EP2629162 - Editor and method for consistent storage of data in an industrial controller [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 16.08.2019 Database last updated on 15.07.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 31.01.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 16.08.2019 | Withdrawal of application | published on 18.09.2019 [2019/38] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Rockwell Automation Technologies, Inc. 1 Allen-Bradley Drive Mayfield Heights, OH 44124 / US | [2013/34] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kay, James J. 9525 Tanager Drive Chardon, Ohio 44024 / US | 02 /
Johnston, David Allen 7947 Aileen Drive Mentor, Ohio 44060 / US | 03 /
Urdaneta, Shelly Lynn 1611 Sunview Road Lyndhurst, Ohio 44124 / US | 04 /
Siegel, Stuart Blair 8796 Arrowood Drive Mentor, Ohio 44124 / US | [2013/34] | Representative(s) | Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Leopoldstraße 4 80802 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2013/34] | Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Anwaltssozietät Leopoldstrasse 4 80802 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 13001346.9 | 25.07.2002 | [2013/34] | Priority number, date | US20010918177 | 30.07.2001 Original published format: US 918177 | [2013/34] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2629162 | Date: | 21.08.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/34] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2629162 | Date: | 10.12.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/50] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 10.11.2014 | Classification | IPC: | G05B19/05 | [2013/34] | CPC: |
G05B19/056 (EP,US);
G05B2219/13053 (EP,US);
G05B2219/13055 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [2013/34] | Title | German: | Verfahren zur einheitlichen Datenspeicherung in einem Industriekontrollgerät | [2013/34] | English: | Editor and method for consistent storage of data in an industrial controller | [2013/34] | French: | Procédé pour le stockage constant de données dans un contrôleur industriel | [2013/34] | Examination procedure | 15.03.2013 | Examination requested [2013/34] | 08.06.2015 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 30.01.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 08.08.2019 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2019/38] | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP02016631.0 / EP1282020 | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued (EP20020016631) is 08.11.2007 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.03.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 15.03.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 15.03.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 15.03.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 15.03.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 15.03.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 15.03.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 15.03.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 15.03.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 29.07.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 28.07.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 13 | 27.07.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 14 | 27.07.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 15 | 27.07.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 16 | 27.07.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 17 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [YA]WO9529454 (PATRIOT SENSORS & CONTROLS COR [US]) [Y] 1-6,10-15 * page 8, line 14 - page 19, line 3; figures 1-8c * [A] 7-9; | [Y] - Beckhoff, Beckhoff TwinCat System Handbuch, (19990416), pages 1 - 26, XP002730630 [Y] 1-6,10-15 * page 21, paragraph 1 - page 26, paragraph l * | [A] - Allen-Bradley, "MicroLogix 1200 and MicroLogix 1500 Programmable Controllers (Bulletins 1762 and 1764)", (200011), pages 1 - 424, URL: http://support.elmark.com.pl/rockwell/Literatura/1762-RM001C-EN-P.PDF, (20141006), XP002730631 [A] 1-6,10-15 * pages 14-1 - pages 14-18 * |