EP2716582 - Goods transfer station [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 22.08.2014 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.08.2014 | Withdrawal of application | published on 24.09.2014 [2014/39] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Dr. Ing. h.c. F. Porsche Aktiengesellschaft Porscheplatz 1 70435 Stuttgart / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2014/15] | For all designated states Dr. Ing. h.c. F. Porsche Aktiengesellschaft Porscheplatz 1 70435 Stuttgart / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Schmidt, Felix Schulstraße 17 72649 Wolfschlugen / DE | [2014/15] | Application number, filing date | 13003796.3 | 30.07.2013 | [2014/15] | Priority number, date | DE201210109451 | 04.10.2012 Original published format: DE102012109451 | [2014/15] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2716582 | Date: | 09.04.2014 | Language: | DE | [2014/15] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 20.12.2013 | Classification | IPC: | B65G65/00, B65G65/23 | [2014/15] | CPC: |
B65G65/23 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2014/15] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Warenumschlagstation | [2014/15] | English: | Goods transfer station | [2014/15] | French: | Poste d'enveloppement de marchandises | [2014/15] | Examination procedure | 30.07.2013 | Examination requested [2014/15] | 30.01.2014 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 16.08.2014 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2014/39] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 30.01.2014 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]DE102010036736 (PORSCHE AG [DE]) [Y] 1-9 * paragraph [0006] - paragraph [0008] * * figure 1 *; | [XY]EP1213243 (SIEMENS AG [DE]) [X] 10 * column 1, line 44 - line 59 * * column 2, line 4 - line 5 * * column 3, line 6 - line 8 * * figure 1 * [Y] 1-9; | [A]US5601014 (STEVENS JAY B [US], et al) [A] 3 * column 2, line 63 - line 65 *; | [A]EP2269926 (DEUTSCHE POST AG [DE]) [A] 7 * column 1, line 57 - line 58 * |