EP2708648 - Device for construction and/or renovation of a railway track [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 03.07.2020 Database last updated on 28.06.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 31.05.2019 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 25.03.2019 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 15.02.2019 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 10.01.2019 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 18.05.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.07.2022 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 03.08.2022 [2022/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Zuercher Holding GmbH Robert-Zuercher-Strasse 1-6 77974 Meissenheim / DE | [2014/12] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Zuercher, Ralf Binzenweg 12 77974 Meissenheim / DE | [2014/12] | Representative(s) | Mehl-Mikus, Claudia, et al mepat Patentanwälte Dr. Mehl-Mikus, Goy, Dr. Drobnik PartG mbB Eisenlohrstraße 31 76135 Karlsruhe / DE | [2019/27] |
Former [2014/12] | Goy, Wolfgang PATENTANWALT Zähringer Strasse 373 79108 Freiburg / DE | Application number, filing date | 13004242.7 | 28.08.2013 | [2014/12] | Priority number, date | DE20121017997 | 12.09.2012 Original published format: DE102012017997 | [2014/12] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2708648 | Date: | 19.03.2014 | Language: | DE | [2014/12] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2708648 | Date: | 20.04.2016 | Language: | DE | [2016/16] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2708648 | Date: | 03.07.2019 | Language: | DE | [2019/27] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 18.03.2016 | Classification | IPC: | E01B27/00, E01B29/02 | [2016/16] | CPC: |
E01B29/02 (EP);
E01B27/02 (EP)
|
Former IPC [2014/12] | E01B27/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/47] |
Former [2014/12] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | Vorrichtung zur Erstellung und/oder Sanierung einer Bahnstrecke | [2014/12] | English: | Device for construction and/or renovation of a railway track | [2014/12] | French: | Dispositif destiné à la réalisation et/ou à la rénovation d'une voie ferrée | [2014/12] | Examination procedure | 18.10.2016 | Examination requested [2016/47] | 20.10.2016 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 08.05.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 15.08.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.01.2019 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 14.02.2019 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 26.03.2019 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 16.05.2019 | Fee for grant paid | 16.05.2019 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 17.05.2019 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 08.05.2018 | Opposition(s) | 03.06.2020 | No opposition filed within time limit [2020/32] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.07.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 02.08.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.07.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 14.08.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 28.08.2013 | AL | 03.07.2019 | CY | 03.07.2019 | CZ | 03.07.2019 | EE | 03.07.2019 | ES | 03.07.2019 | FI | 03.07.2019 | HR | 03.07.2019 | LT | 03.07.2019 | LV | 03.07.2019 | MC | 03.07.2019 | MK | 03.07.2019 | MT | 03.07.2019 | NL | 03.07.2019 | RS | 03.07.2019 | SI | 03.07.2019 | SK | 03.07.2019 | SM | 03.07.2019 | IE | 28.08.2019 | BE | 31.08.2019 | BG | 03.10.2019 | GR | 04.10.2019 | IS | 03.11.2019 | PT | 04.11.2019 | [2022/31] |
Former [2021/34] | HU | 28.08.2013 | |
AL | 03.07.2019 | ||
CY | 03.07.2019 | ||
CZ | 03.07.2019 | ||
EE | 03.07.2019 | ||
ES | 03.07.2019 | ||
FI | 03.07.2019 | ||
HR | 03.07.2019 | ||
LT | 03.07.2019 | ||
LV | 03.07.2019 | ||
MC | 03.07.2019 | ||
MT | 03.07.2019 | ||
NL | 03.07.2019 | ||
RS | 03.07.2019 | ||
SI | 03.07.2019 | ||
SK | 03.07.2019 | ||
SM | 03.07.2019 | ||
IE | 28.08.2019 | ||
BE | 31.08.2019 | ||
BG | 03.10.2019 | ||
GR | 04.10.2019 | ||
IS | 03.11.2019 | ||
PT | 04.11.2019 | ||
Former [2021/32] | HU | 28.08.2013 | |
AL | 03.07.2019 | ||
CY | 03.07.2019 | ||
CZ | 03.07.2019 | ||
EE | 03.07.2019 | ||
ES | 03.07.2019 | ||
FI | 03.07.2019 | ||
HR | 03.07.2019 | ||
LT | 03.07.2019 | ||
LV | 03.07.2019 | ||
MC | 03.07.2019 | ||
NL | 03.07.2019 | ||
RS | 03.07.2019 | ||
SI | 03.07.2019 | ||
SK | 03.07.2019 | ||
SM | 03.07.2019 | ||
IE | 28.08.2019 | ||
BE | 31.08.2019 | ||
BG | 03.10.2019 | ||
GR | 04.10.2019 | ||
IS | 03.11.2019 | ||
PT | 04.11.2019 | ||
Former [2021/26] | AL | 03.07.2019 | |
CY | 03.07.2019 | ||
CZ | 03.07.2019 | ||
EE | 03.07.2019 | ||
ES | 03.07.2019 | ||
FI | 03.07.2019 | ||
HR | 03.07.2019 | ||
LT | 03.07.2019 | ||
LV | 03.07.2019 | ||
MC | 03.07.2019 | ||
NL | 03.07.2019 | ||
RS | 03.07.2019 | ||
SI | 03.07.2019 | ||
SK | 03.07.2019 | ||
SM | 03.07.2019 | ||
IE | 28.08.2019 | ||
BE | 31.08.2019 | ||
BG | 03.10.2019 | ||
GR | 04.10.2019 | ||
IS | 03.11.2019 | ||
PT | 04.11.2019 | ||
Former [2020/37] | AL | 03.07.2019 | |
CZ | 03.07.2019 | ||
EE | 03.07.2019 | ||
ES | 03.07.2019 | ||
FI | 03.07.2019 | ||
HR | 03.07.2019 | ||
LT | 03.07.2019 | ||
LV | 03.07.2019 | ||
MC | 03.07.2019 | ||
NL | 03.07.2019 | ||
RS | 03.07.2019 | ||
SI | 03.07.2019 | ||
SK | 03.07.2019 | ||
SM | 03.07.2019 | ||
IE | 28.08.2019 | ||
BE | 31.08.2019 | ||
BG | 03.10.2019 | ||
GR | 04.10.2019 | ||
IS | 03.11.2019 | ||
PT | 04.11.2019 | ||
Former [2020/36] | AL | 03.07.2019 | |
CZ | 03.07.2019 | ||
EE | 03.07.2019 | ||
ES | 03.07.2019 | ||
FI | 03.07.2019 | ||
HR | 03.07.2019 | ||
LT | 03.07.2019 | ||
LV | 03.07.2019 | ||
MC | 03.07.2019 | ||
NL | 03.07.2019 | ||
RS | 03.07.2019 | ||
SK | 03.07.2019 | ||
SM | 03.07.2019 | ||
IE | 28.08.2019 | ||
BG | 03.10.2019 | ||
GR | 04.10.2019 | ||
IS | 03.11.2019 | ||
PT | 04.11.2019 | ||
Former [2020/27] | AL | 03.07.2019 | |
CZ | 03.07.2019 | ||
EE | 03.07.2019 | ||
ES | 03.07.2019 | ||
FI | 03.07.2019 | ||
HR | 03.07.2019 | ||
LT | 03.07.2019 | ||
LV | 03.07.2019 | ||
MC | 03.07.2019 | ||
NL | 03.07.2019 | ||
RS | 03.07.2019 | ||
SK | 03.07.2019 | ||
SM | 03.07.2019 | ||
BG | 03.10.2019 | ||
GR | 04.10.2019 | ||
PT | 04.11.2019 | ||
IS | 24.02.2020 | ||
Former [2020/25] | AL | 03.07.2019 | |
CZ | 03.07.2019 | ||
EE | 03.07.2019 | ||
ES | 03.07.2019 | ||
FI | 03.07.2019 | ||
HR | 03.07.2019 | ||
LT | 03.07.2019 | ||
LV | 03.07.2019 | ||
MC | 03.07.2019 | ||
NL | 03.07.2019 | ||
RS | 03.07.2019 | ||
SK | 03.07.2019 | ||
BG | 03.10.2019 | ||
GR | 04.10.2019 | ||
PT | 04.11.2019 | ||
IS | 24.02.2020 | ||
Former [2020/24] | AL | 03.07.2019 | |
CZ | 03.07.2019 | ||
EE | 03.07.2019 | ||
ES | 03.07.2019 | ||
FI | 03.07.2019 | ||
HR | 03.07.2019 | ||
LT | 03.07.2019 | ||
LV | 03.07.2019 | ||
MC | 03.07.2019 | ||
NL | 03.07.2019 | ||
RS | 03.07.2019 | ||
BG | 03.10.2019 | ||
GR | 04.10.2019 | ||
PT | 04.11.2019 | ||
IS | 24.02.2020 | ||
Former [2020/22] | AL | 03.07.2019 | |
CZ | 03.07.2019 | ||
EE | 03.07.2019 | ||
ES | 03.07.2019 | ||
FI | 03.07.2019 | ||
HR | 03.07.2019 | ||
LT | 03.07.2019 | ||
LV | 03.07.2019 | ||
NL | 03.07.2019 | ||
RS | 03.07.2019 | ||
BG | 03.10.2019 | ||
GR | 04.10.2019 | ||
IS | 03.11.2019 | ||
PT | 04.11.2019 | ||
Former [2020/15] | AL | 03.07.2019 | |
CZ | 03.07.2019 | ||
ES | 03.07.2019 | ||
FI | 03.07.2019 | ||
HR | 03.07.2019 | ||
LT | 03.07.2019 | ||
LV | 03.07.2019 | ||
NL | 03.07.2019 | ||
RS | 03.07.2019 | ||
BG | 03.10.2019 | ||
GR | 04.10.2019 | ||
IS | 03.11.2019 | ||
PT | 04.11.2019 | ||
Former [2020/12] | CZ | 03.07.2019 | |
ES | 03.07.2019 | ||
FI | 03.07.2019 | ||
HR | 03.07.2019 | ||
LT | 03.07.2019 | ||
LV | 03.07.2019 | ||
NL | 03.07.2019 | ||
RS | 03.07.2019 | ||
BG | 03.10.2019 | ||
GR | 04.10.2019 | ||
IS | 03.11.2019 | ||
PT | 04.11.2019 | ||
Former [2020/11] | CZ | 03.07.2019 | |
ES | 03.07.2019 | ||
FI | 03.07.2019 | ||
HR | 03.07.2019 | ||
LT | 03.07.2019 | ||
LV | 03.07.2019 | ||
NL | 03.07.2019 | ||
RS | 03.07.2019 | ||
BG | 03.10.2019 | ||
GR | 04.10.2019 | ||
PT | 04.11.2019 | ||
Former [2020/10] | CZ | 03.07.2019 | |
FI | 03.07.2019 | ||
LT | 03.07.2019 | ||
NL | 03.07.2019 | ||
BG | 03.10.2019 | ||
PT | 04.11.2019 | ||
Former [2020/09] | CZ | 03.07.2019 | |
FI | 03.07.2019 | ||
LT | 03.07.2019 | ||
NL | 03.07.2019 | ||
Former [2020/08] | LT | 03.07.2019 | |
NL | 03.07.2019 | ||
Former [2020/07] | NL | 03.07.2019 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]FR2625519 (FRANCE LITTORAL SA ROUTE [FR]) [A] 1* abstract *; | [A]DE3834313 (HERMANN KIRCHNER GMBH & CO KG [DE]) [A] 1-4,8-10 * column 6, line 10 - column 7, line 38; figures 1-7 *; | [A]DE9307161U (HEILIT + WOERNER BAU AG [DE]) [A] 1,3,4,10 * figures 1,2; claims 1-10 *; | [A]DE4208801 (HERMANN KIRCHNER GMBH & CO KG [DE]) [A] 1 * abstract *; | [A]DE4208803 (HERMANN KIRCHNER GMBH & CO KG [DE]) [A] 1 * figures 1,2; claim 1 *; | [A]EP1369529 (MITSUBISHI HEAVY IND LTD [JP], et al) [A] 1,2,8-10 * abstract *; | [A]EP2295638 (ZUERCHER RALF [DE]) [A] 1,2,4,8,10 * column 3, paragraph [0015] - column 4, paragraph [0018]; figures 1-3 *; | [AD]DE102010045068 (ZUERCHER RALF [DE]) [AD] 1-10 * figures 1,2a,2b,3a-3c,4a,4b * | by applicant | DE102010045068 |