EP2671955 - Maraging steel [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 08.04.2016 Database last updated on 13.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.04.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 11.05.2016 [2016/19] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Daido Steel Co., Ltd. 1-10, Higashisakura 1-chome Higashi-ku Nagoya Aichi 461-8581 / JP | For all designated states IHI Corporation Toyosu IHI Building 1-1 Toyosu 3-chome Koto-ku Tokyo 135-8710 / JP | [2013/50] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Ueta, Shigeki c/o Daido Steel Co., Ltd., Daido Corporate Research & Development Center 30, 2-chome, Daido-cho, Minami-ku Nagoya-shi, Aichi, 457-8545 / JP | 02 /
Takabayashi, Hiroyuki c/o Daido Steel Co., Ltd., Daido Corporate Research & Development Center 30, 2-chome, Daido-cho, Minami-ku Nagoya-shi, Aichi, 457-8545 / JP | 03 /
Kimura, Ei c/o Daido Steel Co., Ltd., Daido Corporate Research & Development Center 30, 2-chome, Daido-cho, Minami-ku Nagoya-shi, Aichi, 457-8545 / JP | 04 /
Tanaka, Yuta c/o IHI Corporation Toyosu Ihi Building 1-1, Toyosu 3-chome, Koto-ku Tokyo, 135-8710 / JP | 05 /
Takahashi, Satoshi c/o IHI Corporation Toyosu Ihi Building 1-1, Toyosu 3-chome, Koto-ku Tokyo, 135-8710 / JP | 06 /
Nakanowatari, Isao c/o IHI Corporation Toyosu Ihi Building 1-1, Toyosu 3-chome, Koto-ku Tokyo, 135-8710 / JP | 07 /
Sasaki, Kota c/o IHI Corporation Toyosu Ihi Building 1-1, Toyosu 3-chome, Koto-ku Tokyo, 135-8710 / JP | 08 /
Yamane, Koshiro c/o IHI Corporation Toyosu Ihi Building 1-1, Toyosu 3-chome, Koto-ku Tokyo, 135-8710 / JP | 09 /
Yusa, Satoru c/o IHI Corporation Toyosu Ihi Building 1-1, Toyosu 3-chome, Koto-ku Tokyo, 135-8710 / JP | [2013/50] | Representative(s) | Diehl & Partner Patent- und Rechtsanwaltskanzlei mbB Erika-Mann-Straße 9 80636 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2013/50] | Diehl & Partner GbR Patentanwälte Erika-Mann-Strasse 9 80636 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 13002915.0 | 06.06.2013 | [2013/50] | Priority number, date | JP20120128480 | 06.06.2012 Original published format: JP 2012128480 | JP20130108556 | 23.05.2013 Original published format: JP 2013108556 | [2013/50] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2671955 | Date: | 11.12.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/50] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 09.09.2013 | Classification | IPC: | C21D6/04, C21D1/25, C22C38/06, C22C38/10, C22C38/18, C22C38/44, C22C38/50, C22C38/52 | [2013/50] | CPC: |
C21D6/004 (EP,US);
C21D6/007 (EP,US);
C21D6/02 (EP,US);
C21D6/04 (EP,US);
C21D7/13 (EP,US);
C22C38/06 (US);
C22C38/44 (US);
C22C38/50 (US);
C22C38/52 (US);
C21D1/25 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2013/50] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Martensitaushärtender Stahl | [2013/50] | English: | Maraging steel | [2013/50] | French: | Acier maraging | [2013/50] | Examination procedure | 08.04.2014 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 08.04.2014 | Examination requested [2014/21] | 08.10.2014 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 04.02.2015 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.07.2015 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 12.11.2015 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2016/19] | 16.12.2015 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2016/19] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 08.10.2014 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 18.06.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]JP2011195922 (DAIDO STEEL CO LTD) [X] 1,2 * paragraphs [0002] , [00 7] , [00 8] , [0 19]; claim 1; tables 1,6 *; | [AD]US5393488 (RHOADS MARK A [US], et al) [AD] 1,2 * the whole document *; | [AD]JPS5330916 (NIPPON STEEL CORP) [AD] 1,2 * claims 1,2; tables 1,3 *; | [A]FR2885141 (AUBERT & DUVAL SOC PAR ACTIONS [FR], et al) [A] 1,2 * claims 1-19; table 1 *; | [A]US4076525 (LITTLE CLAYTON D, et al) [A] 1,2 * claims 1-25; table 1 *; | [A]EP0390468 (CARPENTER TECHNOLOGY CORP [US]) [A] 1,2 * claims 1-15 *; | [A]US3585011 (MATAS STEPHEN J, et al) [A] 1,2 * abstract * | [A] - MUKTINUTALAPATI NAGESWARA RAO, "Progress in understanding the metallurgy of 18% nickel maraging steels", INTERNATIONAL JOURNAL OF MATERIALS RESEARCH, CARL HANSER VERLAG, MUNCHEN, DE, (20061101), vol. 97, no. 11, ISSN 1862-5282, pages 1594 - 1607, XP001519065 [A] 1,2 * the whole document * | by applicant | JPS5330916 | US5393488 |