EP2677207 - Planetary gear mechanism, and method for connecting a hollow wheel of a planetary gear with a customers'connection flange for flexible customer-specific connection dimensions and use of a planetary gear [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 27.04.2018 Database last updated on 26.04.2025 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 19.05.2017 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 23.03.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.07.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL | published on 19.08.2020 [2020/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ROBERT BOSCH GMBH Postfach 30 02 20 70442 Stuttgart / DE | [2013/52] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Reimann, Mario Lessingstrasse 9 58300 Wetter / DE | 02 /
Magiera, Markus Gustav-Altenhainstrasse 7 45549 Sprockhoevel / DE | 03 /
Koester, Thomas Wannenstrasse 14 70199 Stuttgart / DE | 04 /
Hesterberg, Stefan Grundschoetteler Strasse 108 58300 Wetter / DE | [2013/52] | Representative(s) | Thürer, Andreas Bosch Rexroth AG BR/IPR Zum Eisengiesser 1 97816 Lohr am Main / DE | [2017/25] |
Former [2013/52] | Thürer, Andreas Bosch Rexorth AG Zum Eisengießer 1 97816 Lohr am Main / DE | Application number, filing date | 13001935.9 | 13.04.2013 | [2013/52] | Priority number, date | DE20121012053 | 19.06.2012 Original published format: DE102012012053 | DE20131004059 | 08.03.2013 Original published format: DE102013004059 | [2013/52] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2677207 | Date: | 25.12.2013 | Language: | DE | [2013/52] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2677207 | Date: | 21.06.2017 | Language: | DE | [2017/25] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 08.10.2013 | Classification | IPC: | F16H57/08, F16H57/033 | [2013/52] | CPC: |
F16H57/033 (EP,CN);
F16H57/08 (EP,CN);
F16H57/023 (CN);
F16H2057/0335 (CN)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/25] |
Former [2013/52] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | Planetengetriebe und Verfahren zum Verbinden von einem Hohlrad eines Planetengetriebes mit einem Kundenanschlussflansch für flexible kundenspezifische Anschlussmaße und Verwendung eines Planetengetriebes | [2013/52] | English: | Planetary gear mechanism, and method for connecting a hollow wheel of a planetary gear with a customers'connection flange for flexible customer-specific connection dimensions and use of a planetary gear | [2013/52] | French: | Engrenage épicycloïdal et procédé destiné à relier une roue creuse d'un engrenage épicycloïdal avec une bride de raccordement de client pour des dimensions de raccordement flexibles spécifiques à un client et utilisation d'un engrenage planétaire | [2013/52] | Examination procedure | 24.06.2014 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 25.06.2014 | Examination requested [2014/32] | 01.06.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 14.07.2016 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.03.2017 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 11.05.2017 | Fee for grant paid | 11.05.2017 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 11.05.2017 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 01.06.2016 | Opposition(s) | 22.03.2018 | No opposition filed within time limit [2018/22] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.04.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 02.05.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 02.05.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 13.04.2013 | AL | 21.06.2017 | CY | 21.06.2017 | CZ | 21.06.2017 | DK | 21.06.2017 | EE | 21.06.2017 | ES | 21.06.2017 | FI | 21.06.2017 | HR | 21.06.2017 | LT | 21.06.2017 | LV | 21.06.2017 | MC | 21.06.2017 | MK | 21.06.2017 | MT | 21.06.2017 | NL | 21.06.2017 | PL | 21.06.2017 | PT | 21.06.2017 | RO | 21.06.2017 | RS | 21.06.2017 | SE | 21.06.2017 | SI | 21.06.2017 | SK | 21.06.2017 | SM | 21.06.2017 | TR | 21.06.2017 | BG | 21.09.2017 | NO | 21.09.2017 | GR | 22.09.2017 | IS | 21.10.2017 | [2020/34] |
Former [2020/31] | HU | 13.04.2013 | |
CY | 21.06.2017 | ||
CZ | 21.06.2017 | ||
DK | 21.06.2017 | ||
EE | 21.06.2017 | ||
ES | 21.06.2017 | ||
FI | 21.06.2017 | ||
HR | 21.06.2017 | ||
LT | 21.06.2017 | ||
LV | 21.06.2017 | ||
MC | 21.06.2017 | ||
MK | 21.06.2017 | ||
MT | 21.06.2017 | ||
NL | 21.06.2017 | ||
PL | 21.06.2017 | ||
PT | 21.06.2017 | ||
RO | 21.06.2017 | ||
RS | 21.06.2017 | ||
SE | 21.06.2017 | ||
SI | 21.06.2017 | ||
SK | 21.06.2017 | ||
SM | 21.06.2017 | ||
TR | 21.06.2017 | ||
BG | 21.09.2017 | ||
NO | 21.09.2017 | ||
GR | 22.09.2017 | ||
IS | 21.10.2017 | ||
Former [2020/27] | HU | 13.04.2013 | |
CZ | 21.06.2017 | ||
DK | 21.06.2017 | ||
EE | 21.06.2017 | ||
ES | 21.06.2017 | ||
FI | 21.06.2017 | ||
HR | 21.06.2017 | ||
LT | 21.06.2017 | ||
LV | 21.06.2017 | ||
MC | 21.06.2017 | ||
MT | 21.06.2017 | ||
NL | 21.06.2017 | ||
PL | 21.06.2017 | ||
PT | 21.06.2017 | ||
RO | 21.06.2017 | ||
RS | 21.06.2017 | ||
SE | 21.06.2017 | ||
SI | 21.06.2017 | ||
SK | 21.06.2017 | ||
SM | 21.06.2017 | ||
TR | 21.06.2017 | ||
BG | 21.09.2017 | ||
NO | 21.09.2017 | ||
GR | 22.09.2017 | ||
IS | 21.10.2017 | ||
Former [2020/15] | CZ | 21.06.2017 | |
DK | 21.06.2017 | ||
EE | 21.06.2017 | ||
ES | 21.06.2017 | ||
FI | 21.06.2017 | ||
HR | 21.06.2017 | ||
LT | 21.06.2017 | ||
LV | 21.06.2017 | ||
MC | 21.06.2017 | ||
MT | 21.06.2017 | ||
NL | 21.06.2017 | ||
PL | 21.06.2017 | ||
RO | 21.06.2017 | ||
RS | 21.06.2017 | ||
SE | 21.06.2017 | ||
SI | 21.06.2017 | ||
SK | 21.06.2017 | ||
SM | 21.06.2017 | ||
TR | 21.06.2017 | ||
BG | 21.09.2017 | ||
NO | 21.09.2017 | ||
GR | 22.09.2017 | ||
IS | 21.10.2017 | ||
Former [2018/52] | CZ | 21.06.2017 | |
DK | 21.06.2017 | ||
EE | 21.06.2017 | ||
ES | 21.06.2017 | ||
FI | 21.06.2017 | ||
HR | 21.06.2017 | ||
LT | 21.06.2017 | ||
LV | 21.06.2017 | ||
MC | 21.06.2017 | ||
MT | 21.06.2017 | ||
NL | 21.06.2017 | ||
PL | 21.06.2017 | ||
RO | 21.06.2017 | ||
RS | 21.06.2017 | ||
SE | 21.06.2017 | ||
SI | 21.06.2017 | ||
SK | 21.06.2017 | ||
SM | 21.06.2017 | ||
BG | 21.09.2017 | ||
NO | 21.09.2017 | ||
GR | 22.09.2017 | ||
IS | 21.10.2017 | ||
Former [2018/43] | CZ | 21.06.2017 | |
DK | 21.06.2017 | ||
EE | 21.06.2017 | ||
ES | 21.06.2017 | ||
FI | 21.06.2017 | ||
HR | 21.06.2017 | ||
LT | 21.06.2017 | ||
LV | 21.06.2017 | ||
MT | 21.06.2017 | ||
NL | 21.06.2017 | ||
PL | 21.06.2017 | ||
RO | 21.06.2017 | ||
RS | 21.06.2017 | ||
SE | 21.06.2017 | ||
SI | 21.06.2017 | ||
SK | 21.06.2017 | ||
SM | 21.06.2017 | ||
BG | 21.09.2017 | ||
NO | 21.09.2017 | ||
GR | 22.09.2017 | ||
IS | 21.10.2017 | ||
Former [2018/39] | CZ | 21.06.2017 | |
DK | 21.06.2017 | ||
EE | 21.06.2017 | ||
ES | 21.06.2017 | ||
FI | 21.06.2017 | ||
HR | 21.06.2017 | ||
LT | 21.06.2017 | ||
LV | 21.06.2017 | ||
NL | 21.06.2017 | ||
PL | 21.06.2017 | ||
RO | 21.06.2017 | ||
RS | 21.06.2017 | ||
SE | 21.06.2017 | ||
SI | 21.06.2017 | ||
SK | 21.06.2017 | ||
SM | 21.06.2017 | ||
BG | 21.09.2017 | ||
NO | 21.09.2017 | ||
GR | 22.09.2017 | ||
IS | 21.10.2017 | ||
Former [2018/21] | CZ | 21.06.2017 | |
DK | 21.06.2017 | ||
EE | 21.06.2017 | ||
ES | 21.06.2017 | ||
FI | 21.06.2017 | ||
HR | 21.06.2017 | ||
LT | 21.06.2017 | ||
LV | 21.06.2017 | ||
NL | 21.06.2017 | ||
PL | 21.06.2017 | ||
RO | 21.06.2017 | ||
RS | 21.06.2017 | ||
SE | 21.06.2017 | ||
SK | 21.06.2017 | ||
SM | 21.06.2017 | ||
BG | 21.09.2017 | ||
NO | 21.09.2017 | ||
GR | 22.09.2017 | ||
IS | 21.10.2017 | ||
Former [2018/11] | CZ | 21.06.2017 | |
EE | 21.06.2017 | ||
ES | 21.06.2017 | ||
FI | 21.06.2017 | ||
HR | 21.06.2017 | ||
LT | 21.06.2017 | ||
LV | 21.06.2017 | ||
NL | 21.06.2017 | ||
PL | 21.06.2017 | ||
RO | 21.06.2017 | ||
RS | 21.06.2017 | ||
SE | 21.06.2017 | ||
SK | 21.06.2017 | ||
SM | 21.06.2017 | ||
BG | 21.09.2017 | ||
NO | 21.09.2017 | ||
GR | 22.09.2017 | ||
IS | 21.10.2017 | ||
Former [2018/10] | CZ | 21.06.2017 | |
EE | 21.06.2017 | ||
FI | 21.06.2017 | ||
HR | 21.06.2017 | ||
LT | 21.06.2017 | ||
LV | 21.06.2017 | ||
NL | 21.06.2017 | ||
RO | 21.06.2017 | ||
RS | 21.06.2017 | ||
SE | 21.06.2017 | ||
SK | 21.06.2017 | ||
BG | 21.09.2017 | ||
NO | 21.09.2017 | ||
GR | 22.09.2017 | ||
Former [2018/09] | EE | 21.06.2017 | |
FI | 21.06.2017 | ||
HR | 21.06.2017 | ||
LT | 21.06.2017 | ||
LV | 21.06.2017 | ||
NL | 21.06.2017 | ||
RS | 21.06.2017 | ||
SE | 21.06.2017 | ||
BG | 21.09.2017 | ||
NO | 21.09.2017 | ||
GR | 22.09.2017 | ||
Former [2017/52] | FI | 21.06.2017 | |
HR | 21.06.2017 | ||
LT | 21.06.2017 | ||
LV | 21.06.2017 | ||
NL | 21.06.2017 | ||
RS | 21.06.2017 | ||
SE | 21.06.2017 | ||
BG | 21.09.2017 | ||
NO | 21.09.2017 | ||
GR | 22.09.2017 | ||
Former [2017/50] | FI | 21.06.2017 | |
HR | 21.06.2017 | ||
LT | 21.06.2017 | ||
LV | 21.06.2017 | ||
RS | 21.06.2017 | ||
SE | 21.06.2017 | ||
BG | 21.09.2017 | ||
NO | 21.09.2017 | ||
GR | 22.09.2017 | ||
Former [2017/49] | FI | 21.06.2017 | |
HR | 21.06.2017 | ||
LT | 21.06.2017 | ||
NO | 21.09.2017 | ||
GR | 22.09.2017 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE10229968 (WITTENSTEIN AG [DE]) [A] 1-13 * figures 1-6 *; | [A]DE10229969 (WITTENSTEIN AG [DE]) [A] 1-13 * figures 1-6 *; | [A]DE102006043961 (SEW EURODRIVE GMBH & CO [DE]) [A] 1-13 * figures 1-5 *; | [A]WO03050434 (SEW EURODRIVE GMBH & CO [DE], et al) [A] 1-13 * figures 1-5 *; | [A]DE102007035777 (SEW EURODRIVE GMBH & CO [DE]) [A] 1-13 * figures 2,3 *; | [A]DE102005052008 (SEW EURODRIVE GMBH & CO [DE]) [A] 1-13 * figures 1-4 *; | [A]DE10312941 (SEW EURODRIVE GMBH & CO [DE]) [A] 1-13 * figures 1-13 *; | [A]DE10123548 (SEW EURODRIVE GMBH & CO [DE]) [A] 1-13 * figure 2 *; | [A]DE2649949 (SIEBENHAAR GETRIEBE) [A] 1-13 * figures A, B *; | [A]EP1326032 (SUMITOMO HEAVY INDUSTRIES [JP]) [A] 1-13 * figures 1-8, 16-17, 19-21 *; | [A] - HUSTEDE, "Planurex-Planetengetriebe", VDI Z, SPRINGER VDI VERLAG, DE, (19860401), no. 7, ISSN 0042-1766, pages 233 - 234, XP002254394 [A] 1-13 * figure 1 * | by applicant | EP1167140 |