EP2665204 - Geometrical closed loop line of sight (LOS) multiple-input-multiple-output (MIMO) [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 13.04.2018 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 06.12.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.04.2018 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 16.05.2018 [2018/20] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Broadcom Corporation 5300 California Avenue Irvine, CA 92617 / US | [2013/47] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Koren, Shay 17B Stefan Avaig St. 69642 Tel Aviv / IL | 02 /
Eisenberg, Yoav Tevet 5 St. 45219 Hod Hasharon / IL | 03 /
Tsur, Eitan 19 Hapardes Harishon 75206 Rishon Lezion / IL | [2013/47] | Representative(s) | Jehle, Volker Armin Bosch Jehle Patentanwaltsgesellschaft mbH Flüggenstrasse 13 80639 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2013/47] | Jehle, Volker Armin Bosch Jehle Patentanwaltsgesellschaft mbH Flüggenstrasse 13 80639 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 13002461.5 | 08.05.2013 | [2013/47] | Priority number, date | US201261647380P | 15.05.2012 Original published format: US 201261647380 P | US201213730255 | 28.12.2012 Original published format: US201213730255 | [2013/47] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2665204 | Date: | 20.11.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/47] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.09.2013 | Classification | IPC: | H04B7/08 | [2013/47] | CPC: |
H04B7/0854 (EP,KR,US);
H04B7/0473 (KR,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2013/47] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Geometrischer geschlossener Regelkreis für Multiple-Input-Multiple-Output mit direkter Sichverbindung (LOS-MIMO) | [2013/47] | English: | Geometrical closed loop line of sight (LOS) multiple-input-multiple-output (MIMO) | [2013/47] | French: | Système entrées multiples, sorties multiples (MIMO) de visibilité en boucle fermée géometrique | [2013/47] | Examination procedure | 08.05.2013 | Examination requested [2013/47] | 16.09.2013 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 03.03.2014 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.02.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 15.04.2016 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.08.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 02.12.2016 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.12.2017 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2018/20] | 04.01.2018 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2018/20] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 16.09.2013 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 01.06.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.05.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.05.2017 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP2180623 (NEC CORP [JP]) [A] 1-15 * abstract * * paragraph [0214] - paragraph [0270] * * claims 1-22 *; | [XI] - LEBRUN G ET AL, "MIMO transmission over a time-varying channel using SVD", GLOBECOM'02. 2002 - IEEE GLOBAL TELECOMMUNICATIONS CONFERENCE. CONFERENCE PROCEEDINGS. TAIPEI, TAIWAN, NOV. 17 - 21, 2002; [IEEE GLOBAL TELECOMMUNICATIONS CONFERENCE], NEW YORK, NY : IEEE, US, (20021117), vol. 1, doi:10.1109/GLOCOM.2002.1188112, ISBN 978-0-7803-7632-8, pages 414 - 418, XP010635984 [X] 1-3,9-11,15 * the whole document * [I] 4-8,12-14 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/GLOCOM.2002.1188112 | [A] - ALCATEL-LUCENT SHANGHAI BELL ET AL, "An Over-the-Air-Calibration Scheme for ZF based SU/MU-MIMO", 3GPP DRAFT; R1-092335 AN OVER-THE-AIR-CALIBRATION SCHEME FOR ZF BASED SU-MU-MIMO, 3RD GENERATION PARTNERSHIP PROJECT (3GPP), MOBILE COMPETENCE CENTRE ; 650, ROUTE DES LUCIOLES ; F-06921 SOPHIA-ANTIPOLIS CEDEX ; FRANCE, (20090624), no. Los Angeles, USA; 20090624, XP050350859 [A] 1-15 * the whole document * | [A] - YI JIANG ET AL, "MIMO transceiver design using geometric mean decomposition", PROCEEDINGS / 2004 IEEE INFORMATION THEORY WORKSHOP : OCTOBER 24 - 29, 2004, SAN ANTONIO MARRIOTT RIVERWALK HOTEL, SAN ANTONIO, TEXAS, USA, IEEE, PISCATAWAY, NJ, USA, (20041024), ISBN 978-0-7803-8720-1, pages 193 - 197, XP010776135 [A] 1-15 * the whole document * | [A] - BABAK DANESHRAD ET AL, "Phase noise suppression in MIMO OFDM systems with incoherent phase noise", MILITARY COMMUNICATIONS CONFERENCE, 2011 - MILCOM 2011, IEEE, (20111107), doi:10.1109/MILCOM.2011.6127706, ISBN 978-1-4673-0079-7, pages 42 - 44, XP032092973 [A] 1-15 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/MILCOM.2011.6127706 |