01.07.2022 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 03.08.2022 [2022/31] |
09.07.2021 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 11.08.2021 [2021/32] |
28.05.2021 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 30.06.2021 [2021/26] |
13.11.2020 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 16.12.2020 [2020/51] |
12.06.2020 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 15.07.2020 [2020/29] |
08.05.2020 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 10.06.2020 [2020/24] |
20.03.2020 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 22.04.2020 [2020/17] |
21.02.2020 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 25.03.2020 [2020/13] |
14.02.2020 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 18.03.2020 [2020/12] |
24.01.2020 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 26.02.2020 [2020/09] |
20.12.2019 |
No opposition filed within time limit |
published on 22.01.2020 [2020/04] |
06.12.2019 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 08.01.2020 [2020/02] |
05.12.2019 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 01.01.2020 [2020/01] |
22.11.2019 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 25.12.2019 [2019/52] |
08.11.2019 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 11.12.2019 [2019/50] |
01.11.2019 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 04.12.2019 [2019/49] |
25.10.2019 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 27.11.2019 [2019/48] |
23.08.2019 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 25.09.2019 [2019/39] |
16.08.2019 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 18.09.2019 [2019/38] |
09.08.2019 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 11.09.2019 [2019/37] |
19.07.2019 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 21.08.2019 [2019/34] |
12.07.2019 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 14.08.2019 [2019/33] |
15.01.2019 |
New entry: Decision on request for further processing |
|
11.01.2019 |
(Expected) grant |
published on 13.02.2019 [2019/07] |
07.01.2019 |
New entry: Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) |
|
07.01.2019 |
New entry: Fee payment for request for further processing |
|
02.01.2019 |
New entry: Receipt of request for further processing |
|
25.10.2018 |
New entry: Application deemed to be withdrawn: despatch of communication + time limit |
|
18.09.2018 |
New entry: Payment of fee for grant |
|
18.09.2018 |
New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing |
|
03.05.2018 |
New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
27.04.2018 |
Change - German title |
published on 30.05.2018 [2018/22] |
27.04.2018 |
Change - English title |
published on 30.05.2018 [2018/22] |
27.04.2018 |
Change - French title |
published on 30.05.2018 [2018/22] |
07.04.2018 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
30.03.2018 |
Change - classification |
published on 02.05.2018 [2018/18] |
30.03.2018 |
Change - classification |
published on 02.05.2018 [2018/18] |
04.04.2017 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
06.04.2016 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
05.04.2015 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
22.01.2015 |
New entry: Decision on request for further processing |
|
27.11.2014 |
Amendment by applicant |
|
27.11.2014 |
New entry: Fee payment for request for further processing |
|
25.11.2014 |
New entry: Receipt of request for further processing |
|
23.09.2014 |
New entry: Application deemed to be withdrawn: despatch of communication + time limit |
|
19.09.2014 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 22.10.2014 [2014/43] |
19.09.2014 |
Change - designated states |
published on 22.10.2014 [2014/43] |
18.07.2014 |
Change - representative |
published on 20.08.2014 [2014/34] |
06.12.2013 |
Change - representative |
published on 08.01.2014 [2014/02] |
15.11.2013 |
Publication of search report |
published on 18.12.2013 [2013/51] |
15.11.2013 |
Change - classification |
published on 18.12.2013 [2013/51] |
15.11.2013 |
Change - classification |
published on 18.12.2013 [2013/51] |
01.10.2013 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 02.10.2013 [2013/40] |