EP2682001 - Stable concentrated liquid human milk fortifier [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 24.03.2017 Database last updated on 27.07.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 07.12.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.03.2017 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 26.04.2017 [2017/17] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ABBOTT LABORATORIES 100 Abbott Park Road Abbott Park, IL 60064-3500 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2014/02] | For all designated states ABBOTT LABORATORIES Dept. 377, Bldg AP6A-1 100 Abbott Park Road Abbott Park, IL 60064-6008 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Vurma, Mustafa 10214 Archer Lane Dublin, Ohio 43017 / US | 02 /
Boff, Jeffrey M. 4115 Cambron Drive Columbus, Ohio 43219 / US | 03 /
Katz, Gary E. 1090 Bluffpoint Drive Columbus, Ohio 43235 / US | [2014/02] | Representative(s) | Boult Wade Tennant LLP Salisbury Square House 8 Salisbury Square London EC4Y 8AP / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2014/02] | Ricker, Mathias Wallinger Ricker Schlotter Tostmann Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Zweibrückenstrasse 5-7 80331 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 13004731.9 | 28.10.2011 | [2014/02] | Priority number, date | US20100409150P | 02.11.2010 Original published format: US 409150 P | [2014/02] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2682001 | Date: | 08.01.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/02] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 25.11.2013 | Classification | IPC: | A23L33/17, A23L33/10 | [2016/26] | CPC: |
A23L33/18 (EP,US);
A23L29/219 (EP,US);
A23L29/272 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2014/02] | A23C9/152, A23C9/154, A23L1/30, A23L1/305 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2014/02] | Title | German: | Stabiler, konzentrierter und flüssiger Verstärker für menschliche Milch | [2014/02] | English: | Stable concentrated liquid human milk fortifier | [2014/02] | French: | Fortifiant pour lait humain liquide concentré stable | [2014/02] | Examination procedure | 08.07.2014 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 08.07.2014 | Examination requested [2014/34] | 22.06.2016 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 03.11.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2017/17] | 08.12.2016 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2017/17] | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP11782324.5 / EP2488042 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 01.10.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 07.10.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 07.10.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.10.2016 | 06   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US6294206 (BARRETT-REIS BRIDGET [US], et al) [A] 1-15 * the whole document *; | [A]US2007098849 (BARRETT-REIS BRIDGET [US], et al) [A] 1-15 * the whole document *; | [A]US2003104078 (BARRETT-REIS BRIDGET [US], et al) [A] 1-15 * the whole document *; | [A]WO03015538 (KERRY INC [US], et al) [A] 1-15 * the whole document * | by applicant | US6096358 | US6227261 | US6371319 |