Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP All documents: EP2677207 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP2677207



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 217
25.04.2018 Communication regarding the expiry of opposition period Search / examination 1
22.06.2017 Transmission of the certificate for a European patent pursuant to Rule 74 EPC Search / examination 1
26.05.2017 Decision to grant a European patent Search / examination 2
11.05.2017 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
11.05.2017 English translation of the claims Search / examination 4
11.05.2017 French translation of claims Search / examination 4
11.05.2017 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 2
24.03.2017 Bibliographic data of the European patent application Search / examination 2
24.03.2017 Communication about intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 5
24.03.2017 Intention to grant (signatures) Search / examination 1
24.03.2017 Text intended for grant (clean copy) Search / examination 18
24.03.2017 Text intended for grant (version for approval) Search / examination 18
14.07.2016 Claims Search / examination 3
14.07.2016 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 3
01.06.2016 Annex to the communication Search / examination 1
01.06.2016 Consultation by telephone/in person (with time limit) Search / examination 1
01.06.2016 Result of consultation by telephone/in person Search / examination 1
18.05.2016 Examination started Search / examination 1
10.03.2015 CDS Clean up - amended data concerning the representative for the applicant Search / examination 1
10.07.2014 Statement of non-availability of priority search results Search / examination 1
04.07.2014 Invitation to file a copy of search results(priority) Search / examination 1
25.06.2014 Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report Search / examination 3
25.06.2014 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 4
25.06.2014 Amended description filed after receipt of (European) search report Search / examination 11
25.06.2014 Amended description with annotations Search / examination 12
25.06.2014 Amended drawings filed after receipt of (European) search report Search / examination 2
25.06.2014 Amended drawings with annotations Search / examination 2
25.06.2014 Amendments received before examination Search / examination 3
24.06.2014 Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report Search / examination 3
24.06.2014 Amended description filed after receipt of (European) search report Search / examination 11
24.06.2014 Amended drawings filed after receipt of (European) search report Search / examination 2
24.06.2014 Amendments received before examination Search / examination 3
07.01.2014 Reminder period for payment of examination fee/designation fee and correction of deficiencies in Written Opinion/amendment Search / examination 2
27.11.2013 Notification of forthcoming publication Search / examination 2
08.10.2013 Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report Search / examination 1
08.10.2013 European search opinion Search / examination 6
08.10.2013 European search report Search / examination 4
05.07.2013 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
05.07.2013 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
05.07.2013 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
05.07.2013 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
13.04.2013 Abstract Search / examination 1
13.04.2013 Claims Search / examination 3
13.04.2013 Description Search / examination 12
13.04.2013 Designation of inventor Search / examination 1
13.04.2013 Drawings Search / examination 3
13.04.2013 Priority document Search / examination 21
13.04.2013 Priority document Search / examination 21
13.04.2013 Request for grant of a European patent Search / examination 8