EP2690313 - Tensioner for a timing chain [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 14.02.2020 Database last updated on 01.10.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 29.03.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.02.2020 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 18.03.2020 [2020/12] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Litens Automotive Partnership 730 Rowntree Dairy Road Woodbridge, Ontario L4L 5T7 / CA | [N/P] |
Former [2014/05] | For all designated states Litens Automotive Partnership 730 Rowntree Dairy Road Woodbridge Ontario L4L 5T9 / CA | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Lehtovaara, Jorma, J. 1330 Mississauga Valley Blvd. Unit 37 Mississauga, Ontario L5A 3T1 / CA | 02 /
Frankowski, Marek 2277 Somers Blvd. Stroud, Ontario L0L 2M0 / CA | [2014/26] |
Former [2014/05] | 01 /
Lehtovaara, Jorma, J. 346 Burnhamthorpe Road Etobicoke, Ontario M9B 2A4 / CA | ||
02 /
Frankowski, Marek 2277 Somers Blvd. Stroud, Ontario L0L 2M0 / CA | Representative(s) | Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Leopoldstraße 4 80802 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2014/05] | Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Anwaltssozietät Leopoldstrasse 4 80802 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 13005043.8 | 01.09.2005 | [2014/05] | Priority number, date | US20040606444P | 01.09.2004 Original published format: US 606444 P | US20050674937P | 26.04.2005 Original published format: US 674937 P | [2014/05] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2690313 | Date: | 29.01.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/05] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 25.11.2013 | Classification | IPC: | F16H7/08 | [2014/05] | CPC: |
F16H7/08 (EP,KR,US);
F16H2007/0806 (EP,US);
F16H2007/081 (EP,US);
F16H2007/0872 (EP,US);
F16H7/0831 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | CZ, DE, FR, GB, IT, PT [2014/05] | Title | German: | Kettenspanner für eine Steuerkette | [2014/05] | English: | Tensioner for a timing chain | [2014/05] | French: | Tendeur de chaîne pour une chaîne de distribution | [2014/05] | Examination procedure | 29.07.2014 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 29.07.2014 | Examination requested [2014/37] | 02.04.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 15.10.2019 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2020/12] | 12.11.2019 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2020/12] | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP05779489.3 / EP1784587 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.02.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.02.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 21.02.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 21.02.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 21.02.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 21.02.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 21.02.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 12.09.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 11.09.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 13.09.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 12.09.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 13 | 11.09.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 14 | 13.09.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 15 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]EP0509313 (MAGNA INT GMBH [DE]) [Y] 1,4-10 * paragraph [0019]; figure 3 *; | [A]DE4414213 (SCHAEFFLER WAELZLAGER KG [DE]) [A] 1-15* abstract *; | [Y]JP2002310248 (GATES UNITTA ASIA CO) [Y] 1,4-10 * paragraph [0019]; figure 1 *; | [Y]US2002160868 (WIGSTEN MARK MACDONALD [US], et al) [Y] 1,4-10 * paragraphs [0059] , [0 78] * * figures 6,9,13 * | by applicant | USRE34543E | US6213073 | US6244981 | US6332441 | US6352487 | US6382103 |