 | ||
BE | 23.04.2014 | ||
CY | 23.04.2014 | ||
CZ | 23.04.2014 | ||
DK | 23.04.2014 | ||
EE | 23.04.2014 | ||
ES | 23.04.2014 | ||
FI | 23.04.2014 | ||
HR | 23.04.2014 | ||
IT | 23.04.2014 | ||
LT | 23.04.2014 | ||
LV | 23.04.2014 | ||
MC | 23.04.2014 | ||
MK | 23.04.2014 | ||
MT | 23.04.2014 | ||
PL | 23.04.2014 | ||
RO | 23.04.2014 | ||
RS | 23.04.2014 | ||
SE | 23.04.2014 | ||
SI | 23.04.2014 | ||
SK | 23.04.2014 | ||
SM | 23.04.2014 | ||
TR | 23.04.2014 | ||
BG | 23.07.2014 | ||
NO | 23.07.2014 | ||
GR | 24.07.2014 | ||
IS | 23.08.2014 | ||
PT | 25.08.2014 | ||
Former [2017/39] | HU | 14.03.2013 | |
AT | 23.04.2014 | ||
BE | 23.04.2014 | ||
CY | 23.04.2014 | ||
CZ | 23.04.2014 | ||
DK | 23.04.2014 | ||
EE | 23.04.2014 | ||
ES | 23.04.2014 | ||
FI | 23.04.2014 | ||
HR | 23.04.2014 | ||
IT | 23.04.2014 | ||
LT | 23.04.2014 | ||
LV | 23.04.2014 | ||
MC | 23.04.2014 | ||
MT | 23.04.2014 | ||
PL | 23.04.2014 | ||
RO | 23.04.2014 | ||
RS | 23.04.2014 | ||
SE | 23.04.2014 | ||
SI | 23.04.2014 | ||
SK | 23.04.2014 | ||
TR | 23.04.2014 | ||
BG | 23.07.2014 | ||
NO | 23.07.2014 | ||
GR | 24.07.2014 | ||
IS | 23.08.2014 | ||
PT | 25.08.2014 | ||
Former [2017/03] | AT | 23.04.2014 | |
BE | 23.04.2014 | ||
CY | 23.04.2014 | ||
CZ | 23.04.2014 | ||
DK | 23.04.2014 | ||
EE | 23.04.2014 | ||
ES | 23.04.2014 | ||
FI | 23.04.2014 | ||
HR | 23.04.2014 | ||
IT | 23.04.2014 | ||
LT | 23.04.2014 | ||
LV | 23.04.2014 | ||
MC | 23.04.2014 | ||
MT | 23.04.2014 | ||
PL | 23.04.2014 | ||
RO | 23.04.2014 | ||
RS | 23.04.2014 | ||
SE | 23.04.2014 | ||
SI | 23.04.2014 | ||
SK | 23.04.2014 | ||
BG | 23.07.2014 | ||
NO | 23.07.2014 | ||
GR | 24.07.2014 | ||
IS | 23.08.2014 | ||
PT | 25.08.2014 | ||
Former [2015/46] | AT | 23.04.2014 | |
BE | 23.04.2014 | ||
CY | 23.04.2014 | ||
CZ | 23.04.2014 | ||
DK | 23.04.2014 | ||
EE | 23.04.2014 | ||
ES | 23.04.2014 | ||
FI | 23.04.2014 | ||
HR | 23.04.2014 | ||
IT | 23.04.2014 | ||
LT | 23.04.2014 | ||
LV | 23.04.2014 | ||
MC | 23.04.2014 | ||
PL | 23.04.2014 | ||
RO | 23.04.2014 | ||
RS | 23.04.2014 | ||
SE | 23.04.2014 | ||
SI | 23.04.2014 | ||
SK | 23.04.2014 | ||
BG | 23.07.2014 | ||
NO | 23.07.2014 | ||
GR | 24.07.2014 | ||
IS | 23.08.2014 | ||
PT | 25.08.2014 | ||
Former [2015/36] | AT | 23.04.2014 | |
BE | 23.04.2014 | ||
CY | 23.04.2014 | ||
CZ | 23.04.2014 | ||
DK | 23.04.2014 | ||
EE | 23.04.2014 | ||
ES | 23.04.2014 | ||
FI | 23.04.2014 | ||
HR | 23.04.2014 | ||
IT | 23.04.2014 | ||
LT | 23.04.2014 | ||
LV | 23.04.2014 | ||
PL | 23.04.2014 | ||
RO | 23.04.2014 | ||
RS | 23.04.2014 | ||
SE | 23.04.2014 | ||
SI | 23.04.2014 | ||
SK | 23.04.2014 | ||
BG | 23.07.2014 | ||
NO | 23.07.2014 | ||
GR | 24.07.2014 | ||
IS | 23.08.2014 | ||
PT | 25.08.2014 | ||
Former [2015/18] | AT | 23.04.2014 | |
BE | 23.04.2014 | ||
CY | 23.04.2014 | ||
CZ | 23.04.2014 | ||
DK | 23.04.2014 | ||
EE | 23.04.2014 | ||
ES | 23.04.2014 | ||
FI | 23.04.2014 | ||
HR | 23.04.2014 | ||
IT | 23.04.2014 | ||
LT | 23.04.2014 | ||
LV | 23.04.2014 | ||
PL | 23.04.2014 | ||
RO | 23.04.2014 | ||
RS | 23.04.2014 | ||
SE | 23.04.2014 | ||
SK | 23.04.2014 | ||
BG | 23.07.2014 | ||
NO | 23.07.2014 | ||
GR | 24.07.2014 | ||
IS | 23.08.2014 | ||
PT | 25.08.2014 | ||
Former [2015/11] | AT | 23.04.2014 | |
BE | 23.04.2014 | ||
CY | 23.04.2014 | ||
CZ | 23.04.2014 | ||
DK | 23.04.2014 | ||
EE | 23.04.2014 | ||
ES | 23.04.2014 | ||
FI | 23.04.2014 | ||
HR | 23.04.2014 | ||
LT | 23.04.2014 | ||
LV | 23.04.2014 | ||
PL | 23.04.2014 | ||
RO | 23.04.2014 | ||
RS | 23.04.2014 | ||
SE | 23.04.2014 | ||
SK | 23.04.2014 | ||
BG | 23.07.2014 | ||
NO | 23.07.2014 | ||
GR | 24.07.2014 | ||
IS | 23.08.2014 | ||
PT | 25.08.2014 | ||
Former [2015/10] | AT | 23.04.2014 | |
BE | 23.04.2014 | ||
CY | 23.04.2014 | ||
CZ | 23.04.2014 | ||
DK | 23.04.2014 | ||
EE | 23.04.2014 | ||
ES | 23.04.2014 | ||
FI | 23.04.2014 | ||
HR | 23.04.2014 | ||
LT | 23.04.2014 | ||
LV | 23.04.2014 | ||
PL | 23.04.2014 | ||
RS | 23.04.2014 | ||
SE | 23.04.2014 | ||
SK | 23.04.2014 | ||
BG | 23.07.2014 | ||
NO | 23.07.2014 | ||
GR | 24.07.2014 | ||
IS | 23.08.2014 | ||
PT | 25.08.2014 | ||
Former [2015/08] | AT | 23.04.2014 | |
BE | 23.04.2014 | ||
CY | 23.04.2014 | ||
DK | 23.04.2014 | ||
ES | 23.04.2014 | ||
FI | 23.04.2014 | ||
HR | 23.04.2014 | ||
LT | 23.04.2014 | ||
LV | 23.04.2014 | ||
PL | 23.04.2014 | ||
RS | 23.04.2014 | ||
SE | 23.04.2014 | ||
BG | 23.07.2014 | ||
NO | 23.07.2014 | ||
GR | 24.07.2014 | ||
IS | 23.08.2014 | ||
PT | 25.08.2014 | ||
Former [2015/02] | AT | 23.04.2014 | |
CY | 23.04.2014 | ||
ES | 23.04.2014 | ||
FI | 23.04.2014 | ||
HR | 23.04.2014 | ||
LT | 23.04.2014 | ||
LV | 23.04.2014 | ||
PL | 23.04.2014 | ||
RS | 23.04.2014 | ||
SE | 23.04.2014 | ||
BG | 23.07.2014 | ||
NO | 23.07.2014 | ||
GR | 24.07.2014 | ||
IS | 23.08.2014 | ||
PT | 25.08.2014 | ||
Former [2014/52] | AT | 23.04.2014 | |
CY | 23.04.2014 | ||
ES | 23.04.2014 | ||
FI | 23.04.2014 | ||
HR | 23.04.2014 | ||
LT | 23.04.2014 | ||
LV | 23.04.2014 | ||
PL | 23.04.2014 | ||
RS | 23.04.2014 | ||
SE | 23.04.2014 | ||
BG | 23.07.2014 | ||
NO | 23.07.2014 | ||
GR | 24.07.2014 | ||
IS | 23.08.2014 | ||
Former [2014/51] | AT | 23.04.2014 | |
CY | 23.04.2014 | ||
ES | 23.04.2014 | ||
FI | 23.04.2014 | ||
HR | 23.04.2014 | ||
LT | 23.04.2014 | ||
LV | 23.04.2014 | ||
PL | 23.04.2014 | ||
SE | 23.04.2014 | ||
BG | 23.07.2014 | ||
NO | 23.07.2014 | ||
GR | 24.07.2014 | ||
IS | 23.08.2014 | ||
Former [2014/50] | CY | 23.04.2014 | |
ES | 23.04.2014 | ||
FI | 23.04.2014 | ||
HR | 23.04.2014 | ||
LT | 23.04.2014 | ||
LV | 23.04.2014 | ||
PL | 23.04.2014 | ||
SE | 23.04.2014 | ||
BG | 23.07.2014 | ||
NO | 23.07.2014 | ||
GR | 24.07.2014 | ||
IS | 23.08.2014 | ||
Former [2014/49] | CY | 23.04.2014 | |
FI | 23.04.2014 | ||
LT | 23.04.2014 | ||
BG | 23.07.2014 | ||
NO | 23.07.2014 | ||
IS | 23.08.2014 | ||
Former [2014/48] | CY | 23.04.2014 | |
LT | 23.04.2014 | ||
BG | 23.07.2014 | ||
Former [2014/47] | CY | 23.04.2014 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP2369688 (KOBE STEEL LTD [JP], et al) [A] 1-8 * abstract * * paragraphs [0002] - [0005] - [0011] - [0019] - [0027] *; | [A]EP1788585 (KOBE STEEL LTD [JP]) [A] 1-8 * abstract * * paragraphs [0010] - [0018] * * paragraphs [0080] - [0090] *; | [A]JP2006077307 (KOBE STEEL LTD) [A] 1-8 * abstract * * paragraphs [0031] - [0060]; examples 1-4 *; | [A]JP2006183068 (KOBE STEEL LTD) [A] 1-8 * abstract * * paragraphs [0038] - [0057]; examples 1,2 *; | [A]WO2009123144 (NIPPON MINING CO [JP], et al) [A] 1-8 * abstract * * examples 1-6 * |