EP2685232 - Method for using object-capturing device [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 08.07.2016 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.10.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL | published on 21.11.2018 [2018/47] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Hitachi, Ltd. 6-6, Marunouchi 1-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2015/36] | For all designated states Hitachi, Ltd. 6-6, Marunouchi 1-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo / JP | ||
Former [2014/11] | For all designated states Hitachi, Ltd. 6-6, Marunouchi 1-chome Chiyoda-ku, Tokyo / JP | ||
Former [2014/03] | For all designated states Hitachi Plant Technologies, Ltd. 5-2, Higashi-Ikeburo 4-chome Toshima-ku Tokyo 170-8466 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Miyashita, Noe c/o: Hitachi Plant Technologies, Ltd. 5-2, Higashi-Ikebukuro 4-chome Toshima-ku Tokyo 170-8466 / JP | 02 /
Seo, Koji c/o: Hitachi Plant Technologies, Ltd. 5-2, Higashi-Ikebukuro 4-chome Toshima-ku Tokyo 170-8466 / JP | 03 /
Kamitani, Matsuo c/o: Hitachi Plant Technologies, Ltd. 5-2, Higashi-Ikebukuro 4-chome Toshima-ku Tokyo 170-8466 / JP | [2014/03] | Representative(s) | Strehl Schübel-Hopf & Partner Maximilianstrasse 54 80538 München / DE | [2014/03] | Application number, filing date | 13004833.3 | 22.12.2010 | [2014/03] | Priority number, date | JP20090295655 | 25.12.2009 Original published format: JP 2009295655 | [2014/03] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2685232 | Date: | 15.01.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/03] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2685232 | Date: | 02.09.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/36] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 03.12.2013 | Classification | IPC: | G01N1/22, C12M1/34, C12Q1/00 | [2014/03] | CPC: |
G01N1/2273 (EP,US);
C12M41/36 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2015/36] |
Former [2014/03] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Verwendung einer Vorrichtung zur Objektaufnahme | [2015/28] | English: | Method for using object-capturing device | [2014/03] | French: | Procédé de l'utilisation d'un dispositif de capture d'objet | [2015/28] |
Former [2014/03] | Vorrichtung zur Objektaufnahme und Verfahren zu deren Verwendung | ||
Former [2014/03] | Dispositif de capture d'objet et procédé d'utilisation associé | Examination procedure | 25.03.2014 | Examination requested [2014/19] | 14.07.2014 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 05.12.2014 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 15.01.2015 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.03.2015 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 22.05.2015 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | 15.07.2015 | Fee for grant paid | 15.07.2015 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP10015991.2 / EP2339321 | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued (EP20100015991) is 19.08.2013 | Opposition(s) | 03.06.2016 | No opposition filed within time limit [2016/32] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 05.11.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.12.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.12.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 22.12.2010 | AL | 02.09.2015 | AT | 02.09.2015 | BE | 02.09.2015 | BG | 02.09.2015 | CY | 02.09.2015 | CZ | 02.09.2015 | DK | 02.09.2015 | EE | 02.09.2015 | ES | 02.09.2015 | FI | 02.09.2015 | HR | 02.09.2015 | IT | 02.09.2015 | LT | 02.09.2015 | LV | 02.09.2015 | MC | 02.09.2015 | MK | 02.09.2015 | MT | 02.09.2015 | NL | 02.09.2015 | PL | 02.09.2015 | RO | 02.09.2015 | RS | 02.09.2015 | SE | 02.09.2015 | SI | 02.09.2015 | SK | 02.09.2015 | SM | 02.09.2015 | TR | 02.09.2015 | NO | 02.12.2015 | GR | 03.12.2015 | GB | 22.12.2015 | IE | 22.12.2015 | LU | 22.12.2015 | CH | 31.12.2015 | LI | 31.12.2015 | IS | 02.01.2016 | PT | 04.01.2016 | [2018/47] |
Former [2018/45] | HU | 22.12.2010 | |
AT | 02.09.2015 | ||
BE | 02.09.2015 | ||
BG | 02.09.2015 | ||
CY | 02.09.2015 | ||
CZ | 02.09.2015 | ||
DK | 02.09.2015 | ||
EE | 02.09.2015 | ||
ES | 02.09.2015 | ||
FI | 02.09.2015 | ||
HR | 02.09.2015 | ||
IT | 02.09.2015 | ||
LT | 02.09.2015 | ||
LV | 02.09.2015 | ||
MC | 02.09.2015 | ||
MK | 02.09.2015 | ||
MT | 02.09.2015 | ||
NL | 02.09.2015 | ||
PL | 02.09.2015 | ||
RO | 02.09.2015 | ||
RS | 02.09.2015 | ||
SE | 02.09.2015 | ||
SI | 02.09.2015 | ||
SK | 02.09.2015 | ||
SM | 02.09.2015 | ||
TR | 02.09.2015 | ||
NO | 02.12.2015 | ||
GR | 03.12.2015 | ||
GB | 22.12.2015 | ||
IE | 22.12.2015 | ||
LU | 22.12.2015 | ||
CH | 31.12.2015 | ||
LI | 31.12.2015 | ||
IS | 02.01.2016 | ||
PT | 04.01.2016 | ||
Former [2018/32] | HU | 22.12.2010 | |
AT | 02.09.2015 | ||
BE | 02.09.2015 | ||
BG | 02.09.2015 | ||
CY | 02.09.2015 | ||
CZ | 02.09.2015 | ||
DK | 02.09.2015 | ||
EE | 02.09.2015 | ||
ES | 02.09.2015 | ||
FI | 02.09.2015 | ||
HR | 02.09.2015 | ||
IT | 02.09.2015 | ||
LT | 02.09.2015 | ||
LV | 02.09.2015 | ||
MC | 02.09.2015 | ||
MK | 02.09.2015 | ||
MT | 02.09.2015 | ||
NL | 02.09.2015 | ||
PL | 02.09.2015 | ||
RO | 02.09.2015 | ||
RS | 02.09.2015 | ||
SE | 02.09.2015 | ||
SI | 02.09.2015 | ||
SK | 02.09.2015 | ||
SM | 02.09.2015 | ||
NO | 02.12.2015 | ||
GR | 03.12.2015 | ||
GB | 22.12.2015 | ||
IE | 22.12.2015 | ||
LU | 22.12.2015 | ||
CH | 31.12.2015 | ||
LI | 31.12.2015 | ||
IS | 02.01.2016 | ||
PT | 04.01.2016 | ||
Former [2017/39] | HU | 22.12.2010 | |
AT | 02.09.2015 | ||
BE | 02.09.2015 | ||
BG | 02.09.2015 | ||
CY | 02.09.2015 | ||
CZ | 02.09.2015 | ||
DK | 02.09.2015 | ||
EE | 02.09.2015 | ||
ES | 02.09.2015 | ||
FI | 02.09.2015 | ||
HR | 02.09.2015 | ||
IT | 02.09.2015 | ||
LT | 02.09.2015 | ||
LV | 02.09.2015 | ||
MC | 02.09.2015 | ||
MT | 02.09.2015 | ||
NL | 02.09.2015 | ||
PL | 02.09.2015 | ||
RO | 02.09.2015 | ||
RS | 02.09.2015 | ||
SE | 02.09.2015 | ||
SI | 02.09.2015 | ||
SK | 02.09.2015 | ||
SM | 02.09.2015 | ||
NO | 02.12.2015 | ||
GR | 03.12.2015 | ||
GB | 22.12.2015 | ||
IE | 22.12.2015 | ||
LU | 22.12.2015 | ||
CH | 31.12.2015 | ||
LI | 31.12.2015 | ||
IS | 02.01.2016 | ||
PT | 04.01.2016 | ||
Former [2017/03] | AT | 02.09.2015 | |
BE | 02.09.2015 | ||
CZ | 02.09.2015 | ||
DK | 02.09.2015 | ||
EE | 02.09.2015 | ||
ES | 02.09.2015 | ||
FI | 02.09.2015 | ||
IT | 02.09.2015 | ||
LT | 02.09.2015 | ||
LV | 02.09.2015 | ||
MC | 02.09.2015 | ||
NL | 02.09.2015 | ||
PL | 02.09.2015 | ||
RO | 02.09.2015 | ||
RS | 02.09.2015 | ||
SE | 02.09.2015 | ||
SI | 02.09.2015 | ||
SK | 02.09.2015 | ||
NO | 02.12.2015 | ||
GR | 03.12.2015 | ||
GB | 22.12.2015 | ||
IE | 22.12.2015 | ||
LU | 22.12.2015 | ||
CH | 31.12.2015 | ||
LI | 31.12.2015 | ||
IS | 02.01.2016 | ||
PT | 04.01.2016 | ||
Former [2016/47] | AT | 02.09.2015 | |
CZ | 02.09.2015 | ||
DK | 02.09.2015 | ||
EE | 02.09.2015 | ||
ES | 02.09.2015 | ||
FI | 02.09.2015 | ||
IT | 02.09.2015 | ||
LT | 02.09.2015 | ||
LV | 02.09.2015 | ||
MC | 02.09.2015 | ||
NL | 02.09.2015 | ||
PL | 02.09.2015 | ||
RO | 02.09.2015 | ||
RS | 02.09.2015 | ||
SE | 02.09.2015 | ||
SI | 02.09.2015 | ||
SK | 02.09.2015 | ||
NO | 02.12.2015 | ||
GR | 03.12.2015 | ||
GB | 22.12.2015 | ||
IE | 22.12.2015 | ||
LU | 22.12.2015 | ||
BE | 31.12.2015 | ||
CH | 31.12.2015 | ||
LI | 31.12.2015 | ||
IS | 02.01.2016 | ||
PT | 04.01.2016 | ||
Former [2016/46] | AT | 02.09.2015 | |
CZ | 02.09.2015 | ||
DK | 02.09.2015 | ||
EE | 02.09.2015 | ||
ES | 02.09.2015 | ||
FI | 02.09.2015 | ||
IT | 02.09.2015 | ||
LT | 02.09.2015 | ||
LV | 02.09.2015 | ||
MC | 02.09.2015 | ||
NL | 02.09.2015 | ||
PL | 02.09.2015 | ||
RO | 02.09.2015 | ||
RS | 02.09.2015 | ||
SE | 02.09.2015 | ||
SI | 02.09.2015 | ||
SK | 02.09.2015 | ||
NO | 02.12.2015 | ||
GR | 03.12.2015 | ||
IE | 22.12.2015 | ||
LU | 22.12.2015 | ||
BE | 31.12.2015 | ||
CH | 31.12.2015 | ||
LI | 31.12.2015 | ||
IS | 02.01.2016 | ||
PT | 04.01.2016 | ||
Former [2016/45] | AT | 02.09.2015 | |
CZ | 02.09.2015 | ||
DK | 02.09.2015 | ||
EE | 02.09.2015 | ||
ES | 02.09.2015 | ||
FI | 02.09.2015 | ||
IT | 02.09.2015 | ||
LT | 02.09.2015 | ||
LV | 02.09.2015 | ||
MC | 02.09.2015 | ||
NL | 02.09.2015 | ||
PL | 02.09.2015 | ||
RO | 02.09.2015 | ||
RS | 02.09.2015 | ||
SE | 02.09.2015 | ||
SI | 02.09.2015 | ||
SK | 02.09.2015 | ||
NO | 02.12.2015 | ||
GR | 03.12.2015 | ||
IE | 22.12.2015 | ||
LU | 22.12.2015 | ||
BE | 31.12.2015 | ||
IS | 02.01.2016 | ||
PT | 04.01.2016 | ||
Former [2016/39] | AT | 02.09.2015 | |
CZ | 02.09.2015 | ||
DK | 02.09.2015 | ||
EE | 02.09.2015 | ||
ES | 02.09.2015 | ||
FI | 02.09.2015 | ||
IT | 02.09.2015 | ||
LT | 02.09.2015 | ||
LV | 02.09.2015 | ||
MC | 02.09.2015 | ||
NL | 02.09.2015 | ||
PL | 02.09.2015 | ||
RO | 02.09.2015 | ||
RS | 02.09.2015 | ||
SE | 02.09.2015 | ||
SI | 02.09.2015 | ||
SK | 02.09.2015 | ||
NO | 02.12.2015 | ||
GR | 03.12.2015 | ||
LU | 22.12.2015 | ||
BE | 31.12.2015 | ||
IS | 02.01.2016 | ||
PT | 04.01.2016 | ||
Former [2016/36] | AT | 02.09.2015 | |
CZ | 02.09.2015 | ||
EE | 02.09.2015 | ||
ES | 02.09.2015 | ||
FI | 02.09.2015 | ||
IT | 02.09.2015 | ||
LT | 02.09.2015 | ||
LV | 02.09.2015 | ||
MC | 02.09.2015 | ||
NL | 02.09.2015 | ||
PL | 02.09.2015 | ||
RO | 02.09.2015 | ||
RS | 02.09.2015 | ||
SE | 02.09.2015 | ||
SI | 02.09.2015 | ||
SK | 02.09.2015 | ||
NO | 02.12.2015 | ||
GR | 03.12.2015 | ||
LU | 22.12.2015 | ||
BE | 31.12.2015 | ||
IS | 02.01.2016 | ||
PT | 04.01.2016 | ||
Former [2016/34] | AT | 02.09.2015 | |
CZ | 02.09.2015 | ||
EE | 02.09.2015 | ||
ES | 02.09.2015 | ||
FI | 02.09.2015 | ||
IT | 02.09.2015 | ||
LT | 02.09.2015 | ||
LV | 02.09.2015 | ||
MC | 02.09.2015 | ||
NL | 02.09.2015 | ||
PL | 02.09.2015 | ||
RO | 02.09.2015 | ||
RS | 02.09.2015 | ||
SE | 02.09.2015 | ||
SK | 02.09.2015 | ||
NO | 02.12.2015 | ||
GR | 03.12.2015 | ||
LU | 22.12.2015 | ||
BE | 31.12.2015 | ||
IS | 02.01.2016 | ||
PT | 04.01.2016 | ||
Former [2016/33] | AT | 02.09.2015 | |
CZ | 02.09.2015 | ||
EE | 02.09.2015 | ||
ES | 02.09.2015 | ||
FI | 02.09.2015 | ||
IT | 02.09.2015 | ||
LT | 02.09.2015 | ||
LV | 02.09.2015 | ||
MC | 02.09.2015 | ||
NL | 02.09.2015 | ||
PL | 02.09.2015 | ||
RO | 02.09.2015 | ||
RS | 02.09.2015 | ||
SE | 02.09.2015 | ||
SK | 02.09.2015 | ||
NO | 02.12.2015 | ||
GR | 03.12.2015 | ||
BE | 31.12.2015 | ||
IS | 02.01.2016 | ||
PT | 04.01.2016 | ||
Former [2016/24] | AT | 02.09.2015 | |
CZ | 02.09.2015 | ||
EE | 02.09.2015 | ||
ES | 02.09.2015 | ||
FI | 02.09.2015 | ||
IT | 02.09.2015 | ||
LT | 02.09.2015 | ||
LV | 02.09.2015 | ||
NL | 02.09.2015 | ||
PL | 02.09.2015 | ||
RO | 02.09.2015 | ||
RS | 02.09.2015 | ||
SE | 02.09.2015 | ||
SK | 02.09.2015 | ||
NO | 02.12.2015 | ||
GR | 03.12.2015 | ||
BE | 31.12.2015 | ||
IS | 02.01.2016 | ||
PT | 04.01.2016 | ||
Former [2016/23] | AT | 02.09.2015 | |
CZ | 02.09.2015 | ||
EE | 02.09.2015 | ||
ES | 02.09.2015 | ||
FI | 02.09.2015 | ||
IT | 02.09.2015 | ||
LT | 02.09.2015 | ||
LV | 02.09.2015 | ||
NL | 02.09.2015 | ||
PL | 02.09.2015 | ||
RO | 02.09.2015 | ||
RS | 02.09.2015 | ||
SE | 02.09.2015 | ||
SK | 02.09.2015 | ||
NO | 02.12.2015 | ||
GR | 03.12.2015 | ||
IS | 02.01.2016 | ||
Former [2016/22] | AT | 02.09.2015 | |
CZ | 02.09.2015 | ||
EE | 02.09.2015 | ||
ES | 02.09.2015 | ||
FI | 02.09.2015 | ||
IT | 02.09.2015 | ||
LT | 02.09.2015 | ||
LV | 02.09.2015 | ||
NL | 02.09.2015 | ||
PL | 02.09.2015 | ||
RS | 02.09.2015 | ||
SE | 02.09.2015 | ||
NO | 02.12.2015 | ||
GR | 03.12.2015 | ||
IS | 02.01.2016 | ||
Former [2016/21] | AT | 02.09.2015 | |
ES | 02.09.2015 | ||
FI | 02.09.2015 | ||
IT | 02.09.2015 | ||
LT | 02.09.2015 | ||
LV | 02.09.2015 | ||
PL | 02.09.2015 | ||
RS | 02.09.2015 | ||
SE | 02.09.2015 | ||
NO | 02.12.2015 | ||
GR | 03.12.2015 | ||
Former [2016/11] | AT | 02.09.2015 | |
ES | 02.09.2015 | ||
FI | 02.09.2015 | ||
LT | 02.09.2015 | ||
LV | 02.09.2015 | ||
PL | 02.09.2015 | ||
RS | 02.09.2015 | ||
SE | 02.09.2015 | ||
NO | 02.12.2015 | ||
GR | 03.12.2015 | ||
Former [2016/10] | ES | 02.09.2015 | |
FI | 02.09.2015 | ||
LT | 02.09.2015 | ||
LV | 02.09.2015 | ||
PL | 02.09.2015 | ||
RS | 02.09.2015 | ||
SE | 02.09.2015 | ||
NO | 02.12.2015 | ||
GR | 03.12.2015 | ||
Former [2016/09] | FI | 02.09.2015 | |
LT | 02.09.2015 | ||
LV | 02.09.2015 | ||
NO | 02.12.2015 | ||
GR | 03.12.2015 | ||
Former [2016/08] | LT | 02.09.2015 | |
NO | 02.12.2015 | ||
Former [2016/07] | LT | 02.09.2015 | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US5471994 (GUIRGUIS RAOUF A [US]) [Y] 1 * column 7, line 10 - column 8, line 35; figures 7-11 *; | [Y]EP0636873 (FRAUNHOFER GES FORSCHUNG [DE]) [Y] 1 * column 3, line 43 - column 4, line 47; figure 2 * | by applicant | JP2009131186 | JPH11137293 |