EP2700332 - Oral hygiene device, in particular toothbrush [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 08.04.2016 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.04.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 11.05.2016 [2016/19] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Trisa Holding AG Kantonsstrasse 31 6234 Triengen / CH | For all designated states Colgate-Palmolive Company 300 Park Avenue New York, NY 10022 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2014/09] | For all designated states Trisa Holding AG Kantonsstrasse 31 6234 Triengen / CH | ||
For all designated states Colgate-Palmolive Company 300 Park Avenue New York, NY 10022 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Fischer, Franz Bätzenmoos CH-6234 Triengen / CH | 02 /
Gross, Peter Seeblick 4 CH-6204 Sempach / CH | 03 /
Huber, Beat Hofstatt 2 CH-6233 Büron / CH | [2014/09] | Representative(s) | Schaad, Balass, Menzl & Partner AG Bellerivestrasse 20 Postfach 8034 Zürich / CH | [N/P] |
Former [2014/09] | Schaad, Balass, Menzl & Partner AG Dufourstrasse 101 Postfach 8034 Zürich / CH | Application number, filing date | 13005479.4 | 04.02.2011 | [2014/09] | Priority number, date | EP20100001977 | 26.02.2010 Original published format: EP 10001977 | [2014/09] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2700332 | Date: | 26.02.2014 | Language: | DE | [2014/09] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2700332 | Date: | 29.04.2015 | Language: | DE | [2015/18] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 31.03.2015 | Classification | IPC: | A46B15/00, A46B5/00, A61C17/22 | [2014/09] | CPC: |
A46B15/0002 (EP,US);
A46B15/0012 (EP,US);
A46B15/004 (EP,US);
A46B5/0062 (EP,US);
A46B5/007 (EP,US);
A46B2200/1066 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2014/09] | Title | German: | Mundhygienegerät, insbesondere Zahnbürste | [2014/09] | English: | Oral hygiene device, in particular toothbrush | [2014/09] | French: | Appareil d'hygiène buccale, en particulier brosse à dents | [2014/09] | Examination procedure | 30.10.2015 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2016/19] | 07.12.2015 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2016/19] | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP11702943.9 / EP2538817 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.11.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 06.02.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 02.02.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [AD]DE9310112U (HOFFMANN KAY DR [DE]) [AD] 1-15 * page 4, line 11 - page 6, line 11; figures 1-6 *; | [A]EP0281017 (BLENDAX WERKE SCHNEIDER CO [DE]) [A] 1-15 * column 3, line 17 - column 4, line 46; figures 1-8 *; | [A]FR2751185 (POIROT FREDERIC [FR]) [A] 1-15 * page 4, line 3 - page 6, line 28; figures 1,2 *; | [A]US5331707 (IRIZARRY JOSEPH [US]) [A] 1-15 * column 3, lines 10-58; figures 1-4 *; | [A]JPH07236519 (CHIYODA YOSHIO) [A] 1-15 * abstract * | by applicant | DE9310112U | EP0848593 | DE3840136 | WO2004010822 |