Extract from the Register of European Patents
EP Event history: EP2665204
Date |
Description |
European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
13.04.2018 |
Application deemed to be withdrawn |
published on 16.05.2018 [2018/20] |
03.01.2018 |
New entry: Application deemed to be withdrawn: despatch of communication + time limit |
|
06.07.2017 |
New entry: Additional fee for renewal fee: despatch of communication + time limit |
|
06.12.2016 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
12.08.2016 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
03.06.2016 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
20.04.2016 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
17.02.2016 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
03.06.2015 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
23.05.2014 |
Change - designated states |
published on 25.06.2014 [2014/26] |
06.03.2014 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
28.01.2014 |
Change: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
19.11.2013 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 20.11.2013 [2013/47] |
18.10.2013 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 20.11.2013 [2013/47] |
18.10.2013 |
First examination report |
|
16.09.2013 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|