EP2743974 - Damper, cooling circuit and apparatus for vibration-sensitive substrate treatment apparatus [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 04.10.2019 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 20.01.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.10.2019 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 06.11.2019 [2019/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Von Ardenne GmbH Am Hahnweg 8 01328 Dresden / DE | [2018/20] |
Former [2014/25] | For all designated states Von Ardenne GmbH Plattleite 19/29 01324 Dresden / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Hentschel, Michael Döbraer Str. 6 01189 Dresden / DE | [2014/25] | Application number, filing date | 13005526.2 | 27.11.2013 | [2014/25] | Priority number, date | DE201210112064 | 11.12.2012 Original published format: DE102012112064 | [2014/25] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2743974 | Date: | 18.06.2014 | Language: | DE | [2014/25] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 25.02.2014 | Classification | IPC: | H01L21/67, H01S3/04 | [2014/25] | CPC: |
H01L21/67017 (EP);
H01L21/67115 (EP);
H01S3/0407 (EP);
H01S3/042 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2014/25] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Dämpfer, Kühlkreislauf und Apparatur für eine schwingungsempfindliche Substratbehandlungsapparatur | [2014/25] | English: | Damper, cooling circuit and apparatus for vibration-sensitive substrate treatment apparatus | [2014/25] | French: | Amortisseur, circuit de refroidissement et appareillage pour un appareil de traitement de substrat sensible aux vibrations | [2014/25] | Examination procedure | 06.12.2013 | Examination requested [2014/25] | 13.09.2014 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 06.10.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 12.01.2017 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.06.2019 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2019/45] | 28.06.2019 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2019/45] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 06.10.2016 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.11.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.11.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.11.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.11.2018 | 06   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]DE102010018613 (EMITEC EMISSIONSTECHNOLOGIE [DE]) [X] 1,3-7,9 * paragraph [0034] - paragraph [0039] * * figures 1-4 * [Y] 2,8,10; | [YA]WO2011067370 (EMITEC EMISSIONSTECHNOLOGIE [DE], et al) [Y] 2 * page 2, line 31 - page 3, line 22 * [A] 1; | [YA]EP0060631 (LEXEL CORP [US]) [Y] 8,10 * page 16, line 6 - line 31 * * page 41, line 4 - line 24 * * figures 1-3 * [A] 1; | [A]US5643801 (ISHIHARA HIROAKI [JP], et al) [A] 1 * the whole document *; | [A]GB2327142 (HONDA MOTOR CO LTD [JP]) [A] 1 * the whole document * | Examination | EP1788671 | by applicant | DE102006047472 | DE19515704 | WO2013037423 | DE102007052782 |