Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP2862550 | Global Dossier | 13.07.2016 | B1 | EP2862550 | 22.04.2015 | A1 | Priority number | Date | DE102012007666 | 16.04.2012 | EP13001380 | 18.03.2013 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP2653143 | Global Dossier | 09.09.2015 | B1 | EP2653143 | 27.11.2013 | A3 | EP2653143 | 23.10.2013 | A2 | Priority number | Date | DE102012007666 | 16.04.2012 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE102012007666 | 17.10.2013 | A1 | Priority number | Date | DE102012007666 | 16.04.2012 | Type | Divisional application | EP2862550 |