EP2698678 - Configuration technique for a control device with applications that communicate with each other [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 07.04.2023 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 29.04.2022 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 20.02.2022 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 24.08.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.09.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MT | published on 09.10.2024 [2024/41] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Elektrobit Automotive GmbH Am Wolfsmantel 46 91058 Erlangen / DE | [2022/22] |
Former [2014/08] | For all designated states Elektrobit Automotive GmbH Am Wolfsmantel 46 91058 Erlangen / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Stellwag, Claus Dresdner Straße 58 91459 Markt Erlbach / DE | 02 /
Kerk, Daniel Mittlere Kreuzgasse 7 90403 Nürnberg / DE | [2014/08] | Representative(s) | Continental Corporation c/o Continental Automotive Technologies GmbH Intellectual Property Guerickestraße 7 60488 Frankfurt a. Main / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2022/22] | Continental Corporation c/o Continental Teves AG & Co. OHG Intellectual Property Guerickestraße 7 60488 Frankfurt a. Main / DE | ||
Former [2014/08] | Röthinger, Rainer Wuesthoff & Wuesthoff Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Schweigerstrasse 2 81541 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 13004032.2 | 13.08.2013 | [2014/08] | Priority number, date | DE20121016539 | 17.08.2012 Original published format: DE102012016539 | [2014/08] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2698678 | Date: | 19.02.2014 | Language: | DE | [2014/08] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2698678 | Date: | 30.03.2016 | Language: | DE | [2016/13] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2698678 | Date: | 01.06.2022 | Language: | DE | [2022/22] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 01.03.2016 | Classification | IPC: | G05B19/042, G06F9/54 | [2016/13] | CPC: |
G06F9/544 (EP,US);
G05B19/0426 (EP,US);
G06F9/545 (EP,US);
G06F9/546 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2014/08] | G05B19/042 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/39] |
Former [2014/08] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | Konfigurationstechnik für ein Steuergerät mit miteinander kommunizierenden Anwendungen | [2014/08] | English: | Configuration technique for a control device with applications that communicate with each other | [2014/08] | French: | Technique de configuration pour un appareil de commande avec des applications communiquant entre elles | [2014/08] | Examination procedure | 19.08.2016 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 19.08.2016 | Examination requested [2016/39] | 28.08.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 20.02.2019 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.06.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 04.11.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.02.2022 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 21.04.2022 | Fee for grant paid | 21.04.2022 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 21.04.2022 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 28.08.2018 | Opposition(s) | 02.03.2023 | No opposition filed within time limit [2023/19] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.08.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.08.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.08.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 31.08.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 02.09.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 31.08.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 31.08.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 13.08.2013 | AL | 01.06.2022 | CY | 01.06.2022 | CZ | 01.06.2022 | DK | 01.06.2022 | EE | 01.06.2022 | ES | 01.06.2022 | FI | 01.06.2022 | HR | 01.06.2022 | IT | 01.06.2022 | LT | 01.06.2022 | LV | 01.06.2022 | MC | 01.06.2022 | MK | 01.06.2022 | MT | 01.06.2022 | NL | 01.06.2022 | PL | 01.06.2022 | RO | 01.06.2022 | RS | 01.06.2022 | SE | 01.06.2022 | SI | 01.06.2022 | SK | 01.06.2022 | SM | 01.06.2022 | TR | 01.06.2022 | AT | 13.08.2022 | IE | 13.08.2022 | LU | 13.08.2022 | BE | 31.08.2022 | CH | 31.08.2022 | LI | 31.08.2022 | BG | 01.09.2022 | GB | 01.09.2022 | NO | 01.09.2022 | GR | 02.09.2022 | IS | 01.10.2022 | PT | 03.10.2022 | [2024/41] |
Former [2024/29] | HU | 13.08.2013 | |
AL | 01.06.2022 | ||
CY | 01.06.2022 | ||
CZ | 01.06.2022 | ||
DK | 01.06.2022 | ||
EE | 01.06.2022 | ||
ES | 01.06.2022 | ||
FI | 01.06.2022 | ||
HR | 01.06.2022 | ||
IT | 01.06.2022 | ||
LT | 01.06.2022 | ||
LV | 01.06.2022 | ||
MC | 01.06.2022 | ||
MK | 01.06.2022 | ||
NL | 01.06.2022 | ||
PL | 01.06.2022 | ||
RO | 01.06.2022 | ||
RS | 01.06.2022 | ||
SE | 01.06.2022 | ||
SI | 01.06.2022 | ||
SK | 01.06.2022 | ||
SM | 01.06.2022 | ||
TR | 01.06.2022 | ||
AT | 13.08.2022 | ||
IE | 13.08.2022 | ||
LU | 13.08.2022 | ||
BE | 31.08.2022 | ||
CH | 31.08.2022 | ||
LI | 31.08.2022 | ||
BG | 01.09.2022 | ||
GB | 01.09.2022 | ||
NO | 01.09.2022 | ||
GR | 02.09.2022 | ||
IS | 01.10.2022 | ||
PT | 03.10.2022 | ||
Former [2024/27] | HU | 13.08.2013 | |
AL | 01.06.2022 | ||
CY | 01.06.2022 | ||
CZ | 01.06.2022 | ||
DK | 01.06.2022 | ||
EE | 01.06.2022 | ||
ES | 01.06.2022 | ||
FI | 01.06.2022 | ||
HR | 01.06.2022 | ||
IT | 01.06.2022 | ||
LT | 01.06.2022 | ||
LV | 01.06.2022 | ||
MC | 01.06.2022 | ||
MK | 01.06.2022 | ||
NL | 01.06.2022 | ||
PL | 01.06.2022 | ||
RO | 01.06.2022 | ||
RS | 01.06.2022 | ||
SE | 01.06.2022 | ||
SI | 01.06.2022 | ||
SK | 01.06.2022 | ||
SM | 01.06.2022 | ||
AT | 13.08.2022 | ||
IE | 13.08.2022 | ||
LU | 13.08.2022 | ||
BE | 31.08.2022 | ||
CH | 31.08.2022 | ||
LI | 31.08.2022 | ||
BG | 01.09.2022 | ||
GB | 01.09.2022 | ||
NO | 01.09.2022 | ||
GR | 02.09.2022 | ||
IS | 01.10.2022 | ||
PT | 03.10.2022 | ||
Former [2024/21] | HU | 13.08.2013 | |
AL | 01.06.2022 | ||
CY | 01.06.2022 | ||
CZ | 01.06.2022 | ||
DK | 01.06.2022 | ||
EE | 01.06.2022 | ||
ES | 01.06.2022 | ||
FI | 01.06.2022 | ||
HR | 01.06.2022 | ||
IT | 01.06.2022 | ||
LT | 01.06.2022 | ||
LV | 01.06.2022 | ||
MC | 01.06.2022 | ||
NL | 01.06.2022 | ||
PL | 01.06.2022 | ||
RO | 01.06.2022 | ||
RS | 01.06.2022 | ||
SE | 01.06.2022 | ||
SI | 01.06.2022 | ||
SK | 01.06.2022 | ||
SM | 01.06.2022 | ||
AT | 13.08.2022 | ||
IE | 13.08.2022 | ||
LU | 13.08.2022 | ||
BE | 31.08.2022 | ||
CH | 31.08.2022 | ||
LI | 31.08.2022 | ||
BG | 01.09.2022 | ||
GB | 01.09.2022 | ||
NO | 01.09.2022 | ||
GR | 02.09.2022 | ||
IS | 01.10.2022 | ||
PT | 03.10.2022 | ||
Former [2024/18] | HU | 13.08.2013 | |
AL | 01.06.2022 | ||
CZ | 01.06.2022 | ||
DK | 01.06.2022 | ||
EE | 01.06.2022 | ||
ES | 01.06.2022 | ||
FI | 01.06.2022 | ||
HR | 01.06.2022 | ||
IT | 01.06.2022 | ||
LT | 01.06.2022 | ||
LV | 01.06.2022 | ||
MC | 01.06.2022 | ||
NL | 01.06.2022 | ||
PL | 01.06.2022 | ||
RO | 01.06.2022 | ||
RS | 01.06.2022 | ||
SE | 01.06.2022 | ||
SI | 01.06.2022 | ||
SK | 01.06.2022 | ||
SM | 01.06.2022 | ||
AT | 13.08.2022 | ||
IE | 13.08.2022 | ||
LU | 13.08.2022 | ||
BE | 31.08.2022 | ||
CH | 31.08.2022 | ||
LI | 31.08.2022 | ||
BG | 01.09.2022 | ||
GB | 01.09.2022 | ||
NO | 01.09.2022 | ||
GR | 02.09.2022 | ||
IS | 01.10.2022 | ||
PT | 03.10.2022 | ||
Former [2024/11] | AL | 01.06.2022 | |
CZ | 01.06.2022 | ||
DK | 01.06.2022 | ||
EE | 01.06.2022 | ||
ES | 01.06.2022 | ||
FI | 01.06.2022 | ||
HR | 01.06.2022 | ||
IT | 01.06.2022 | ||
LT | 01.06.2022 | ||
LV | 01.06.2022 | ||
MC | 01.06.2022 | ||
NL | 01.06.2022 | ||
PL | 01.06.2022 | ||
RO | 01.06.2022 | ||
RS | 01.06.2022 | ||
SE | 01.06.2022 | ||
SI | 01.06.2022 | ||
SK | 01.06.2022 | ||
SM | 01.06.2022 | ||
AT | 13.08.2022 | ||
IE | 13.08.2022 | ||
LU | 13.08.2022 | ||
BE | 31.08.2022 | ||
CH | 31.08.2022 | ||
LI | 31.08.2022 | ||
BG | 01.09.2022 | ||
GB | 01.09.2022 | ||
NO | 01.09.2022 | ||
GR | 02.09.2022 | ||
IS | 01.10.2022 | ||
PT | 03.10.2022 | ||
Former [2023/48] | AL | 01.06.2022 | |
CZ | 01.06.2022 | ||
DK | 01.06.2022 | ||
EE | 01.06.2022 | ||
ES | 01.06.2022 | ||
FI | 01.06.2022 | ||
HR | 01.06.2022 | ||
LT | 01.06.2022 | ||
LV | 01.06.2022 | ||
MC | 01.06.2022 | ||
NL | 01.06.2022 | ||
PL | 01.06.2022 | ||
RO | 01.06.2022 | ||
RS | 01.06.2022 | ||
SE | 01.06.2022 | ||
SI | 01.06.2022 | ||
SK | 01.06.2022 | ||
SM | 01.06.2022 | ||
AT | 13.08.2022 | ||
IE | 13.08.2022 | ||
LU | 13.08.2022 | ||
BE | 31.08.2022 | ||
CH | 31.08.2022 | ||
LI | 31.08.2022 | ||
BG | 01.09.2022 | ||
GB | 01.09.2022 | ||
NO | 01.09.2022 | ||
GR | 02.09.2022 | ||
IS | 01.10.2022 | ||
PT | 03.10.2022 | ||
Former [2023/47] | AL | 01.06.2022 | |
CZ | 01.06.2022 | ||
DK | 01.06.2022 | ||
EE | 01.06.2022 | ||
ES | 01.06.2022 | ||
FI | 01.06.2022 | ||
HR | 01.06.2022 | ||
LT | 01.06.2022 | ||
LV | 01.06.2022 | ||
MC | 01.06.2022 | ||
NL | 01.06.2022 | ||
PL | 01.06.2022 | ||
RO | 01.06.2022 | ||
RS | 01.06.2022 | ||
SE | 01.06.2022 | ||
SI | 01.06.2022 | ||
SK | 01.06.2022 | ||
SM | 01.06.2022 | ||
IE | 13.08.2022 | ||
LU | 13.08.2022 | ||
BE | 31.08.2022 | ||
CH | 31.08.2022 | ||
LI | 31.08.2022 | ||
BG | 01.09.2022 | ||
GB | 01.09.2022 | ||
NO | 01.09.2022 | ||
GR | 02.09.2022 | ||
IS | 01.10.2022 | ||
PT | 03.10.2022 | ||
Former [2023/42] | AL | 01.06.2022 | |
CZ | 01.06.2022 | ||
DK | 01.06.2022 | ||
EE | 01.06.2022 | ||
ES | 01.06.2022 | ||
FI | 01.06.2022 | ||
HR | 01.06.2022 | ||
LT | 01.06.2022 | ||
LV | 01.06.2022 | ||
MC | 01.06.2022 | ||
NL | 01.06.2022 | ||
PL | 01.06.2022 | ||
RO | 01.06.2022 | ||
RS | 01.06.2022 | ||
SE | 01.06.2022 | ||
SI | 01.06.2022 | ||
SK | 01.06.2022 | ||
SM | 01.06.2022 | ||
IE | 13.08.2022 | ||
LU | 13.08.2022 | ||
BE | 31.08.2022 | ||
CH | 31.08.2022 | ||
LI | 31.08.2022 | ||
BG | 01.09.2022 | ||
NO | 01.09.2022 | ||
GR | 02.09.2022 | ||
IS | 01.10.2022 | ||
PT | 03.10.2022 | ||
Former [2023/33] | AL | 01.06.2022 | |
CZ | 01.06.2022 | ||
DK | 01.06.2022 | ||
EE | 01.06.2022 | ||
ES | 01.06.2022 | ||
FI | 01.06.2022 | ||
HR | 01.06.2022 | ||
LT | 01.06.2022 | ||
LV | 01.06.2022 | ||
MC | 01.06.2022 | ||
NL | 01.06.2022 | ||
PL | 01.06.2022 | ||
RO | 01.06.2022 | ||
RS | 01.06.2022 | ||
SE | 01.06.2022 | ||
SI | 01.06.2022 | ||
SK | 01.06.2022 | ||
SM | 01.06.2022 | ||
IE | 13.08.2022 | ||
LU | 13.08.2022 | ||
CH | 31.08.2022 | ||
LI | 31.08.2022 | ||
BG | 01.09.2022 | ||
NO | 01.09.2022 | ||
GR | 02.09.2022 | ||
IS | 01.10.2022 | ||
PT | 03.10.2022 | ||
Former [2023/25] | AL | 01.06.2022 | |
CZ | 01.06.2022 | ||
DK | 01.06.2022 | ||
EE | 01.06.2022 | ||
ES | 01.06.2022 | ||
FI | 01.06.2022 | ||
HR | 01.06.2022 | ||
LT | 01.06.2022 | ||
LV | 01.06.2022 | ||
MC | 01.06.2022 | ||
NL | 01.06.2022 | ||
PL | 01.06.2022 | ||
RO | 01.06.2022 | ||
RS | 01.06.2022 | ||
SE | 01.06.2022 | ||
SI | 01.06.2022 | ||
SK | 01.06.2022 | ||
SM | 01.06.2022 | ||
LU | 13.08.2022 | ||
CH | 31.08.2022 | ||
LI | 31.08.2022 | ||
BG | 01.09.2022 | ||
NO | 01.09.2022 | ||
GR | 02.09.2022 | ||
IS | 01.10.2022 | ||
PT | 03.10.2022 | ||
Former [2023/21] | AL | 01.06.2022 | |
CZ | 01.06.2022 | ||
DK | 01.06.2022 | ||
EE | 01.06.2022 | ||
ES | 01.06.2022 | ||
FI | 01.06.2022 | ||
HR | 01.06.2022 | ||
LT | 01.06.2022 | ||
LV | 01.06.2022 | ||
MC | 01.06.2022 | ||
NL | 01.06.2022 | ||
PL | 01.06.2022 | ||
RO | 01.06.2022 | ||
RS | 01.06.2022 | ||
SE | 01.06.2022 | ||
SK | 01.06.2022 | ||
SM | 01.06.2022 | ||
LU | 13.08.2022 | ||
CH | 31.08.2022 | ||
LI | 31.08.2022 | ||
BG | 01.09.2022 | ||
NO | 01.09.2022 | ||
GR | 02.09.2022 | ||
IS | 01.10.2022 | ||
PT | 03.10.2022 | ||
Former [2023/17] | AL | 01.06.2022 | |
CZ | 01.06.2022 | ||
EE | 01.06.2022 | ||
ES | 01.06.2022 | ||
FI | 01.06.2022 | ||
HR | 01.06.2022 | ||
LT | 01.06.2022 | ||
LV | 01.06.2022 | ||
MC | 01.06.2022 | ||
NL | 01.06.2022 | ||
PL | 01.06.2022 | ||
RO | 01.06.2022 | ||
RS | 01.06.2022 | ||
SE | 01.06.2022 | ||
SK | 01.06.2022 | ||
SM | 01.06.2022 | ||
BG | 01.09.2022 | ||
NO | 01.09.2022 | ||
GR | 02.09.2022 | ||
IS | 01.10.2022 | ||
PT | 03.10.2022 | ||
Former [2023/16] | CZ | 01.06.2022 | |
EE | 01.06.2022 | ||
ES | 01.06.2022 | ||
FI | 01.06.2022 | ||
HR | 01.06.2022 | ||
LT | 01.06.2022 | ||
LV | 01.06.2022 | ||
MC | 01.06.2022 | ||
NL | 01.06.2022 | ||
PL | 01.06.2022 | ||
RO | 01.06.2022 | ||
RS | 01.06.2022 | ||
SE | 01.06.2022 | ||
SK | 01.06.2022 | ||
SM | 01.06.2022 | ||
BG | 01.09.2022 | ||
NO | 01.09.2022 | ||
GR | 02.09.2022 | ||
IS | 01.10.2022 | ||
PT | 03.10.2022 | ||
Former [2023/12] | CZ | 01.06.2022 | |
EE | 01.06.2022 | ||
ES | 01.06.2022 | ||
FI | 01.06.2022 | ||
HR | 01.06.2022 | ||
LT | 01.06.2022 | ||
LV | 01.06.2022 | ||
NL | 01.06.2022 | ||
PL | 01.06.2022 | ||
RO | 01.06.2022 | ||
RS | 01.06.2022 | ||
SE | 01.06.2022 | ||
SK | 01.06.2022 | ||
SM | 01.06.2022 | ||
BG | 01.09.2022 | ||
NO | 01.09.2022 | ||
GR | 02.09.2022 | ||
IS | 01.10.2022 | ||
PT | 03.10.2022 | ||
Former [2023/09] | CZ | 01.06.2022 | |
EE | 01.06.2022 | ||
ES | 01.06.2022 | ||
FI | 01.06.2022 | ||
HR | 01.06.2022 | ||
LT | 01.06.2022 | ||
LV | 01.06.2022 | ||
NL | 01.06.2022 | ||
PL | 01.06.2022 | ||
RO | 01.06.2022 | ||
RS | 01.06.2022 | ||
SE | 01.06.2022 | ||
SK | 01.06.2022 | ||
SM | 01.06.2022 | ||
BG | 01.09.2022 | ||
NO | 01.09.2022 | ||
GR | 02.09.2022 | ||
PT | 03.10.2022 | ||
Former [2023/02] | ES | 01.06.2022 | |
FI | 01.06.2022 | ||
HR | 01.06.2022 | ||
LT | 01.06.2022 | ||
LV | 01.06.2022 | ||
NL | 01.06.2022 | ||
PL | 01.06.2022 | ||
RS | 01.06.2022 | ||
SE | 01.06.2022 | ||
BG | 01.09.2022 | ||
NO | 01.09.2022 | ||
GR | 02.09.2022 | ||
Former [2022/50] | ES | 01.06.2022 | |
FI | 01.06.2022 | ||
HR | 01.06.2022 | ||
LT | 01.06.2022 | ||
LV | 01.06.2022 | ||
PL | 01.06.2022 | ||
RS | 01.06.2022 | ||
SE | 01.06.2022 | ||
BG | 01.09.2022 | ||
NO | 01.09.2022 | ||
GR | 02.09.2022 | ||
Former [2022/49] | ES | 01.06.2022 | |
FI | 01.06.2022 | ||
HR | 01.06.2022 | ||
LT | 01.06.2022 | ||
LV | 01.06.2022 | ||
SE | 01.06.2022 | ||
BG | 01.09.2022 | ||
NO | 01.09.2022 | ||
GR | 02.09.2022 | ||
Former [2022/47] | ES | 01.06.2022 | |
FI | 01.06.2022 | ||
LT | 01.06.2022 | ||
SE | 01.06.2022 | ||
NO | 01.09.2022 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US2002144010 (YOUNIS MOHAMED [US], et al) [X] 1-6,14-16,18,20 * the whole document *; | [I]US2006107264 (SCHMIDT JEFFREY S [US], et al) [I] 7-13,17,19,20 * the whole document *; | [I] - "Partitioning in Avionics. Architectures: Requirements,. Mechanisms, and Assurance", INTERNET CITATION, (20000301), pages I - 62, URL: http://www.tc.faa.gov/its/worldpac/techrpt/ar99-58.pdf, (20100609), XP002587030 [I] 7-13,17,19,20 * the whole document * | [I] - GHAISAS S ET AL, SParK: Safety Partition Kernel for Integrated Real-Time Systems, FROM ACTIVE DATA MANAGEMENT TO EVENT-BASED SYSTEMS AND MORE, SPRINGER BERLIN HEIDELBERG, BERLIN, HEIDELBERG, PAGE(S) 159 - 174, (20100901), ISBN 978-3-642-17225-0, XP019157475 [I] 7-13,17,19,20 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1007/978-3-642-17226-7_10 | [A] - "An Avionics Standard for Safe, Partitioned Systems", ARINC 653 IEEE-CS SEMINAR,, (20080101), page 30pp, XP009165105 [A] 1-20 * the whole document * | [A] - ROBERT HILBRICH, "How to Safely Integrate Multiple Applications on Embedded Many-Core Systems by Applying the "Correctness by Construction" Principle", ADVANCES IN SOFTWARE ENGINEERING, (20120101), vol. 192, no. 3, doi:10.1007/978-3-642-21292-5_4, ISSN 1687-8655, pages 202 - 14, XP055169189 [A] 1-20 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1155/2012/354274 | [L] - "Advances in Software Engineering - About this journal", (20160223), URL: http://www.hindawi.com/journals/ase/, (20160223), XP055252569 |