EP2664535 - Motor drive control device [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 02.11.2018 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 24.11.2017 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 16.07.2017 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 10.02.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.07.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL | published on 19.08.2020 [2020/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Microspace Corporation 7-14-402, Kitashinagawa 5-chome Shinagawa-ku Tokyo 141-0001 / JP | For all designated states Taiyo Yuden Co., Ltd. 16-20, Ueno 6-chome Taito-ku Tokyo 110-0005 / JP | [2013/47] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Tanaka, Masato c/o Microspace Corporation 7-14-402, Kitashinagawa 5-chome Shinagawa-ku Tokyo, 141-0001 / JP | 02 /
Asanuma, Kazuo c/o Taiyo Yuden Co., Ltd. 16-20, Ueno 6-chome Taito-ku Tokyo, 110-0005 / JP | 03 /
Hosaka, Yasuo c/o Taiyo Yuden Co., Ltd. 16-20, Ueno 6-chome Taito-ku Tokyo, 110-0005 / JP | 04 /
Shirakawa, Hirokazu c/o Taiyo Yuden Co., Ltd. 16-20, Ueno 6-chome Taito-ku Tokyo, 110-0005 / JP | [2013/47] | Representative(s) | Müller-Boré & Partner Patentanwälte PartG mbB Friedenheimer Brücke 21 80639 München / DE | [2017/52] |
Former [2013/47] | Müller-Boré & Partner Patentanwälte Grafinger Straße 2 81671 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 13002506.7 | 13.05.2013 | [2013/47] | Priority number, date | JP20120114264 | 18.05.2012 Original published format: JP 2012114264 | [2013/47] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2664535 | Date: | 20.11.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/47] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2664535 | Date: | 27.12.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/52] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 24.09.2013 | Classification | IPC: | B62M6/45 | [2013/47] | CPC: |
B62M6/45 (EP,US);
B60L15/2054 (EP,US);
B60L50/20 (EP,US);
B60L2200/12 (EP,US);
Y02T10/64 (EP,US);
Y02T10/72 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/52] |
Former [2013/47] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | Vorrichtung für Motorsteuerung | [2013/47] | English: | Motor drive control device | [2013/47] | French: | Dispositif de contrôle d'un moteur | [2013/47] | Examination procedure | 16.05.2014 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 16.05.2014 | Examination requested [2014/26] | 17.12.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 19.04.2016 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.10.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 30.01.2017 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.07.2017 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 10.11.2017 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | 16.11.2017 | Fee for grant paid | 16.11.2017 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 17.12.2015 | Opposition(s) | 28.09.2018 | No opposition filed within time limit [2018/49] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.05.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.03.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.05.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 13.05.2013 | AL | 27.12.2017 | AT | 27.12.2017 | CY | 27.12.2017 | CZ | 27.12.2017 | DK | 27.12.2017 | EE | 27.12.2017 | ES | 27.12.2017 | FI | 27.12.2017 | HR | 27.12.2017 | IT | 27.12.2017 | LT | 27.12.2017 | LV | 27.12.2017 | MC | 27.12.2017 | MK | 27.12.2017 | PL | 27.12.2017 | PT | 27.12.2017 | RO | 27.12.2017 | RS | 27.12.2017 | SE | 27.12.2017 | SI | 27.12.2017 | SK | 27.12.2017 | SM | 27.12.2017 | TR | 27.12.2017 | BG | 27.03.2018 | NO | 27.03.2018 | GR | 28.03.2018 | IS | 27.04.2018 | GB | 13.05.2018 | IE | 13.05.2018 | LU | 13.05.2018 | MT | 13.05.2018 | BE | 31.05.2018 | CH | 31.05.2018 | FR | 31.05.2018 | LI | 31.05.2018 | [2020/34] |
Former [2020/31] | HU | 13.05.2013 | |
AT | 27.12.2017 | ||
CY | 27.12.2017 | ||
CZ | 27.12.2017 | ||
DK | 27.12.2017 | ||
EE | 27.12.2017 | ||
ES | 27.12.2017 | ||
FI | 27.12.2017 | ||
HR | 27.12.2017 | ||
IT | 27.12.2017 | ||
LT | 27.12.2017 | ||
LV | 27.12.2017 | ||
MC | 27.12.2017 | ||
MK | 27.12.2017 | ||
PL | 27.12.2017 | ||
PT | 27.12.2017 | ||
RO | 27.12.2017 | ||
RS | 27.12.2017 | ||
SE | 27.12.2017 | ||
SI | 27.12.2017 | ||
SK | 27.12.2017 | ||
SM | 27.12.2017 | ||
TR | 27.12.2017 | ||
BG | 27.03.2018 | ||
NO | 27.03.2018 | ||
GR | 28.03.2018 | ||
IS | 27.04.2018 | ||
GB | 13.05.2018 | ||
IE | 13.05.2018 | ||
LU | 13.05.2018 | ||
MT | 13.05.2018 | ||
BE | 31.05.2018 | ||
CH | 31.05.2018 | ||
FR | 31.05.2018 | ||
LI | 31.05.2018 | ||
Former [2020/29] | HU | 13.05.2013 | |
AT | 27.12.2017 | ||
CY | 27.12.2017 | ||
CZ | 27.12.2017 | ||
DK | 27.12.2017 | ||
EE | 27.12.2017 | ||
ES | 27.12.2017 | ||
FI | 27.12.2017 | ||
HR | 27.12.2017 | ||
IT | 27.12.2017 | ||
LT | 27.12.2017 | ||
LV | 27.12.2017 | ||
MC | 27.12.2017 | ||
PL | 27.12.2017 | ||
PT | 27.12.2017 | ||
RO | 27.12.2017 | ||
RS | 27.12.2017 | ||
SE | 27.12.2017 | ||
SI | 27.12.2017 | ||
SK | 27.12.2017 | ||
SM | 27.12.2017 | ||
TR | 27.12.2017 | ||
BG | 27.03.2018 | ||
NO | 27.03.2018 | ||
GR | 28.03.2018 | ||
IS | 27.04.2018 | ||
GB | 13.05.2018 | ||
IE | 13.05.2018 | ||
LU | 13.05.2018 | ||
MT | 13.05.2018 | ||
BE | 31.05.2018 | ||
CH | 31.05.2018 | ||
FR | 31.05.2018 | ||
LI | 31.05.2018 | ||
Former [2020/27] | HU | 13.05.2013 | |
AT | 27.12.2017 | ||
CY | 27.12.2017 | ||
CZ | 27.12.2017 | ||
DK | 27.12.2017 | ||
EE | 27.12.2017 | ||
ES | 27.12.2017 | ||
FI | 27.12.2017 | ||
HR | 27.12.2017 | ||
IT | 27.12.2017 | ||
LT | 27.12.2017 | ||
LV | 27.12.2017 | ||
MC | 27.12.2017 | ||
PL | 27.12.2017 | ||
PT | 27.12.2017 | ||
RO | 27.12.2017 | ||
RS | 27.12.2017 | ||
SI | 27.12.2017 | ||
SK | 27.12.2017 | ||
SM | 27.12.2017 | ||
TR | 27.12.2017 | ||
BG | 27.03.2018 | ||
NO | 27.03.2018 | ||
GR | 28.03.2018 | ||
IS | 27.04.2018 | ||
GB | 13.05.2018 | ||
IE | 13.05.2018 | ||
LU | 13.05.2018 | ||
MT | 13.05.2018 | ||
BE | 31.05.2018 | ||
CH | 31.05.2018 | ||
FR | 31.05.2018 | ||
LI | 31.05.2018 | ||
Former [2020/16] | AT | 27.12.2017 | |
CY | 27.12.2017 | ||
CZ | 27.12.2017 | ||
DK | 27.12.2017 | ||
EE | 27.12.2017 | ||
ES | 27.12.2017 | ||
FI | 27.12.2017 | ||
HR | 27.12.2017 | ||
IT | 27.12.2017 | ||
LT | 27.12.2017 | ||
LV | 27.12.2017 | ||
MC | 27.12.2017 | ||
PL | 27.12.2017 | ||
RO | 27.12.2017 | ||
RS | 27.12.2017 | ||
SI | 27.12.2017 | ||
SK | 27.12.2017 | ||
SM | 27.12.2017 | ||
TR | 27.12.2017 | ||
BG | 27.03.2018 | ||
NO | 27.03.2018 | ||
GR | 28.03.2018 | ||
IS | 27.04.2018 | ||
GB | 13.05.2018 | ||
IE | 13.05.2018 | ||
LU | 13.05.2018 | ||
MT | 13.05.2018 | ||
BE | 31.05.2018 | ||
CH | 31.05.2018 | ||
FR | 31.05.2018 | ||
LI | 31.05.2018 | ||
Former [2020/08] | AT | 27.12.2017 | |
CY | 27.12.2017 | ||
CZ | 27.12.2017 | ||
DK | 27.12.2017 | ||
EE | 27.12.2017 | ||
ES | 27.12.2017 | ||
FI | 27.12.2017 | ||
HR | 27.12.2017 | ||
IT | 27.12.2017 | ||
LT | 27.12.2017 | ||
LV | 27.12.2017 | ||
MC | 27.12.2017 | ||
PL | 27.12.2017 | ||
RO | 27.12.2017 | ||
RS | 27.12.2017 | ||
SI | 27.12.2017 | ||
SK | 27.12.2017 | ||
SM | 27.12.2017 | ||
BG | 27.03.2018 | ||
NO | 27.03.2018 | ||
GR | 28.03.2018 | ||
IS | 27.04.2018 | ||
GB | 13.05.2018 | ||
IE | 13.05.2018 | ||
LU | 13.05.2018 | ||
MT | 13.05.2018 | ||
BE | 31.05.2018 | ||
CH | 31.05.2018 | ||
FR | 31.05.2018 | ||
LI | 31.05.2018 | ||
Former [2019/23] | AT | 27.12.2017 | |
CY | 27.12.2017 | ||
CZ | 27.12.2017 | ||
DK | 27.12.2017 | ||
EE | 27.12.2017 | ||
ES | 27.12.2017 | ||
FI | 27.12.2017 | ||
HR | 27.12.2017 | ||
IT | 27.12.2017 | ||
LT | 27.12.2017 | ||
LV | 27.12.2017 | ||
MC | 27.12.2017 | ||
PL | 27.12.2017 | ||
RO | 27.12.2017 | ||
RS | 27.12.2017 | ||
SI | 27.12.2017 | ||
SK | 27.12.2017 | ||
SM | 27.12.2017 | ||
BG | 27.03.2018 | ||
NO | 27.03.2018 | ||
GR | 28.03.2018 | ||
IS | 27.04.2018 | ||
GB | 13.05.2018 | ||
IE | 13.05.2018 | ||
LU | 13.05.2018 | ||
BE | 31.05.2018 | ||
CH | 31.05.2018 | ||
FR | 31.05.2018 | ||
LI | 31.05.2018 | ||
Former [2019/21] | AT | 27.12.2017 | |
CY | 27.12.2017 | ||
CZ | 27.12.2017 | ||
DK | 27.12.2017 | ||
EE | 27.12.2017 | ||
ES | 27.12.2017 | ||
FI | 27.12.2017 | ||
HR | 27.12.2017 | ||
IT | 27.12.2017 | ||
LT | 27.12.2017 | ||
LV | 27.12.2017 | ||
MC | 27.12.2017 | ||
PL | 27.12.2017 | ||
RO | 27.12.2017 | ||
RS | 27.12.2017 | ||
SI | 27.12.2017 | ||
SK | 27.12.2017 | ||
SM | 27.12.2017 | ||
BG | 27.03.2018 | ||
NO | 27.03.2018 | ||
GR | 28.03.2018 | ||
IS | 27.04.2018 | ||
GB | 13.05.2018 | ||
IE | 13.05.2018 | ||
LU | 13.05.2018 | ||
CH | 31.05.2018 | ||
LI | 31.05.2018 | ||
Former [2019/19] | AT | 27.12.2017 | |
CY | 27.12.2017 | ||
CZ | 27.12.2017 | ||
DK | 27.12.2017 | ||
EE | 27.12.2017 | ||
ES | 27.12.2017 | ||
FI | 27.12.2017 | ||
HR | 27.12.2017 | ||
IT | 27.12.2017 | ||
LT | 27.12.2017 | ||
LV | 27.12.2017 | ||
MC | 27.12.2017 | ||
PL | 27.12.2017 | ||
RO | 27.12.2017 | ||
RS | 27.12.2017 | ||
SI | 27.12.2017 | ||
SK | 27.12.2017 | ||
SM | 27.12.2017 | ||
BG | 27.03.2018 | ||
NO | 27.03.2018 | ||
GR | 28.03.2018 | ||
IS | 27.04.2018 | ||
IE | 13.05.2018 | ||
LU | 13.05.2018 | ||
CH | 31.05.2018 | ||
LI | 31.05.2018 | ||
Former [2019/17] | AT | 27.12.2017 | |
CY | 27.12.2017 | ||
CZ | 27.12.2017 | ||
DK | 27.12.2017 | ||
EE | 27.12.2017 | ||
ES | 27.12.2017 | ||
FI | 27.12.2017 | ||
HR | 27.12.2017 | ||
IT | 27.12.2017 | ||
LT | 27.12.2017 | ||
LV | 27.12.2017 | ||
MC | 27.12.2017 | ||
PL | 27.12.2017 | ||
RO | 27.12.2017 | ||
RS | 27.12.2017 | ||
SI | 27.12.2017 | ||
SK | 27.12.2017 | ||
SM | 27.12.2017 | ||
BG | 27.03.2018 | ||
NO | 27.03.2018 | ||
GR | 28.03.2018 | ||
IS | 27.04.2018 | ||
LU | 13.05.2018 | ||
CH | 31.05.2018 | ||
LI | 31.05.2018 | ||
Former [2019/12] | AT | 27.12.2017 | |
CY | 27.12.2017 | ||
CZ | 27.12.2017 | ||
DK | 27.12.2017 | ||
EE | 27.12.2017 | ||
ES | 27.12.2017 | ||
FI | 27.12.2017 | ||
HR | 27.12.2017 | ||
IT | 27.12.2017 | ||
LT | 27.12.2017 | ||
LV | 27.12.2017 | ||
MC | 27.12.2017 | ||
PL | 27.12.2017 | ||
RO | 27.12.2017 | ||
RS | 27.12.2017 | ||
SI | 27.12.2017 | ||
SK | 27.12.2017 | ||
SM | 27.12.2017 | ||
BG | 27.03.2018 | ||
NO | 27.03.2018 | ||
GR | 28.03.2018 | ||
IS | 27.04.2018 | ||
CH | 31.05.2018 | ||
LI | 31.05.2018 | ||
Former [2019/06] | AT | 27.12.2017 | |
CY | 27.12.2017 | ||
CZ | 27.12.2017 | ||
DK | 27.12.2017 | ||
EE | 27.12.2017 | ||
ES | 27.12.2017 | ||
FI | 27.12.2017 | ||
HR | 27.12.2017 | ||
IT | 27.12.2017 | ||
LT | 27.12.2017 | ||
LV | 27.12.2017 | ||
MC | 27.12.2017 | ||
PL | 27.12.2017 | ||
RO | 27.12.2017 | ||
RS | 27.12.2017 | ||
SK | 27.12.2017 | ||
SM | 27.12.2017 | ||
BG | 27.03.2018 | ||
NO | 27.03.2018 | ||
GR | 28.03.2018 | ||
IS | 27.04.2018 | ||
Former [2018/51] | AT | 27.12.2017 | |
CY | 27.12.2017 | ||
CZ | 27.12.2017 | ||
DK | 27.12.2017 | ||
EE | 27.12.2017 | ||
ES | 27.12.2017 | ||
FI | 27.12.2017 | ||
HR | 27.12.2017 | ||
IT | 27.12.2017 | ||
LT | 27.12.2017 | ||
LV | 27.12.2017 | ||
PL | 27.12.2017 | ||
RO | 27.12.2017 | ||
RS | 27.12.2017 | ||
SK | 27.12.2017 | ||
SM | 27.12.2017 | ||
BG | 27.03.2018 | ||
NO | 27.03.2018 | ||
GR | 28.03.2018 | ||
IS | 27.04.2018 | ||
Former [2018/40] | AT | 27.12.2017 | |
CY | 27.12.2017 | ||
CZ | 27.12.2017 | ||
EE | 27.12.2017 | ||
ES | 27.12.2017 | ||
FI | 27.12.2017 | ||
HR | 27.12.2017 | ||
IT | 27.12.2017 | ||
LT | 27.12.2017 | ||
LV | 27.12.2017 | ||
PL | 27.12.2017 | ||
RO | 27.12.2017 | ||
RS | 27.12.2017 | ||
SK | 27.12.2017 | ||
SM | 27.12.2017 | ||
BG | 27.03.2018 | ||
NO | 27.03.2018 | ||
GR | 28.03.2018 | ||
IS | 27.04.2018 | ||
Former [2018/39] | AT | 27.12.2017 | |
CY | 27.12.2017 | ||
CZ | 27.12.2017 | ||
EE | 27.12.2017 | ||
ES | 27.12.2017 | ||
FI | 27.12.2017 | ||
HR | 27.12.2017 | ||
IT | 27.12.2017 | ||
LT | 27.12.2017 | ||
LV | 27.12.2017 | ||
PL | 27.12.2017 | ||
RS | 27.12.2017 | ||
SK | 27.12.2017 | ||
SM | 27.12.2017 | ||
BG | 27.03.2018 | ||
NO | 27.03.2018 | ||
GR | 28.03.2018 | ||
IS | 27.04.2018 | ||
Former [2018/38] | AT | 27.12.2017 | |
CY | 27.12.2017 | ||
CZ | 27.12.2017 | ||
EE | 27.12.2017 | ||
ES | 27.12.2017 | ||
FI | 27.12.2017 | ||
HR | 27.12.2017 | ||
LT | 27.12.2017 | ||
LV | 27.12.2017 | ||
PL | 27.12.2017 | ||
RS | 27.12.2017 | ||
SK | 27.12.2017 | ||
SM | 27.12.2017 | ||
BG | 27.03.2018 | ||
NO | 27.03.2018 | ||
GR | 28.03.2018 | ||
IS | 27.04.2018 | ||
Former [2018/37] | CY | 27.12.2017 | |
CZ | 27.12.2017 | ||
EE | 27.12.2017 | ||
ES | 27.12.2017 | ||
FI | 27.12.2017 | ||
HR | 27.12.2017 | ||
LT | 27.12.2017 | ||
LV | 27.12.2017 | ||
PL | 27.12.2017 | ||
RS | 27.12.2017 | ||
SK | 27.12.2017 | ||
SM | 27.12.2017 | ||
BG | 27.03.2018 | ||
NO | 27.03.2018 | ||
GR | 28.03.2018 | ||
Former [2018/25] | FI | 27.12.2017 | |
HR | 27.12.2017 | ||
LT | 27.12.2017 | ||
LV | 27.12.2017 | ||
RS | 27.12.2017 | ||
BG | 27.03.2018 | ||
NO | 27.03.2018 | ||
GR | 28.03.2018 | ||
Former [2018/22] | FI | 27.12.2017 | |
LT | 27.12.2017 | ||
NO | 27.03.2018 | Documents cited: | Search | [XAI]EP2447108 (SHIMANO KK [JP]) [X] 1,2 * paragraph [0062] * * paragraph [0079] * [A] 10,11 [I] 3-8; | [X]JPH09286376 (YAMAHA MOTOR CO LTD) [X] 1,9 * the whole document *; | [A]EP1129934 (HONDA MOTOR CO LTD [JP]) [A] 1,4,7 * paragraph [0062] - paragraph [0063] *; | [AD]JP3190491B (YAMAHA MOTOR CORP LTD) [AD] 1 * the whole document *; | [A]EP0825102 (SANYO ELECTRIC CO [JP]) [A] 1,11 * figure 5 *; | [A]EP2394902 (SHIMANO KK [JP]) [A] 1,10,11 * paragraph [0027] * * paragraph [0041] - paragraph [0043] *; | [A]EP1415904 (SANYO ELECTRIC CO [JP]) [A] 1,10,11 * paragraph [0019] *; | [A]JPH0880891 (YAMAHA MOTOR CO LTD) [A] 1,10,11 * figure 3 * | by applicant | JP3190491B |