12.10.2018 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 14.11.2018 [2018/46] |
06.07.2018 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 08.08.2018 [2018/32] |
15.06.2018 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 18.07.2018 [2018/29] |
13.10.2017 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 15.11.2017 [2017/46] |
01.09.2017 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 04.10.2017 [2017/40] |
25.08.2017 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 27.09.2017 [2017/39] |
16.12.2016 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 18.01.2017 [2017/03] |
15.04.2016 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 18.05.2016 [2016/20] |
19.02.2016 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 23.03.2016 [2016/12] |
22.01.2016 |
No opposition filed within time limit |
published on 24.02.2016 [2016/08] |
15.01.2016 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 17.02.2016 [2016/07] |
08.01.2016 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 10.02.2016 [2016/06] |
18.12.2015 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 20.01.2016 [2016/03] |
13.11.2015 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 16.12.2015 [2015/51] |
06.11.2015 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 09.12.2015 [2015/50] |
04.11.2015 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 02.12.2015 [2015/49] |
04.09.2015 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 07.10.2015 [2015/41] |
21.08.2015 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 23.09.2015 [2015/39] |
07.08.2015 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 09.09.2015 [2015/37] |
31.07.2015 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 02.09.2015 [2015/36] |
24.07.2015 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 26.08.2015 [2015/35] |
20.02.2015 |
(Expected) grant |
published on 18.03.2015 [2015/12] |
06.02.2015 |
New entry: Payment of fee for grant |
|
06.02.2015 |
New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing |
|
03.02.2015 |
New entry: Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) |
|
28.11.2014 |
New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
25.04.2014 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
20.12.2013 |
First examination report |
|
20.12.2013 |
Change - designated states |
published on 22.01.2014 [2014/04] |
18.12.2013 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
06.12.2013 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 08.01.2014 [2014/02] |
06.12.2013 |
Change - designated states |
published on 08.01.2014 [2014/02] |
12.11.2013 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 13.11.2013 [2013/46] |