EP2721959 - Seating [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 10.04.2015 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.04.2015 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 13.05.2015 [2015/20] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Völkle Bürostühle GmbH Hohenholz 1 72290 Lossburg / DE | [2014/17] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Völkle, Rolf Andreas Hohenholz 1 D-72290 Lossburg / DE | [2014/17] | Representative(s) | Gleiss, Alf-Olav, et al Gleiss Grosse Schrell und Partner mbB Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte Leitzstrasse 45 70469 Stuttgart / DE | [2014/17] | Application number, filing date | 13004024.9 | 13.08.2013 | [2014/17] | Priority number, date | DE20121021078 | 19.10.2012 Original published format: DE102012021078 | [2014/17] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2721959 | Date: | 23.04.2014 | Language: | DE | [2014/17] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 27.01.2014 | Classification | IPC: | A47C3/026, A47C7/14 | [2014/17] | CPC: |
A47C3/026 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2014/17] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Sitzmöbel | [2014/17] | English: | Seating | [2014/17] | French: | Meubles destinés à s'asseoir | [2014/17] | Examination procedure | 24.10.2014 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2015/20] | 03.12.2014 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2015/20] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XA]DE102010016989 (RIECK JUERGEN [DE]) [X] 1,2,4,5,7-10 * paragraph [0040] - paragraph [0070]; figures 1-11 * [A] 3,6,11; | [X]DE102006021439 (NEUBERT FRANK [DE]) [X] 1 * paragraph [0022] - paragraph [0052]; figures 1-4 *; | [X]GB1078215 (AMERICAN METAL PROD) [X] 1 * page 1, line 74 - page 3, line 130; figures 1-5 * |