Date | Description | European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
---|---|---|
10.04.2015 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 13.05.2015 [2015/20] |
03.12.2014 | New entry: Application deemed to be withdrawn: despatch of communication + time limit | |
22.04.2014 | Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin | published on 23.04.2014 [2014/17] |