EP2711141 - Collapsible assembly table [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 17.02.2017 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.10.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL | published on 14.11.2018 [2018/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Schmitz, Michael Friedrichstr. 41 57462 Olpe / DE | [2014/13] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2014/13] | Representative(s) | Beckmann, Jürgen Dr. Jürgen Beckmann Patentanwalt An der Baumschule 23 57462 Olpe / DE | [2016/15] |
Former [2014/13] | Beckmann, Jürgen Dr. Jürgen Beckmann Patentanwalt An der Baumschule 23 57462 Olpe / DE | Application number, filing date | 13004504.0 | 16.09.2013 | [2014/13] | Priority number, date | DE201220103666U | 25.09.2012 Original published format: DE 202012103666 U | [2014/13] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2711141 | Date: | 26.03.2014 | Language: | DE | [2014/13] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2711141 | Date: | 13.04.2016 | Language: | DE | [2016/15] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 30.01.2014 | Classification | IPC: | B25H1/04 | [2014/13] | CPC: |
B25H1/04 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/15] |
Former [2014/13] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | Zusammenklappbarer Montagetisch | [2014/13] | English: | Collapsible assembly table | [2014/13] | French: | Table de montage repliable | [2014/13] | Examination procedure | 27.08.2014 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 27.08.2014 | Examination requested [2014/41] | 23.01.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 17.04.2015 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.10.2015 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 17.02.2016 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | 22.02.2016 | Fee for grant paid | 22.02.2016 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 23.01.2015 | Opposition(s) | 16.01.2017 | No opposition filed within time limit [2017/12] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.08.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 16.09.2013 | AL | 13.04.2016 | BG | 13.04.2016 | CY | 13.04.2016 | CZ | 13.04.2016 | DK | 13.04.2016 | EE | 13.04.2016 | ES | 13.04.2016 | FI | 13.04.2016 | HR | 13.04.2016 | IS | 13.04.2016 | LT | 13.04.2016 | LV | 13.04.2016 | MC | 13.04.2016 | MK | 13.04.2016 | MT | 13.04.2016 | RO | 13.04.2016 | RS | 13.04.2016 | SE | 13.04.2016 | SI | 13.04.2016 | SK | 13.04.2016 | SM | 13.04.2016 | TR | 13.04.2016 | NO | 13.07.2016 | GR | 14.07.2016 | PT | 16.08.2016 | IE | 16.09.2016 | LU | 16.09.2016 | BE | 30.09.2016 | [2018/46] |
Former [2018/45] | HU | 16.09.2013 | |
BG | 13.04.2016 | ||
CY | 13.04.2016 | ||
CZ | 13.04.2016 | ||
DK | 13.04.2016 | ||
EE | 13.04.2016 | ||
ES | 13.04.2016 | ||
FI | 13.04.2016 | ||
HR | 13.04.2016 | ||
IS | 13.04.2016 | ||
LT | 13.04.2016 | ||
LV | 13.04.2016 | ||
MC | 13.04.2016 | ||
MK | 13.04.2016 | ||
MT | 13.04.2016 | ||
RO | 13.04.2016 | ||
RS | 13.04.2016 | ||
SE | 13.04.2016 | ||
SI | 13.04.2016 | ||
SK | 13.04.2016 | ||
SM | 13.04.2016 | ||
TR | 13.04.2016 | ||
NO | 13.07.2016 | ||
GR | 14.07.2016 | ||
PT | 16.08.2016 | ||
IE | 16.09.2016 | ||
LU | 16.09.2016 | ||
BE | 30.09.2016 | ||
Former [2018/38] | HU | 16.09.2013 | |
BG | 13.04.2016 | ||
CY | 13.04.2016 | ||
CZ | 13.04.2016 | ||
DK | 13.04.2016 | ||
EE | 13.04.2016 | ||
ES | 13.04.2016 | ||
FI | 13.04.2016 | ||
HR | 13.04.2016 | ||
IS | 13.04.2016 | ||
LT | 13.04.2016 | ||
LV | 13.04.2016 | ||
MC | 13.04.2016 | ||
MK | 13.04.2016 | ||
MT | 13.04.2016 | ||
RO | 13.04.2016 | ||
RS | 13.04.2016 | ||
SE | 13.04.2016 | ||
SI | 13.04.2016 | ||
SK | 13.04.2016 | ||
SM | 13.04.2016 | ||
NO | 13.07.2016 | ||
GR | 14.07.2016 | ||
PT | 16.08.2016 | ||
IE | 16.09.2016 | ||
LU | 16.09.2016 | ||
BE | 30.09.2016 | ||
Former [2018/32] | HU | 16.09.2013 | |
CY | 13.04.2016 | ||
CZ | 13.04.2016 | ||
DK | 13.04.2016 | ||
EE | 13.04.2016 | ||
ES | 13.04.2016 | ||
FI | 13.04.2016 | ||
HR | 13.04.2016 | ||
IS | 13.04.2016 | ||
LT | 13.04.2016 | ||
LV | 13.04.2016 | ||
MC | 13.04.2016 | ||
MK | 13.04.2016 | ||
MT | 13.04.2016 | ||
RO | 13.04.2016 | ||
RS | 13.04.2016 | ||
SE | 13.04.2016 | ||
SI | 13.04.2016 | ||
SK | 13.04.2016 | ||
SM | 13.04.2016 | ||
NO | 13.07.2016 | ||
GR | 14.07.2016 | ||
PT | 16.08.2016 | ||
IE | 16.09.2016 | ||
LU | 16.09.2016 | ||
BE | 30.09.2016 | ||
Former [2018/28] | HU | 16.09.2013 | |
CY | 13.04.2016 | ||
CZ | 13.04.2016 | ||
DK | 13.04.2016 | ||
EE | 13.04.2016 | ||
ES | 13.04.2016 | ||
FI | 13.04.2016 | ||
HR | 13.04.2016 | ||
LT | 13.04.2016 | ||
LV | 13.04.2016 | ||
MC | 13.04.2016 | ||
MK | 13.04.2016 | ||
RO | 13.04.2016 | ||
RS | 13.04.2016 | ||
SE | 13.04.2016 | ||
SI | 13.04.2016 | ||
SK | 13.04.2016 | ||
SM | 13.04.2016 | ||
NO | 13.07.2016 | ||
GR | 14.07.2016 | ||
PT | 16.08.2016 | ||
IE | 16.09.2016 | ||
LU | 16.09.2016 | ||
BE | 30.09.2016 | ||
Former [2017/41] | CZ | 13.04.2016 | |
DK | 13.04.2016 | ||
EE | 13.04.2016 | ||
ES | 13.04.2016 | ||
FI | 13.04.2016 | ||
HR | 13.04.2016 | ||
LT | 13.04.2016 | ||
LV | 13.04.2016 | ||
MC | 13.04.2016 | ||
RO | 13.04.2016 | ||
RS | 13.04.2016 | ||
SE | 13.04.2016 | ||
SI | 13.04.2016 | ||
SK | 13.04.2016 | ||
SM | 13.04.2016 | ||
NO | 13.07.2016 | ||
GR | 14.07.2016 | ||
PT | 16.08.2016 | ||
IE | 16.09.2016 | ||
LU | 16.09.2016 | ||
BE | 30.09.2016 | ||
Former [2017/37] | CZ | 13.04.2016 | |
DK | 13.04.2016 | ||
EE | 13.04.2016 | ||
ES | 13.04.2016 | ||
FI | 13.04.2016 | ||
HR | 13.04.2016 | ||
LT | 13.04.2016 | ||
LV | 13.04.2016 | ||
MC | 13.04.2016 | ||
RO | 13.04.2016 | ||
RS | 13.04.2016 | ||
SE | 13.04.2016 | ||
SI | 13.04.2016 | ||
SK | 13.04.2016 | ||
SM | 13.04.2016 | ||
NO | 13.07.2016 | ||
GR | 14.07.2016 | ||
PT | 16.08.2016 | ||
IE | 16.09.2016 | ||
BE | 30.09.2016 | ||
Former [2017/31] | CZ | 13.04.2016 | |
DK | 13.04.2016 | ||
EE | 13.04.2016 | ||
ES | 13.04.2016 | ||
FI | 13.04.2016 | ||
HR | 13.04.2016 | ||
LT | 13.04.2016 | ||
LV | 13.04.2016 | ||
MC | 13.04.2016 | ||
RO | 13.04.2016 | ||
RS | 13.04.2016 | ||
SE | 13.04.2016 | ||
SI | 13.04.2016 | ||
SK | 13.04.2016 | ||
SM | 13.04.2016 | ||
NO | 13.07.2016 | ||
GR | 14.07.2016 | ||
PT | 16.08.2016 | ||
BE | 30.09.2016 | ||
Former [2017/11] | CZ | 13.04.2016 | |
DK | 13.04.2016 | ||
EE | 13.04.2016 | ||
ES | 13.04.2016 | ||
FI | 13.04.2016 | ||
HR | 13.04.2016 | ||
LT | 13.04.2016 | ||
LV | 13.04.2016 | ||
RO | 13.04.2016 | ||
RS | 13.04.2016 | ||
SE | 13.04.2016 | ||
SK | 13.04.2016 | ||
SM | 13.04.2016 | ||
NO | 13.07.2016 | ||
GR | 14.07.2016 | ||
PT | 16.08.2016 | ||
BE | 30.09.2016 | ||
Former [2017/10] | CZ | 13.04.2016 | |
DK | 13.04.2016 | ||
EE | 13.04.2016 | ||
ES | 13.04.2016 | ||
FI | 13.04.2016 | ||
HR | 13.04.2016 | ||
LT | 13.04.2016 | ||
LV | 13.04.2016 | ||
RO | 13.04.2016 | ||
RS | 13.04.2016 | ||
SE | 13.04.2016 | ||
SK | 13.04.2016 | ||
NO | 13.07.2016 | ||
GR | 14.07.2016 | ||
PT | 16.08.2016 | ||
BE | 30.09.2016 | ||
Former [2017/09] | CZ | 13.04.2016 | |
DK | 13.04.2016 | ||
EE | 13.04.2016 | ||
ES | 13.04.2016 | ||
FI | 13.04.2016 | ||
HR | 13.04.2016 | ||
LT | 13.04.2016 | ||
LV | 13.04.2016 | ||
RO | 13.04.2016 | ||
RS | 13.04.2016 | ||
SE | 13.04.2016 | ||
NO | 13.07.2016 | ||
GR | 14.07.2016 | ||
PT | 16.08.2016 | ||
Former [2017/07] | DK | 13.04.2016 | |
ES | 13.04.2016 | ||
FI | 13.04.2016 | ||
HR | 13.04.2016 | ||
LT | 13.04.2016 | ||
LV | 13.04.2016 | ||
RS | 13.04.2016 | ||
SE | 13.04.2016 | ||
NO | 13.07.2016 | ||
GR | 14.07.2016 | ||
PT | 16.08.2016 | ||
Former [2016/52] | ES | 13.04.2016 | |
FI | 13.04.2016 | ||
HR | 13.04.2016 | ||
LT | 13.04.2016 | ||
LV | 13.04.2016 | ||
RS | 13.04.2016 | ||
SE | 13.04.2016 | ||
NO | 13.07.2016 | ||
GR | 14.07.2016 | ||
PT | 16.08.2016 | ||
Former [2016/51] | ES | 13.04.2016 | |
FI | 13.04.2016 | ||
HR | 13.04.2016 | ||
LT | 13.04.2016 | ||
LV | 13.04.2016 | ||
RS | 13.04.2016 | ||
NO | 13.07.2016 | ||
GR | 14.07.2016 | ||
PT | 16.08.2016 | ||
Former [2016/50] | ES | 13.04.2016 | |
FI | 13.04.2016 | ||
HR | 13.04.2016 | ||
LT | 13.04.2016 | ||
LV | 13.04.2016 | ||
RS | 13.04.2016 | ||
NO | 13.07.2016 | ||
Former [2016/49] | FI | 13.04.2016 | |
LT | 13.04.2016 | ||
NO | 13.07.2016 | ||
Former [2016/46] | LT | 13.04.2016 | |
NO | 13.07.2016 | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]US2009145338 (PANOSIAN MICHAEL HARMIK [US], et al) [X] 1-6,10,12,14,15 * paragraph [0002] * * paragraph [0014] - paragraph [0017] * * figures 1, 2 * * claims 1, 2, 3 * [I] 7-9,11,13; | [X]US2005035517 (LAWRENCE MARK [US], et al) [X] 1,2,4-6,10 * paragraph [0005] * * paragraph [0058] - paragraph [0059] * * paragraph [0065] * * paragraph [0068] * * paragraph [0074] - paragraph [0079] * * paragraph [0085] * * figures 21, 22, 25, 27 *; | [X]US4191111 (EMMERT RAYMOND L [US]) [X] 1,6-8,12,14 * column 1, line 40 - line 50 * * column 2 * * figures 1-3 * * claims 1, 2 *; | [X]GB2356597 (BLACKBURN WALTER CYRUS [GB]) [X] 1,6,8,10,12-15 * Titel * * page 1, line 20 - line 30 * * page 2, line 1 - line 5 * * page 2, line 16 - line 29 * * page 5, line 24 - line 31 *; | [X]DE2617800 (LICENTIA GMBH) [X] 1-3,6,8-10,12-15 * claims 1-3 * * page 2, paragraph 1 * * page 4 - page 5 *; | [X]US2006076861 (BAUGHMAN JOE D [US]) [X] 1,2,4 * figure 9A * * figure 9D *; | [XA]US5642895 (WUNDER RICHARD [US]) [X] 1 * the whole document * [A] 2-15; | [XA]US2002179181 (MURPHY WILLIAM CHARLES [CA]) [X] 1 * the whole document * [A] 2-15 |