EP2708389 - Trailer vehicle with automatic level control [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2014/12] | Automatic level control for a trailer vehicle | ||
[2022/02] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 21.04.2023 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 13.05.2022 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 03.01.2022 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 15.02.2019 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 27.07.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.09.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MT | published on 09.10.2024 [2024/41] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Knorr-Bremse Systems for Commercial Vehicles Limited Century House, Folly Brook Road Emerald Park East, Emersons Green Bristol BS16 7FE / GB | [2014/12] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Fry, Matthew c/o Knorr-Bremse Systems for Commercial Vehicles Limited Century House, Folly Brook Road Emerald Park East, Emersons Green Bristol, BS16 7FE / GB | [2014/12] | Representative(s) | JENSEN & SON 366-368 Old Street London EC1V 9LT / GB | [2022/24] |
Former [2014/12] | JENSEN & SON 366-368 Old Street London EC1V 9LT / GB | Application number, filing date | 13004535.4 | 17.09.2013 | [2014/12] | Priority number, date | GB20120016558 | 17.09.2012 Original published format: GB 201216558 | [2019/39] |
Former [2014/12] | GB20120018558 | 17.09.2012 | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2708389 | Date: | 19.03.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/12] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2708389 | Date: | 24.01.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/04] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2708389 | Date: | 15.06.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/24] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 03.01.2018 | Classification | IPC: | B60G17/017, B60G17/052 | [2014/12] | CPC: |
B60G17/017 (EP,US);
B60G17/0195 (GB);
B60G17/0525 (EP,GB,US);
B60G17/0565 (GB);
B60G2300/04 (EP,GB);
B60G2300/042 (EP,GB,US);
B60G2400/824 (EP);
B60G2400/97 (EP);
B60G2401/16 (EP);
B60G2500/30 (EP);
B60G2600/0422 (EP);
B60G2600/202 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2018/35] |
Former [2014/12] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | Anhänger mit automatischer Niveauregulierung | [2022/02] | English: | Trailer vehicle with automatic level control | [2022/02] | French: | Remorque avec commande de niveau automatique | [2022/02] |
Former [2014/12] | Automatische Niveauregulierung für einen Anhänger | ||
Former [2014/12] | Automatic level control for a trailer vehicle | ||
Former [2014/12] | Commande de niveau automatique pour une remorque | Examination procedure | 17.09.2013 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 24.07.2018 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 24.07.2018 | Examination requested [2018/35] | 19.02.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 18.06.2019 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.08.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 02.03.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.07.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 03.02.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.11.2021 | Date of oral proceedings | 04.01.2022 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 25.01.2022 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | 04.05.2022 | Fee for grant paid | 04.05.2022 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 04.05.2022 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 19.02.2019 | Opposition(s) | 16.03.2023 | No opposition filed within time limit [2023/21] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.09.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.09.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 02.10.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.09.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 23.09.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 24.09.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 22.09.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 17.09.2013 | AL | 15.06.2022 | AT | 15.06.2022 | CY | 15.06.2022 | CZ | 15.06.2022 | DK | 15.06.2022 | EE | 15.06.2022 | FI | 15.06.2022 | HR | 15.06.2022 | IT | 15.06.2022 | LT | 15.06.2022 | LV | 15.06.2022 | MC | 15.06.2022 | MK | 15.06.2022 | MT | 15.06.2022 | NL | 15.06.2022 | PL | 15.06.2022 | RO | 15.06.2022 | RS | 15.06.2022 | SI | 15.06.2022 | SK | 15.06.2022 | SM | 15.06.2022 | BG | 15.09.2022 | NO | 15.09.2022 | GR | 16.09.2022 | IE | 17.09.2022 | LU | 17.09.2022 | BE | 30.09.2022 | CH | 30.09.2022 | FR | 30.09.2022 | LI | 30.09.2022 | IS | 15.10.2022 | PT | 17.10.2022 | [2024/41] |
Former [2024/27] | HU | 17.09.2013 | |
AL | 15.06.2022 | ||
AT | 15.06.2022 | ||
CY | 15.06.2022 | ||
CZ | 15.06.2022 | ||
DK | 15.06.2022 | ||
EE | 15.06.2022 | ||
FI | 15.06.2022 | ||
HR | 15.06.2022 | ||
IT | 15.06.2022 | ||
LT | 15.06.2022 | ||
LV | 15.06.2022 | ||
MC | 15.06.2022 | ||
MK | 15.06.2022 | ||
NL | 15.06.2022 | ||
PL | 15.06.2022 | ||
RO | 15.06.2022 | ||
RS | 15.06.2022 | ||
SI | 15.06.2022 | ||
SK | 15.06.2022 | ||
SM | 15.06.2022 | ||
BG | 15.09.2022 | ||
NO | 15.09.2022 | ||
GR | 16.09.2022 | ||
IE | 17.09.2022 | ||
LU | 17.09.2022 | ||
BE | 30.09.2022 | ||
CH | 30.09.2022 | ||
FR | 30.09.2022 | ||
LI | 30.09.2022 | ||
IS | 15.10.2022 | ||
PT | 17.10.2022 | ||
Former [2024/21] | HU | 17.09.2013 | |
AL | 15.06.2022 | ||
AT | 15.06.2022 | ||
CY | 15.06.2022 | ||
CZ | 15.06.2022 | ||
DK | 15.06.2022 | ||
EE | 15.06.2022 | ||
FI | 15.06.2022 | ||
HR | 15.06.2022 | ||
IT | 15.06.2022 | ||
LT | 15.06.2022 | ||
LV | 15.06.2022 | ||
MC | 15.06.2022 | ||
NL | 15.06.2022 | ||
PL | 15.06.2022 | ||
RO | 15.06.2022 | ||
RS | 15.06.2022 | ||
SI | 15.06.2022 | ||
SK | 15.06.2022 | ||
SM | 15.06.2022 | ||
BG | 15.09.2022 | ||
NO | 15.09.2022 | ||
GR | 16.09.2022 | ||
IE | 17.09.2022 | ||
LU | 17.09.2022 | ||
BE | 30.09.2022 | ||
CH | 30.09.2022 | ||
FR | 30.09.2022 | ||
LI | 30.09.2022 | ||
IS | 15.10.2022 | ||
PT | 17.10.2022 | ||
Former [2024/18] | HU | 17.09.2013 | |
AL | 15.06.2022 | ||
AT | 15.06.2022 | ||
CZ | 15.06.2022 | ||
DK | 15.06.2022 | ||
EE | 15.06.2022 | ||
FI | 15.06.2022 | ||
HR | 15.06.2022 | ||
IT | 15.06.2022 | ||
LT | 15.06.2022 | ||
LV | 15.06.2022 | ||
MC | 15.06.2022 | ||
NL | 15.06.2022 | ||
PL | 15.06.2022 | ||
RO | 15.06.2022 | ||
RS | 15.06.2022 | ||
SI | 15.06.2022 | ||
SK | 15.06.2022 | ||
SM | 15.06.2022 | ||
BG | 15.09.2022 | ||
NO | 15.09.2022 | ||
GR | 16.09.2022 | ||
IE | 17.09.2022 | ||
LU | 17.09.2022 | ||
BE | 30.09.2022 | ||
CH | 30.09.2022 | ||
FR | 30.09.2022 | ||
LI | 30.09.2022 | ||
IS | 15.10.2022 | ||
PT | 17.10.2022 | ||
Former [2024/11] | AL | 15.06.2022 | |
AT | 15.06.2022 | ||
CZ | 15.06.2022 | ||
DK | 15.06.2022 | ||
EE | 15.06.2022 | ||
FI | 15.06.2022 | ||
HR | 15.06.2022 | ||
IT | 15.06.2022 | ||
LT | 15.06.2022 | ||
LV | 15.06.2022 | ||
MC | 15.06.2022 | ||
NL | 15.06.2022 | ||
PL | 15.06.2022 | ||
RO | 15.06.2022 | ||
RS | 15.06.2022 | ||
SI | 15.06.2022 | ||
SK | 15.06.2022 | ||
SM | 15.06.2022 | ||
BG | 15.09.2022 | ||
NO | 15.09.2022 | ||
GR | 16.09.2022 | ||
IE | 17.09.2022 | ||
LU | 17.09.2022 | ||
BE | 30.09.2022 | ||
CH | 30.09.2022 | ||
FR | 30.09.2022 | ||
LI | 30.09.2022 | ||
IS | 15.10.2022 | ||
PT | 17.10.2022 | ||
Former [2023/42] | AL | 15.06.2022 | |
AT | 15.06.2022 | ||
CZ | 15.06.2022 | ||
DK | 15.06.2022 | ||
EE | 15.06.2022 | ||
FI | 15.06.2022 | ||
HR | 15.06.2022 | ||
LT | 15.06.2022 | ||
LV | 15.06.2022 | ||
MC | 15.06.2022 | ||
NL | 15.06.2022 | ||
PL | 15.06.2022 | ||
RO | 15.06.2022 | ||
RS | 15.06.2022 | ||
SI | 15.06.2022 | ||
SK | 15.06.2022 | ||
SM | 15.06.2022 | ||
BG | 15.09.2022 | ||
NO | 15.09.2022 | ||
GR | 16.09.2022 | ||
IE | 17.09.2022 | ||
LU | 17.09.2022 | ||
BE | 30.09.2022 | ||
CH | 30.09.2022 | ||
FR | 30.09.2022 | ||
LI | 30.09.2022 | ||
IS | 15.10.2022 | ||
PT | 17.10.2022 | ||
Former [2023/35] | AL | 15.06.2022 | |
AT | 15.06.2022 | ||
CZ | 15.06.2022 | ||
DK | 15.06.2022 | ||
EE | 15.06.2022 | ||
FI | 15.06.2022 | ||
HR | 15.06.2022 | ||
LT | 15.06.2022 | ||
LV | 15.06.2022 | ||
MC | 15.06.2022 | ||
NL | 15.06.2022 | ||
PL | 15.06.2022 | ||
RO | 15.06.2022 | ||
RS | 15.06.2022 | ||
SI | 15.06.2022 | ||
SK | 15.06.2022 | ||
SM | 15.06.2022 | ||
BG | 15.09.2022 | ||
NO | 15.09.2022 | ||
GR | 16.09.2022 | ||
IE | 17.09.2022 | ||
LU | 17.09.2022 | ||
CH | 30.09.2022 | ||
FR | 30.09.2022 | ||
LI | 30.09.2022 | ||
IS | 15.10.2022 | ||
PT | 17.10.2022 | ||
Former [2023/33] | AL | 15.06.2022 | |
AT | 15.06.2022 | ||
CZ | 15.06.2022 | ||
DK | 15.06.2022 | ||
EE | 15.06.2022 | ||
FI | 15.06.2022 | ||
HR | 15.06.2022 | ||
LT | 15.06.2022 | ||
LV | 15.06.2022 | ||
MC | 15.06.2022 | ||
NL | 15.06.2022 | ||
PL | 15.06.2022 | ||
RO | 15.06.2022 | ||
RS | 15.06.2022 | ||
SI | 15.06.2022 | ||
SK | 15.06.2022 | ||
SM | 15.06.2022 | ||
BG | 15.09.2022 | ||
NO | 15.09.2022 | ||
GR | 16.09.2022 | ||
IE | 17.09.2022 | ||
LU | 17.09.2022 | ||
IS | 15.10.2022 | ||
PT | 17.10.2022 | ||
Former [2023/30] | AL | 15.06.2022 | |
AT | 15.06.2022 | ||
CZ | 15.06.2022 | ||
DK | 15.06.2022 | ||
EE | 15.06.2022 | ||
FI | 15.06.2022 | ||
HR | 15.06.2022 | ||
LT | 15.06.2022 | ||
LV | 15.06.2022 | ||
MC | 15.06.2022 | ||
NL | 15.06.2022 | ||
PL | 15.06.2022 | ||
RO | 15.06.2022 | ||
RS | 15.06.2022 | ||
SI | 15.06.2022 | ||
SK | 15.06.2022 | ||
SM | 15.06.2022 | ||
BG | 15.09.2022 | ||
NO | 15.09.2022 | ||
GR | 16.09.2022 | ||
LU | 17.09.2022 | ||
IS | 15.10.2022 | ||
PT | 17.10.2022 | ||
Former [2023/25] | AL | 15.06.2022 | |
AT | 15.06.2022 | ||
CZ | 15.06.2022 | ||
DK | 15.06.2022 | ||
EE | 15.06.2022 | ||
FI | 15.06.2022 | ||
HR | 15.06.2022 | ||
LT | 15.06.2022 | ||
LV | 15.06.2022 | ||
MC | 15.06.2022 | ||
NL | 15.06.2022 | ||
PL | 15.06.2022 | ||
RO | 15.06.2022 | ||
RS | 15.06.2022 | ||
SI | 15.06.2022 | ||
SK | 15.06.2022 | ||
SM | 15.06.2022 | ||
BG | 15.09.2022 | ||
NO | 15.09.2022 | ||
GR | 16.09.2022 | ||
IS | 15.10.2022 | ||
PT | 17.10.2022 | ||
Former [2023/22] | AL | 15.06.2022 | |
AT | 15.06.2022 | ||
CZ | 15.06.2022 | ||
DK | 15.06.2022 | ||
EE | 15.06.2022 | ||
FI | 15.06.2022 | ||
HR | 15.06.2022 | ||
LT | 15.06.2022 | ||
LV | 15.06.2022 | ||
MC | 15.06.2022 | ||
NL | 15.06.2022 | ||
PL | 15.06.2022 | ||
RO | 15.06.2022 | ||
RS | 15.06.2022 | ||
SK | 15.06.2022 | ||
SM | 15.06.2022 | ||
BG | 15.09.2022 | ||
NO | 15.09.2022 | ||
GR | 16.09.2022 | ||
IS | 15.10.2022 | ||
PT | 17.10.2022 | ||
Former [2023/21] | AL | 15.06.2022 | |
AT | 15.06.2022 | ||
CZ | 15.06.2022 | ||
DK | 15.06.2022 | ||
EE | 15.06.2022 | ||
FI | 15.06.2022 | ||
HR | 15.06.2022 | ||
LT | 15.06.2022 | ||
LV | 15.06.2022 | ||
NL | 15.06.2022 | ||
PL | 15.06.2022 | ||
RO | 15.06.2022 | ||
RS | 15.06.2022 | ||
SK | 15.06.2022 | ||
SM | 15.06.2022 | ||
BG | 15.09.2022 | ||
NO | 15.09.2022 | ||
GR | 16.09.2022 | ||
IS | 15.10.2022 | ||
PT | 17.10.2022 | ||
Former [2023/17] | AL | 15.06.2022 | |
AT | 15.06.2022 | ||
CZ | 15.06.2022 | ||
EE | 15.06.2022 | ||
FI | 15.06.2022 | ||
HR | 15.06.2022 | ||
LT | 15.06.2022 | ||
LV | 15.06.2022 | ||
NL | 15.06.2022 | ||
PL | 15.06.2022 | ||
RO | 15.06.2022 | ||
RS | 15.06.2022 | ||
SK | 15.06.2022 | ||
SM | 15.06.2022 | ||
BG | 15.09.2022 | ||
NO | 15.09.2022 | ||
GR | 16.09.2022 | ||
IS | 15.10.2022 | ||
PT | 17.10.2022 | ||
Former [2023/12] | AT | 15.06.2022 | |
CZ | 15.06.2022 | ||
EE | 15.06.2022 | ||
FI | 15.06.2022 | ||
HR | 15.06.2022 | ||
LT | 15.06.2022 | ||
LV | 15.06.2022 | ||
NL | 15.06.2022 | ||
PL | 15.06.2022 | ||
RO | 15.06.2022 | ||
RS | 15.06.2022 | ||
SK | 15.06.2022 | ||
SM | 15.06.2022 | ||
BG | 15.09.2022 | ||
NO | 15.09.2022 | ||
GR | 16.09.2022 | ||
IS | 15.10.2022 | ||
PT | 17.10.2022 | ||
Former [2023/11] | AT | 15.06.2022 | |
CZ | 15.06.2022 | ||
EE | 15.06.2022 | ||
FI | 15.06.2022 | ||
HR | 15.06.2022 | ||
LT | 15.06.2022 | ||
LV | 15.06.2022 | ||
NL | 15.06.2022 | ||
PL | 15.06.2022 | ||
RO | 15.06.2022 | ||
RS | 15.06.2022 | ||
SK | 15.06.2022 | ||
SM | 15.06.2022 | ||
BG | 15.09.2022 | ||
NO | 15.09.2022 | ||
GR | 16.09.2022 | ||
PT | 17.10.2022 | ||
Former [2023/09] | AT | 15.06.2022 | |
CZ | 15.06.2022 | ||
EE | 15.06.2022 | ||
FI | 15.06.2022 | ||
HR | 15.06.2022 | ||
LT | 15.06.2022 | ||
LV | 15.06.2022 | ||
NL | 15.06.2022 | ||
RO | 15.06.2022 | ||
RS | 15.06.2022 | ||
SK | 15.06.2022 | ||
SM | 15.06.2022 | ||
BG | 15.09.2022 | ||
NO | 15.09.2022 | ||
GR | 16.09.2022 | ||
PT | 17.10.2022 | ||
Former [2023/07] | AT | 15.06.2022 | |
FI | 15.06.2022 | ||
HR | 15.06.2022 | ||
LT | 15.06.2022 | ||
LV | 15.06.2022 | ||
NL | 15.06.2022 | ||
RS | 15.06.2022 | ||
BG | 15.09.2022 | ||
NO | 15.09.2022 | ||
GR | 16.09.2022 | ||
Former [2023/02] | FI | 15.06.2022 | |
HR | 15.06.2022 | ||
LT | 15.06.2022 | ||
LV | 15.06.2022 | ||
NL | 15.06.2022 | ||
RS | 15.06.2022 | ||
BG | 15.09.2022 | ||
NO | 15.09.2022 | ||
GR | 16.09.2022 | ||
Former [2022/50] | FI | 15.06.2022 | |
HR | 15.06.2022 | ||
LT | 15.06.2022 | ||
LV | 15.06.2022 | ||
RS | 15.06.2022 | ||
BG | 15.09.2022 | ||
NO | 15.09.2022 | ||
GR | 16.09.2022 | ||
Former [2022/49] | FI | 15.06.2022 | |
HR | 15.06.2022 | ||
LT | 15.06.2022 | ||
LV | 15.06.2022 | ||
BG | 15.09.2022 | ||
NO | 15.09.2022 | ||
GR | 16.09.2022 | ||
Former [2022/47] | FI | 15.06.2022 | |
LT | 15.06.2022 | ||
NO | 15.09.2022 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2005110229 (KIMURA RYOJI [JP], et al) [A] 1-9 * paragraphs [0010] , [0068] , [0097]; figures 2,3 *; | [X]WO2006015746 (DAIMLER CHRYSLER AG [DE], et al) [X] 1,2,8 * page 2, paragraph 1 * * page 13, paragraph 1 - page 14, paragraph 1; figure 1 * * page 10, paragraph 2 *; | [A]WO2006135326 (VOLVO LASTVAGNAR AB [SE], et al) [A] 1-9* pages 6-8; figures 1-2 *; | [X]US2009184480 (LARSSON MIKAEL [SE], et al) [X] 1,2,5-7,9 * paragraphs [0016] , [0021] , [0023] , [0026] , [0034] , [0035] *; | [X]EP2489531 (HALDEX BRAKE PROD GMBH [DE]) [X] 1,3-9 * paragraphs [0033] , [0051] , [0053] , [0054]; figure 3 * * paragraphs [0044] , [0045]; figure 2 * * paragraph [0059]; figure 5 * | by applicant | FR2616721 | JPH06219218 | US2004201195 | EP1557305 |