EP2717202 - Natural language metric condition alerts users interfaces [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 02.06.2017 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.06.2017 | Refusal of application | published on 05.07.2017 [2017/27] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Successfactors, Inc. One Tower Place Suite 1100 South San Francisco, CA 94080 / US | [2014/15] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Haine, Dominic Philip c/o Successfactors, Inc. One Tower Place Suite 1100 South SAN Francisco, CA 94080 / US | 02 /
Strezo, Michael c/o Successfactors, Inc. One Tower Place Suite 1100 South SAN Francisco, CA 94080 / US | 03 /
Capraro, Michel Angelo c/o Successfactors, Inc. One Tower Place Suite 1100 South SAN Francisco, CA 94080 / US | 04 /
Hagar, Lyndal c/o Successfactors, Inc. One Tower Place Suite 1100 South SAN Francisco, CA 94080 / US | 05 /
Ashton, Anthony c/o Successfactors, Inc. One Tower Place Suite 1100 South SAN Francisco, CA 94080 / US | 06 /
Bolwell, Laesa c/o Successfactors, Inc. One Tower Place Suite 1100 South SAN Francisco, CA 94080 / US | 07 /
Krakovsky, Dmitri c/o Successfactors, Inc. One Tower Place Suite 1100 South SAN Francisco, CA 94080 / US | [2014/15] | Representative(s) | Müller-Boré & Partner Patentanwälte PartG mbB Friedenheimer Brücke 21 80639 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2014/15] | Müller-Boré & Partner Patentanwälte PartG mbB Friedenheimer Brücke 21 80639 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 13004700.4 | 27.09.2013 | [2014/15] | Priority number, date | US201213646595 | 05.10.2012 Original published format: US201213646595 | [2014/15] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2717202 | Date: | 09.04.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/15] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 20.01.2014 | Classification | IPC: | G06Q10/06, G06F17/21 | [2014/15] | CPC: |
G06Q10/067 (EP,US);
G06F16/9038 (EP,US);
G06F40/186 (EP,US);
G06F40/56 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2014/15] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Natürliche sprachmetrische Zustandswarnungs-Benutzerschnittstellen | [2014/15] | English: | Natural language metric condition alerts users interfaces | [2014/15] | French: | Interfaces utilisateurs d'alertes de condition de mesure de langage naturel | [2014/15] | Examination procedure | 12.08.2014 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 14.08.2014 | Examination requested [2014/39] | 08.02.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 23.05.2016 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.01.2017 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 07.03.2017 | 09.02.2017 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2017/27] | 19.02.2017 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2017/27] | 07.03.2017 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 08.02.2016 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.09.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.09.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US2004199541 (GOLDBERG EVAN M [US], et al) [X] 1-15 * paragraph [0010] - paragraph [0013] * * paragraph [0017] * * paragraph [0063] - paragraph [0064] * * paragraph [0066] * * paragraph [0068] *; | [X]US2009171927 (NESAMONEY DIAZ H [US], et al) [X] 1-15 * paragraph [0013] - paragraph [0016] * * paragraph [0033] * * paragraph [0042] - paragraph [0046] * |