EP2672187 - Heated shower floor [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 21.03.2014 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 21.03.2014 | Withdrawal of application | published on 23.04.2014 [2014/17] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Jackon Insulation GmbH Ritzlebener Str. 1 39619 Arendsee / DE | [2013/50] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Gerke, Heiko Hestedt 5 29410 Salzwedel OT Hestedt / DE | 02 /
Sandmann, Dirk Schmiedestr. 2 33613 Bielefeld / DE | [2013/50] | Representative(s) | Kaewert, Klaus Rechtsanwalt Gänsestrasse 4 40593 Düsseldorf / DE | [2013/50] | Application number, filing date | 13001304.8 | 14.03.2013 | [2013/50] | Priority number, date | DE20121011016 | 05.06.2012 Original published format: DE102012011016 | [2013/50] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2672187 | Date: | 11.12.2013 | Language: | DE | [2013/50] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 17.10.2013 | Classification | IPC: | F24D3/14, A47K3/16, A47K3/40, F24H1/00, E04B5/48, E04C2/52 | [2013/50] | CPC: |
F24D3/142 (EP);
A47K3/1605 (EP);
A47K3/405 (EP);
F24H1/54 (EP);
Y02B30/00 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2013/50] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Beheizter Duschboden | [2013/50] | English: | Heated shower floor | [2013/50] | French: | Sol de douche chauffant | [2013/50] | Examination procedure | 17.03.2014 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2014/17] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]DE3644725 (SPECK JENS MARTIN [DE]) [Y] 1-21 * columns 1,2; figures 1-3 *; | [Y]DE4445473 (GEFINEX JACKON GMBH [DE]) [Y] 1-21 * column 1 - column 5; figures 1,2 *; | [Y]DE10330480 (GABO SYSTEMTECH GMBH [DE]) [Y] 9-14 * paragraph [0003] - paragraph [0016]; figures 2-4 *; | [Y]DE102007013918 (JACKON INSULATION GMBH [DE]) [Y] 18-20 * paragraphs [0007] - [0012] - [0 28] , [0 52] *; | [Y]DE20015859U (STUSSNAT DROEGEMOELLER PETER [DE], et al) [Y] 21 * page 2 *; | [A]DE2841225 (GEWERK KERAMCHEMIE) [A] 1,7,9,13,14 * the whole document *; | [A]WO2006035063 (ILLBRUCK SANITAERTECHNIK GMBH [DE], et al) [A] 1,6 * the whole document *; | [A]DE3906054 (ALTURA LEIDEN HOLDING [NL]) [A] 1 * the whole document *; | [A]EP2239512 (MESSANA ROBERTO [IT]) [A] 9-14 * the whole document *; | [A]DE8114513U (MEHL, HANS-JOACHIM [DE]) [A] 4,6,19 * the whole document *; | [A]DE10026768 (POLYTHERM VERTRIEBSGESELLSCHAF [DE]) [A] 14 * the whole document * | by applicant | DE202007011908U | DE202004007614U | DE202011108342U | DE202011102949U | DE202010017728U | DE202010007110U | DE202009016744U | DE202008003623U | DE202007018925U | DE202007016412U | DE202006020689U | DE202005004162U | DE202004004715U | DE102010060717 | DE102010053897 | US3784648 | DE3143070 | EP0078449 | JPS53126093 | JPH10195312 | DE19644309 | DE19545608 | DE19825052 | DE19942301 |