EP2719542 - Recording medium [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 13.07.2018 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 04.08.2017 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 23.03.2017 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 23.12.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.07.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL | published on 19.08.2020 [2020/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Canon Kabushiki Kaisha 30-2, Shimomaruko 3-chome Ohta-ku Tokyo / JP | [2017/36] |
Former [2014/16] | For all designated states Canon Kabushiki Kaisha 30-2, 3-chome, Shimomaruko Ohta-ku Tokyo / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Nito, Yasuhiro c/o Canon Kabushiki Kaisha 30-2, Shimomaruko 3-chome Ohta-ku Tokyo / JP | 02 /
Kamo, Hisao c/o Canon Kabushiki Kaisha 30-2, Shimomaruko 3-chome Ohta-ku Tokyo / JP | 03 /
Hatta, Naoya c/o Canon Kabushiki Kaisha 30-2, Shimomaruko 3-chome Ohta-ku Tokyo / JP | [2014/16] | Representative(s) | WESER & Kollegen Patentanwälte PartmbB Radeckestraße 43 81245 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2014/42] | WESER & Kollegen Radeckestraße 43 81245 München / DE | ||
Former [2014/16] | Weser, Wolfgang Weser & Kollegen Patentanwälte Radeckestrasse 43 81245 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 13004794.7 | 04.10.2013 | [2014/16] | Priority number, date | JP20120226148 | 11.10.2012 Original published format: JP 2012226148 | [2014/16] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2719542 | Date: | 16.04.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/16] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2719542 | Date: | 15.06.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/24] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2719542 | Date: | 06.09.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/36] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 18.05.2016 | Classification | IPC: | B41M5/50, B41M5/52 | [2014/16] | CPC: |
B41M5/506 (EP,US);
B41M5/502 (US);
B41M5/508 (US);
B41M5/52 (EP,US);
B41M5/5218 (EP,US);
B41M5/5254 (EP,US);
B41M2205/42 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/04] |
Former [2014/16] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | Aufzeichnungsmedium | [2014/16] | English: | Recording medium | [2014/16] | French: | Support d'enregistrement | [2014/16] | Examination procedure | 04.10.2013 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 19.09.2016 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 15.12.2016 | Examination requested [2017/04] | 24.03.2017 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 19.07.2017 | Fee for grant paid | 19.07.2017 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 19.07.2017 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 24.03.2017 | Opposition(s) | 07.06.2018 | No opposition filed within time limit [2018/33] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.11.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.10.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 04.10.2013 | AL | 06.09.2017 | AT | 06.09.2017 | CY | 06.09.2017 | CZ | 06.09.2017 | DK | 06.09.2017 | EE | 06.09.2017 | ES | 06.09.2017 | FI | 06.09.2017 | HR | 06.09.2017 | IT | 06.09.2017 | LT | 06.09.2017 | LV | 06.09.2017 | MC | 06.09.2017 | MK | 06.09.2017 | NL | 06.09.2017 | PL | 06.09.2017 | PT | 06.09.2017 | RO | 06.09.2017 | RS | 06.09.2017 | SE | 06.09.2017 | SI | 06.09.2017 | SK | 06.09.2017 | SM | 06.09.2017 | TR | 06.09.2017 | IE | 04.10.2017 | LU | 04.10.2017 | MT | 04.10.2017 | BE | 31.10.2017 | FR | 06.11.2017 | BG | 06.12.2017 | GB | 06.12.2017 | NO | 06.12.2017 | GR | 07.12.2017 | IS | 06.01.2018 | [2020/34] |
Former [2020/27] | HU | 04.10.2013 | |
AT | 06.09.2017 | ||
CY | 06.09.2017 | ||
CZ | 06.09.2017 | ||
DK | 06.09.2017 | ||
EE | 06.09.2017 | ||
ES | 06.09.2017 | ||
FI | 06.09.2017 | ||
HR | 06.09.2017 | ||
IT | 06.09.2017 | ||
LT | 06.09.2017 | ||
LV | 06.09.2017 | ||
MC | 06.09.2017 | ||
MK | 06.09.2017 | ||
NL | 06.09.2017 | ||
PL | 06.09.2017 | ||
PT | 06.09.2017 | ||
RO | 06.09.2017 | ||
RS | 06.09.2017 | ||
SE | 06.09.2017 | ||
SI | 06.09.2017 | ||
SK | 06.09.2017 | ||
SM | 06.09.2017 | ||
TR | 06.09.2017 | ||
IE | 04.10.2017 | ||
LU | 04.10.2017 | ||
MT | 04.10.2017 | ||
BE | 31.10.2017 | ||
FR | 06.11.2017 | ||
BG | 06.12.2017 | ||
GB | 06.12.2017 | ||
NO | 06.12.2017 | ||
GR | 07.12.2017 | ||
IS | 06.01.2018 | ||
Former [2020/16] | HU | 04.10.2013 | |
AT | 06.09.2017 | ||
CY | 06.09.2017 | ||
CZ | 06.09.2017 | ||
DK | 06.09.2017 | ||
EE | 06.09.2017 | ||
ES | 06.09.2017 | ||
FI | 06.09.2017 | ||
HR | 06.09.2017 | ||
IT | 06.09.2017 | ||
LT | 06.09.2017 | ||
LV | 06.09.2017 | ||
MC | 06.09.2017 | ||
MK | 06.09.2017 | ||
NL | 06.09.2017 | ||
PL | 06.09.2017 | ||
RO | 06.09.2017 | ||
RS | 06.09.2017 | ||
SE | 06.09.2017 | ||
SI | 06.09.2017 | ||
SK | 06.09.2017 | ||
SM | 06.09.2017 | ||
TR | 06.09.2017 | ||
IE | 04.10.2017 | ||
LU | 04.10.2017 | ||
MT | 04.10.2017 | ||
BE | 31.10.2017 | ||
FR | 06.11.2017 | ||
BG | 06.12.2017 | ||
GB | 06.12.2017 | ||
NO | 06.12.2017 | ||
GR | 07.12.2017 | ||
IS | 06.01.2018 | ||
Former [2019/51] | HU | 04.10.2013 | |
AT | 06.09.2017 | ||
CY | 06.09.2017 | ||
CZ | 06.09.2017 | ||
DK | 06.09.2017 | ||
EE | 06.09.2017 | ||
ES | 06.09.2017 | ||
FI | 06.09.2017 | ||
HR | 06.09.2017 | ||
IT | 06.09.2017 | ||
LT | 06.09.2017 | ||
LV | 06.09.2017 | ||
MC | 06.09.2017 | ||
MK | 06.09.2017 | ||
NL | 06.09.2017 | ||
PL | 06.09.2017 | ||
RO | 06.09.2017 | ||
RS | 06.09.2017 | ||
SE | 06.09.2017 | ||
SI | 06.09.2017 | ||
SK | 06.09.2017 | ||
SM | 06.09.2017 | ||
IE | 04.10.2017 | ||
LU | 04.10.2017 | ||
MT | 04.10.2017 | ||
BE | 31.10.2017 | ||
FR | 06.11.2017 | ||
BG | 06.12.2017 | ||
GB | 06.12.2017 | ||
NO | 06.12.2017 | ||
GR | 07.12.2017 | ||
IS | 06.01.2018 | ||
Former [2019/46] | HU | 04.10.2013 | |
AT | 06.09.2017 | ||
CY | 06.09.2017 | ||
CZ | 06.09.2017 | ||
DK | 06.09.2017 | ||
EE | 06.09.2017 | ||
ES | 06.09.2017 | ||
FI | 06.09.2017 | ||
HR | 06.09.2017 | ||
IT | 06.09.2017 | ||
LT | 06.09.2017 | ||
LV | 06.09.2017 | ||
MC | 06.09.2017 | ||
NL | 06.09.2017 | ||
PL | 06.09.2017 | ||
RO | 06.09.2017 | ||
RS | 06.09.2017 | ||
SE | 06.09.2017 | ||
SI | 06.09.2017 | ||
SK | 06.09.2017 | ||
SM | 06.09.2017 | ||
IE | 04.10.2017 | ||
LU | 04.10.2017 | ||
MT | 04.10.2017 | ||
BE | 31.10.2017 | ||
FR | 06.11.2017 | ||
BG | 06.12.2017 | ||
GB | 06.12.2017 | ||
NO | 06.12.2017 | ||
GR | 07.12.2017 | ||
IS | 06.01.2018 | ||
Former [2019/31] | HU | 04.10.2013 | |
AT | 06.09.2017 | ||
CZ | 06.09.2017 | ||
DK | 06.09.2017 | ||
EE | 06.09.2017 | ||
ES | 06.09.2017 | ||
FI | 06.09.2017 | ||
HR | 06.09.2017 | ||
IT | 06.09.2017 | ||
LT | 06.09.2017 | ||
LV | 06.09.2017 | ||
MC | 06.09.2017 | ||
NL | 06.09.2017 | ||
PL | 06.09.2017 | ||
RO | 06.09.2017 | ||
RS | 06.09.2017 | ||
SE | 06.09.2017 | ||
SI | 06.09.2017 | ||
SK | 06.09.2017 | ||
SM | 06.09.2017 | ||
IE | 04.10.2017 | ||
LU | 04.10.2017 | ||
MT | 04.10.2017 | ||
BE | 31.10.2017 | ||
FR | 06.11.2017 | ||
BG | 06.12.2017 | ||
GB | 06.12.2017 | ||
NO | 06.12.2017 | ||
GR | 07.12.2017 | ||
IS | 06.01.2018 | ||
Former [2018/50] | AT | 06.09.2017 | |
CZ | 06.09.2017 | ||
DK | 06.09.2017 | ||
EE | 06.09.2017 | ||
ES | 06.09.2017 | ||
FI | 06.09.2017 | ||
HR | 06.09.2017 | ||
IT | 06.09.2017 | ||
LT | 06.09.2017 | ||
LV | 06.09.2017 | ||
MC | 06.09.2017 | ||
NL | 06.09.2017 | ||
PL | 06.09.2017 | ||
RO | 06.09.2017 | ||
RS | 06.09.2017 | ||
SE | 06.09.2017 | ||
SI | 06.09.2017 | ||
SK | 06.09.2017 | ||
SM | 06.09.2017 | ||
IE | 04.10.2017 | ||
LU | 04.10.2017 | ||
MT | 04.10.2017 | ||
BE | 31.10.2017 | ||
FR | 06.11.2017 | ||
BG | 06.12.2017 | ||
GB | 06.12.2017 | ||
NO | 06.12.2017 | ||
GR | 07.12.2017 | ||
IS | 06.01.2018 | ||
Former [2018/45] | AT | 06.09.2017 | |
CZ | 06.09.2017 | ||
DK | 06.09.2017 | ||
EE | 06.09.2017 | ||
ES | 06.09.2017 | ||
FI | 06.09.2017 | ||
HR | 06.09.2017 | ||
IT | 06.09.2017 | ||
LT | 06.09.2017 | ||
LV | 06.09.2017 | ||
MC | 06.09.2017 | ||
NL | 06.09.2017 | ||
PL | 06.09.2017 | ||
RO | 06.09.2017 | ||
RS | 06.09.2017 | ||
SE | 06.09.2017 | ||
SI | 06.09.2017 | ||
SK | 06.09.2017 | ||
SM | 06.09.2017 | ||
IE | 04.10.2017 | ||
LU | 04.10.2017 | ||
MT | 04.10.2017 | ||
BE | 31.10.2017 | ||
FR | 06.11.2017 | ||
BG | 06.12.2017 | ||
NO | 06.12.2017 | ||
GR | 07.12.2017 | ||
IS | 06.01.2018 | ||
Former [2018/43] | AT | 06.09.2017 | |
CZ | 06.09.2017 | ||
DK | 06.09.2017 | ||
EE | 06.09.2017 | ||
ES | 06.09.2017 | ||
FI | 06.09.2017 | ||
HR | 06.09.2017 | ||
IT | 06.09.2017 | ||
LT | 06.09.2017 | ||
LV | 06.09.2017 | ||
MC | 06.09.2017 | ||
NL | 06.09.2017 | ||
PL | 06.09.2017 | ||
RO | 06.09.2017 | ||
RS | 06.09.2017 | ||
SE | 06.09.2017 | ||
SI | 06.09.2017 | ||
SK | 06.09.2017 | ||
SM | 06.09.2017 | ||
LU | 04.10.2017 | ||
MT | 04.10.2017 | ||
BE | 31.10.2017 | ||
FR | 06.11.2017 | ||
BG | 06.12.2017 | ||
NO | 06.12.2017 | ||
GR | 07.12.2017 | ||
IS | 06.01.2018 | ||
Former [2018/39] | AT | 06.09.2017 | |
CZ | 06.09.2017 | ||
DK | 06.09.2017 | ||
EE | 06.09.2017 | ||
ES | 06.09.2017 | ||
FI | 06.09.2017 | ||
HR | 06.09.2017 | ||
IT | 06.09.2017 | ||
LT | 06.09.2017 | ||
LV | 06.09.2017 | ||
MC | 06.09.2017 | ||
NL | 06.09.2017 | ||
PL | 06.09.2017 | ||
RO | 06.09.2017 | ||
RS | 06.09.2017 | ||
SE | 06.09.2017 | ||
SI | 06.09.2017 | ||
SK | 06.09.2017 | ||
SM | 06.09.2017 | ||
LU | 04.10.2017 | ||
BE | 31.10.2017 | ||
FR | 06.11.2017 | ||
BG | 06.12.2017 | ||
NO | 06.12.2017 | ||
GR | 07.12.2017 | ||
IS | 06.01.2018 | ||
Former [2018/36] | AT | 06.09.2017 | |
CZ | 06.09.2017 | ||
DK | 06.09.2017 | ||
EE | 06.09.2017 | ||
ES | 06.09.2017 | ||
FI | 06.09.2017 | ||
HR | 06.09.2017 | ||
IT | 06.09.2017 | ||
LT | 06.09.2017 | ||
LV | 06.09.2017 | ||
MC | 06.09.2017 | ||
NL | 06.09.2017 | ||
PL | 06.09.2017 | ||
RO | 06.09.2017 | ||
RS | 06.09.2017 | ||
SE | 06.09.2017 | ||
SK | 06.09.2017 | ||
SM | 06.09.2017 | ||
LU | 04.10.2017 | ||
BE | 31.10.2017 | ||
BG | 06.12.2017 | ||
NO | 06.12.2017 | ||
GR | 07.12.2017 | ||
IS | 06.01.2018 | ||
Former [2018/35] | AT | 06.09.2017 | |
CZ | 06.09.2017 | ||
DK | 06.09.2017 | ||
EE | 06.09.2017 | ||
ES | 06.09.2017 | ||
FI | 06.09.2017 | ||
HR | 06.09.2017 | ||
IT | 06.09.2017 | ||
LT | 06.09.2017 | ||
LV | 06.09.2017 | ||
MC | 06.09.2017 | ||
NL | 06.09.2017 | ||
PL | 06.09.2017 | ||
RO | 06.09.2017 | ||
RS | 06.09.2017 | ||
SE | 06.09.2017 | ||
SK | 06.09.2017 | ||
SM | 06.09.2017 | ||
LU | 04.10.2017 | ||
BG | 06.12.2017 | ||
NO | 06.12.2017 | ||
GR | 07.12.2017 | ||
IS | 06.01.2018 | ||
Former [2018/33] | AT | 06.09.2017 | |
CZ | 06.09.2017 | ||
DK | 06.09.2017 | ||
EE | 06.09.2017 | ||
ES | 06.09.2017 | ||
FI | 06.09.2017 | ||
HR | 06.09.2017 | ||
IT | 06.09.2017 | ||
LT | 06.09.2017 | ||
LV | 06.09.2017 | ||
MC | 06.09.2017 | ||
NL | 06.09.2017 | ||
PL | 06.09.2017 | ||
RO | 06.09.2017 | ||
RS | 06.09.2017 | ||
SE | 06.09.2017 | ||
SK | 06.09.2017 | ||
SM | 06.09.2017 | ||
BG | 06.12.2017 | ||
NO | 06.12.2017 | ||
GR | 07.12.2017 | ||
IS | 06.01.2018 | ||
Former [2018/24] | AT | 06.09.2017 | |
CZ | 06.09.2017 | ||
EE | 06.09.2017 | ||
ES | 06.09.2017 | ||
FI | 06.09.2017 | ||
HR | 06.09.2017 | ||
IT | 06.09.2017 | ||
LT | 06.09.2017 | ||
LV | 06.09.2017 | ||
NL | 06.09.2017 | ||
PL | 06.09.2017 | ||
RO | 06.09.2017 | ||
RS | 06.09.2017 | ||
SE | 06.09.2017 | ||
SK | 06.09.2017 | ||
SM | 06.09.2017 | ||
BG | 06.12.2017 | ||
NO | 06.12.2017 | ||
GR | 07.12.2017 | ||
IS | 06.01.2018 | ||
Former [2018/21] | CZ | 06.09.2017 | |
ES | 06.09.2017 | ||
FI | 06.09.2017 | ||
HR | 06.09.2017 | ||
LT | 06.09.2017 | ||
LV | 06.09.2017 | ||
NL | 06.09.2017 | ||
RS | 06.09.2017 | ||
SE | 06.09.2017 | ||
BG | 06.12.2017 | ||
NO | 06.12.2017 | ||
GR | 07.12.2017 | ||
Former [2018/15] | ES | 06.09.2017 | |
FI | 06.09.2017 | ||
HR | 06.09.2017 | ||
LT | 06.09.2017 | ||
LV | 06.09.2017 | ||
NL | 06.09.2017 | ||
RS | 06.09.2017 | ||
SE | 06.09.2017 | ||
BG | 06.12.2017 | ||
NO | 06.12.2017 | ||
GR | 07.12.2017 | ||
Former [2018/12] | ES | 06.09.2017 | |
FI | 06.09.2017 | ||
HR | 06.09.2017 | ||
LT | 06.09.2017 | ||
LV | 06.09.2017 | ||
RS | 06.09.2017 | ||
SE | 06.09.2017 | ||
BG | 06.12.2017 | ||
NO | 06.12.2017 | ||
GR | 07.12.2017 | ||
Former [2018/11] | ES | 06.09.2017 | |
FI | 06.09.2017 | ||
HR | 06.09.2017 | ||
LT | 06.09.2017 | ||
RS | 06.09.2017 | ||
SE | 06.09.2017 | ||
BG | 06.12.2017 | ||
NO | 06.12.2017 | ||
GR | 07.12.2017 | ||
Former [2018/09] | FI | 06.09.2017 | |
LT | 06.09.2017 | ||
SE | 06.09.2017 | ||
NO | 06.12.2017 | ||
Former [2018/08] | FI | 06.09.2017 | |
LT | 06.09.2017 | ||
NO | 06.12.2017 | ||
Former [2018/07] | LT | 06.09.2017 | |
NO | 06.12.2017 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0791474 (SEIKO EPSON CORP [JP]) [A] 1-8* the whole document *; | [XI]EP1329330 (MITSUBISHI PAPER MILLS LTD [JP]) [X] 1,3-5,7,8 * paragraphs [0074] - [0079]; example 1; claim 1 * [I] 2,6; | [A]EP2489522 (CANON KK [JP]) [A] 1-8 * the whole document * | by applicant | JPH07232473 | JPH08132731 | JPH0966664 | JPH0976628 | JP2008265110 |